United Financial Casualty Company v. Chad Cox Logging, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United Financial Casualty Company
Defendant: Chad Cox Logging, LLC, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America and Ernest Shirley
Case Number: 6:2019cv06091
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Agreed Motion to Stay. This action is stayed pending the outcome of Defendant Ernset Shirley's workers' compensation proceedings. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 23, 2019. (mcc) Modified on 9/24/2019 to add text (lw).
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Younger, Robert)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Younger, Robert)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Younger, Robert)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by E. B. Chiles, IV on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Chiles, E.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ryan Younger on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Younger, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for declaratory judgment, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Ernest Shirley served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Denton, Deborah)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for declaratory judgment, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America served on 8/10/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Denton, Deborah)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for declaratory judgment, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Chad Cox Logging, LLC served on 8/10/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Denton, Deborah)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Financial Casualty Company. (Denton, Deborah)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Chad Cox Logging, LLC, Ernest Shirley, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Denton, Deborah)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Ernest Shirley for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Denton, Deborah)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Chad Cox Logging, LLC for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Denton, Deborah)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1955351), filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Denton, Deborah)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by United Financial Casualty Company. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Financial Casualty Company v. Chad Cox Logging, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Deborah S. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Cox Logging, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?