Wray v. Correctional Medical Services

Plaintiff: Chalmers Wray
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services, Bhalravi Kharod, Jones Eye Institute, Liggett, Owens, Valerie S Stevens, Dream Young and Blackmon
Case Number: 6:2009cv06071
Filed: August 11, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety for 40 Report and Recommendations, dismissing without prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on April 28, 2010. (dmc)
December 7, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 14 Report and Recommendations; ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 16 MOTION to Continue and MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Chalmers Wray; Jones Eye Institute, Bhalravi Kharod, Dr. Blackmon and Correctional Medical Services are dismissed. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 7, 2009. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(dmc)
November 16, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 Amended Complaint, filed by Chalmers Wray, 2 Complaint filed by Chalmers Wray. Objections to R&R due by 12/4/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 16, 2009. (dmc)
August 11, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer plaintiff's case immediately to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas, Hot Springs Division. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/11/09. (bkp) [Transferred from ared on 8/11/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wray v. Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chalmers Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhalravi Kharod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Eye Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie S Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?