Postley v. Housing Authority of Hot Springs, et al
Plaintiff: Kyomi Postley
Defendant: Housing Authority of Hot Springs, Arkansas, Richard Herrington, Kenya Tate, Sam Spencer and Barbara Baer
Case Number: 6:2017cv06081
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ADOPTING 80 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety; granting 70 Motion to Dismiss Case; further this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on April 8, 2019. (lw)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 63 Joint Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiff's claims against Separate Defendants Hot Springs Housing Authority and Richard Herrington are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. IT IS O RDERED that if any party desires that the terms of settlement be a part of the record, those terms should be reduced to writing and filed with the court within 30 of the entry of this Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 18, 2019. (hnc)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING 61 Report and Recommendations; Further granting 59 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiff's claims on behalf of her minor children, T.P., Jr., T.P., and K.P. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 2, 2019. (hnc)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto; denying 38 Motion to Request the Court to Appoint Curator or in the Alternative Conduct an in Camera Review and Plaintiff's claims against Barbara Baer (Former Executive Director) and Kenya Tate (Interim Director in her official and individual capacity) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 29, 2018. (lw)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING in toto 31 Report and Recommendations. Further, denying 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying 21 Motion to Join Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 3, 2018. (mjm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Postley v. Housing Authority of Hot Springs, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyomi Postley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of Hot Springs, Arkansas
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Herrington
Represented By: Gregory James Northen
Represented By: Carolyn B. Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenya Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?