Bailey v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Thomas D Bailey, III
Defendant: Adam K Clark, Dexter Jackson, Evelyn Haynie, Wendy Kelly, Raymond Naylor and Justine M. Minor
Case Number: 6:2019cv06095
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Hot Springs Office
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Case no longer referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. (hnc)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. This case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 11, 2019. (hnc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Case by Thomas D Bailey, III. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(lw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Ouachita River Unit to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $3.67; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (lw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to the provisions of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, the clerk is directed to collect the $350.00 filing fee from the plaintiff. Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer in which to notify the Court of his new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled "Notice to the Court of Change of Address" and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. Plaintiffs case shall be subject to dismissal if he fails to inform the Court of an address change.. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 13, 2019. (klk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
August 12, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Arkansas Eastern. (cnn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00542. Docket sheet received.
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to transfer this case immediately to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas, Hot Springs Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/12/2019. (jbh) [Transferred from ared on 8/12/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas D Bailey, III.(kdr) [Transferred from ared on 8/12/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas D Bailey, III. (kdr) [Transferred from ared on 8/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam K Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justine M. Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D Bailey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?