Charles v. Wentworth et al

Plaintiff: Chauncey T Charles
Defendant: Brent Wentworth, Tim Patterson and Rick Loy
Case Number: 6:2009cv06044
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 44 and granting 43 Motion to Dismiss. Case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and obey the orders of the Court. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 6, 2011. (jn)
March 30, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its etirety for 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rick Loy, Tim Patterson, Brent Wentworth. Accordingly, Defendants 14 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED a s to Plaintiffs denial of medical care claims and his official capacity claims against all defendants. Separate Defendants Tim Patterson and Rick Loy are DISMISSED as Defendants in this matter. The 14 Motion is DENIED as to the excessive force claim against Separate Defendant Wentworth in his individual capacity. Tim Patterson, Rick Loy terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 30, 2011. (dmc)
May 27, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/27/09. (bkp) [Transferred from ared on 5/28/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. Wentworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chauncey T Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Wentworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?