Hayes v. Reeves et al

Plaintiff: Tyrone L Hayes
Defendant: Melissa Reeves and Garland County Detention Center
Case Number: 6:2013cv06069
Filed: June 21, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, further denying 29 Motion to Reopen Case. However, the Clerk is directed to open a new case with Plaintiff's 1 complaint. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 26, 2015. (hnc) Modified on 5/26/2015 to edit docket text (hnc).
August 29, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for Plaintiffs willful failure to comply with the Local Rules and the Courts orders and for failing to prosecute this action. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 29, 2014. (lw)
June 21, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer Hayes's entire case file to the Western District of Arkansas. The transfer should be immediate; there is no need to wait a reasonable time. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/21/13. (kpr)[Transferred from ared on 6/21/2013.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Reeves et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone L Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garland County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?