Emerson v. McCallum

Plaintiff: Tina Emerson
Defendant: McCallum
Case Number: 6:2011cv06085
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 53 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 7, 2012. (src)
July 26, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tina Emerson. Plaintiffs Complaint should be and hereby is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The dismissal of this act ion constitutes a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). There are eleven motions currently pending: Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 1 , Motion for Default Judgment 11 , Motion to Appoint Counsel 12 ; Motion for Order to Suspend Sentence [13 ]; Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 21 ; Motion to Join Case 22 ; Motion for Order 23 ; Motion for Order 24 ; Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 26 ; Motion for Order 27 ;Motion for Hearing 28 . Because Plaintiffs complaint is dismissed with prejudice, these remaining motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 26, 2012. (dmc)
February 8, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto re 10 Report and Recommendations.; denying as moot 11 Motion for Default Judgment; denying as moot 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as moot 13 Motion for Order; denying as moot 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 8, 2012. (dmc)
November 18, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that the interests of justice would best be served by transferring this case, the Clerk is directed to immediately TRANSFER PLAINTIFF'S ENTIRE CASE FILE to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/18/11. (vjt) [Transferred from ared on 11/18/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerson v. McCallum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCallum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?