Wilson v. State of Arkansas
Petitioner: Lamar Daniel Ron Wilson
Respondent: Wendy Kelly
Case Number: 6:2019cv06073
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response to Petition by Lamar Daniel Ron Wilson. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(hnc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A1 - Sentencing Order, Garland County Circuit Court, 26CR-15-14, #3 Exhibit A2 - Docket Sheet, Garland County Circuit Court, 26CR-15-14, #4 Exhibit A3 - Appellants Brief, Arkansas Court of Appeals, CR-16-55, #5 Exhibit A4 - No Merit Letter filed by Appellee, Arkansas Court of Appeals, CR-16-55, #6 Exhibit B1 - Order Denying Rule 37 Relief, Garland County Circuit Court, 26CR-15-14, #7 Exhibit B2 - Appellants Brief, Arkansas Court of Appeals, CR-18-12, #8 Exhibit B3 - Appellees Brief, Arkansas Court of Appeals, CR-16-55, #9 Exhibit B4 - Opinion, Delivered August 29, 2018, Arkansas Court of Appeals, CR-18-12, #10 Exhibit C1 - Motion for Belated Appeal, Supreme Court of Arkansas, CR-18-952, #11 Exhibit C2 - Order Denying Motion for Belated Appeal, Supreme Court of Arkansas, CR-18-952, #12 Exhibit C3 - Motion for Reconsideration, Supreme Court of Arkansas, CR-18-952, #13 Exhibit C4 - Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration, Supreme Court of Arkansas, CR-18-952)(Johnson, Jason)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Respondent is ORDERED to answer or otherwise respond to the petition on or before 8/9/19. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 26, 2019. (hnc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Wendy Kelly. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(Johnson, Jason)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order Directing Service. Attorney General of the State of Arkansas received documents on 07/02/2019. (mjm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order Directing Service. Wendy Kelly served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (mjm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Michael Johnson on behalf of Wendy Kelly. (Johnson, Jason)
June 28, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order Directing Service, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as to Wendy Kelly using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 9972 and to the Attorney General of the State of Arkansas using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 9965. (hnc)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO SERVE Wendy Kelly and the Attorney General of the State of Arkansas, further response due 7/27/2019. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 27, 2019. (lw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lamar Daniel Ron Wilson. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(lw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Lamar Daniel Ron Wilson. (Attachments: #1 List of Documents, #2 Set 2, #3 Set 3, #4 Set 4, #5 Set 5, #6 Set 6, #7 Set 7)(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lamar Daniel Ron Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wendy Kelly
Represented By: Jason Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?