BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Alton Bean Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Alton Bean Trucking, Inc. and Gary Bean
Case Number: 6:2016cv06118
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion Motion to Hold Defendants in Contempt. The Court finds ABT to be in civil contempt for violating the Court's April 11, 2017 judgment; the Court's April 4, 2019 contempt order; and the Court's May 6, 2019 show cause order. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 27, 2019. (hnc) Modified on 6/27/2019 to edit text (hnc).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Attorney Fees, Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $10431.12. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 6, 2019. (hnc)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Hold Defendants in Contempt. Defendants to be in civil contempt for violating the Court's April 11, 2017 judgment. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 4, 2019. (mjm)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case; Case reopened. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 4, 2019. (hnc)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT granting 12 Motion for Default Judgment filed by BMO Harris Banks N.A. against Alton Bean Trucking, Inc. and Gary Bean in the amount of $613,505.59 as of April 3, 2017, with pre-judgment interest to accrue at a rate of $286.37 pe r diem until judgment is entered, plus reasonable attorneys fees and costs in the amount of $22,572.24 incurred, for a total judgment amount of $636,077.83, as set forth. Further, Ordering the return or removal, delivery and credit of Retained Collateral, as set forth. See Judgment for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 11, 2017. (mjm) Modified on 4/11/2017 to edit text (mjm).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Alton Bean Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Lance R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton Bean Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?