Robinson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Corey Dale Robinson
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2019cv06062
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 8, 2019. (lmg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Rees, Kendall)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Corey Dale Robinson. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green cards)(McDonough, Sherri)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (mjm)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, granting #2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 12, 2019. (mjm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Corey Dale Robinson. (McDonough, Sherri)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Corey Dale Robinson. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (McDonough, Sherri)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 ***DISREGARD, incorrect document attached as #2 Motion IFP***TEXT ONLY ORDER Plaintiff is directed to re-file an IFP application. The IFP application submitted is deficient. The corrected IFP application is due by June 14, 2019. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 10, 2019. (lmg) Modified on 6/11/2019 to disregard (mjm).
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 consent/reassignment)(hnc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Corey Dale Robinson. (hnc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Corey Dale Robinson. (hnc) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/11/2019) (mjm).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Corey Dale Robinson.(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Dale Robinson
Represented By: Sherri Arman McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Represented By: Kendall M. Rees
Represented By: Mark W. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?