Watkins v. Garrett

Plaintiff: KyRon Watkins
Defendant: Richard Garrett
Case Number: 6:2009cv06077
Filed: August 31, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations in toto re 16 Report and Recommendations; denying 14 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 20, 2010. (Note: copy to 8USCA via CM/ECF)(dmc)
June 22, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto for 8 Report and Recommendations. Further, directing Clerk to assess filing fee and collect funds from Prison Account of Kyron Watkins. Dismissing with prejudice. Motions terminated: 7 MOTION t o Appoint Counsel MOTION for Jury Trial filed by KyRon Watkins, 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint filed by KyRon Watkins, 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by KyRon Watkins. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 22, 2010. (dmc)
August 28, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to immediately transfer plaintiff's entire case file to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/28/09. (bkp) [Transferred from ared on 8/31/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KyRon Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?