Carter v. Wal-Mart et al

Plaintiff: Edward Carter
Defendant: Wal-Mart and Randall Nichols
Case Number: 6:2009cv06076
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 8 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED on the grounds that the claims are frivolous and fail to state claims on which relief can be granted. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)-(iii)(IFP action may be dismissed on such grounds at any time). Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 14, 2009. (dmc)
September 24, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by Edward Carter. Objections to R&R due by 10/13/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 24, 2009. (lw)
September 23, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, directing Clerk to assess filing fee and collect funds in the amount of $350.00 from Prison Account of Edward Carter. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 23, 2009. (lw)
August 26, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Arkansas and directing the Clerk to immediately transfer plaintiff's entire case file to the Western District of Arkansas, Hot Springs Division. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/26/09. (bkp)[Transferred from ared on 8/27/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Wal-Mart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?