Miller v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Harry Keith Miller
Defendant: Robert Jones, Nurse Robertson and Dr. Daniels
Case Number: 6:2019cv06083
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting in toto #8 Report and Recommendations. All claims against Defendant Jones in his official and individual capacities are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The official claim capacity claim against Defendant Robertson is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's personal capacity claim against Defendant Robertson alleging that he refused to treat Plaintiff's neck and back pain remain for further consideration by the magistrate judge. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 6, 2019. (mjm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) against Robertson, Robert Jones, Daniels, filed by Harry Keith Miller. Related document: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Harry Keith Miller.(hnc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Harry Keith Miller. Objections to R&R due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 7, 2019. (mjm)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing ADC-Grimes Unit to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $43.17; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (mjm)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to the provisions of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, the clerk is directed to collect the $350.00 filing fee from the plaintiff. Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer in which to notify the Court of his new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled "Notice to the Court of Change of Address" and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. Plaintiffs case shall be subject to dismissal if he fails to inform the Court of an address change.. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 5, 2019. (klk)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT/EXHIBITS by Plaintiff Harry Keith Miller to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983). (cnn)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harry Keith Miller. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed Specifically the Court requires the following information: IFP Application due. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order.(Completed IFP due by 7/31/2019). If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of his new address. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 12, 2019. (hnc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Robert Jones, Robertson, filed by Harry Keith Miller.(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Keith Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?