Wallace v. Credit Acceptance Corporation
Plaintiff: Larry Wallace
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv06081
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0277
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Proposed Stipulation. This action is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 3, without prejudice to the right of parties to reopen the proceedings to enforce the arbitrator's decision. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 27, 2019. (hnc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed STIPULATION to Arbitrate by Larry Wallace. (Lemberg, Sergei) Modified on 8/5/2019 to add text (hnc).
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Wallace. Credit Acceptance Corporation served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Lemberg, Sergei)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Credit Acceptance Corporation and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (mjm)
July 9, 2019 Complaint fee received: $400.00, receipt number 2021626. (mjm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Credit Acceptance Corporation for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lemberg, Sergei)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
July 8, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/10/2019. (mjm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed by Larry Wallace.(mjm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Larry Wallace. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Credit Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wallace
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?