Ingram v. Sanders et al

Plaintiff: Shelby Ingram
Defendant: Larry Sanders and Mel Steed
Case Number: 6:2010cv06044
Filed: June 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS adopting in its entirety Report and Recommendations re 21 Report and Recommendations. Terminating motion 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 29, 2011. (dmc)
November 29, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 14 Report and Recommendations, denying 8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mel Steed, Larry Sanders. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 29, 2010. (dmc)
November 8, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mel Steed, Larry Sanders. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 8, 2010. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?