United States of America, et al v. Great American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv06072
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 9/30/3019. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due on or before 10/25/2019. Jury Trial set for the week of 9/28/2020 in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 16, 2019. (rwg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Great American Insurance Company.(Dobson, Allen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen C. Dobson on behalf of Great American Insurance Company. (Dobson, Allen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by United States of America. (Bowling, Kael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Great American Insurance Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Bowling, Kael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Great American Insurance Company, filed by United States of America.(Bowling, Kael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by United States of America. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, et al v. Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Allen C. Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?