Anderson v. Moody et al
Plaintiff: Anthony D Anderson
Defendant: Parole Officer Nick Mayfield, Ruby Moody, Jamie Vandiver and Lisa M. Wilkins
Case Number: 6:2019cv06074
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Hot Springs Office
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #7 Amended Complaint filed by Anthony D Anderson. Plaintiff's claims against all Defendants are subject to dismissal because they are either frivolous, fail to state claims upon which relief may be granted, or assert claims against defendants who are immune from such relief. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.The dismissal of this case constitutes a strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Clerk is DIRECTED to place a 1915 strike flag on the case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 29, 2019. (mjm)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Anthony D Anderson to #1 Complaint. (lw)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing ADC North Central Unit to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (hnc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ $350.00. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 9, 2019. (mlf)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Anthony D Anderson. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(hnc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #1 Complaint against Lisa M. Wilkins, Nick Mayfield, Ruby Moody, Jamie Vandiver, filed by Anthony D Anderson. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Anthony D Anderson.(hnc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. With his complaint, Plaintiff failed to either submit an in forma pauperis (IFP) application or pay the filing fee. For this reason, the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank Prisoner IFP Application. Plaintiff is given 21 days from the date of this Order to either file a completed IFP application or pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee and 50.00 dollar administrative fee, a total of 400.00 dollars. This case shall be subject to dismissal for failure to obey an order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to return the completed IFP application or pay the 400.00 dollar filing fee by the deadline. Completed IFP due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 28, 2019. (klk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 28, 2019. (klk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
June 27, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Eastern District of Arkansas. (mjm)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00438. Docket sheet received.
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately to transfer Mr. Anderson's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/27/2019. (jbh) [Transferred from ared on 6/27/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Anthony D Anderson.(kdr) [Transferred from ared on 6/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Moody et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parole Officer Nick Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa M. Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony D Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?