Webb v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Webb
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2018cv06109
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey S. Webb. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 11/13/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Long, Martin)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Jeffrey S. Webb. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Long, Martin)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (lw)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; granting #2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 30, 2018. (mjm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Reassignment Form)(lw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Long on behalf of Jeffrey S. Webb. (lw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jeffrey S. Webb. (lw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Jeffrey S. Webb. (Attachments: #1 Motion)(lw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Jeffrey S. Webb. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Persons)(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Webb
Represented By: Martin Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?