Jackson v. Kelly

Petitioner: Andrew Lee Jackson
Respondent: Wendy Kelly
Case Number: 6:2019cv06049
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Harris on behalf of Wendy Kelly. (Harris, Christian)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Supplement; granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wendy Kelly answer due 7/31/2019 as set forth. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 17, 2019. (lw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Wendy Kelly. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(Jones, Jacob)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Supplement #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Andrew Lee Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Supplement to Petitioner's Petition for Review, Decision of Arkansas Supreme Court dated April 18, 2019)Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(Morrissey, Travis)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob H. Jones on behalf of Wendy Kelly. (Jones, Jacob)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order Directing Service,, Initial Scheduling Order. Robin Webb received documents on 4/19/19. (lw)
April 17, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order Directing Service, Initial Scheduling Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, as to Wendy Kelly using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 9828 and to the Attorney General of the State of Arkansas using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 9811. (mjm)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Further, granting #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Appointing Travis Morrissey, CJA for Andrew Lee Jackson; ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO SERVE Wendy Kelly and the Attorney General of the State of Arkansas and granting 60 days to answer; INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: as set forth. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 17, 2019. (mjm)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Andrew Lee Jackson. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mjm)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Lee Jackson. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mjm)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 2021381, Filing fee $5.00), filed by Andrew Lee Jackson. (Attachment: Flash Drive - Court Proceedings, to be held in Clerk's Office, available for courts use or for parties use if needed). (mjm) Modified on 4/16/2019 to add text(mjm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wendy Kelly
Represented By: Christian Harris
Represented By: Jacob H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew Lee Jackson
Represented By: Travis Jeremy Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?