Stell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Connie S. Stell
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2019cv06063
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Connie S. Stell. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green cards)(McDonough, Sherri)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (hnc)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; granting #3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 11, 2019. (hnc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Connie S. Stell. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (McDonough, Sherri)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(mjm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Connie S. Stell. (mjm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Connie S. Stell.(mjm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Connie S. Stell. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie S. Stell
Represented By: Sherri Arman McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?