United States of America v. A SCCY Industries CPX-2 9mm Pistol et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Harrington and Richardson .32 Caliber Revolver, 20 Rounds of 9mm Ammunition, SCCY Industries CPS-2 9mm Pistol and SCCY Industries CPX-2 9mm Pistol
Case Number: 6:2019cv06018
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF PUBLICATION as to #1 Complaint of Forfeiture, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Forfeiture Action, #2 Exhibit B - Advertisement Certification Report)(Jennen, Aaron)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signature Card)(Jennen, Aaron)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture, filed by United States of America. United States of America served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signature Card)(Jennen, Aaron)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint of Forfeiture, in Rem (Jennen, Aaron)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint of Forfeiture, in Rem (Jennen, Aaron)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT OF ARREST in Rem Returned Executed. (lw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST in Rem as to Harrington and Richardson.32 Caliber Revolver, SCCY Industries CPX-2 9mm Pistol, United States of America issued and delivered to US Marshal for service. (lw) Modified on 2/13/2019 to edit text(lw).
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by United States of America. (lw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against 20 Rounds of 9mm Ammunition, Harrington and Richardson.32 Caliber Revolver, SCCY Industries CPX-2 9mm Pistol, filed by United States of America.(lw) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/13/2019) (mjm). Modified on 2/13/2019 to edit text (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. A SCCY Industries CPX-2 9mm Pistol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrington and Richardson .32 Caliber Revolver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20 Rounds of 9mm Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCCY Industries CPS-2 9mm Pistol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCCY Industries CPX-2 9mm Pistol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Aaron Lance Jennen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?