VMN Arkadelphia, LLC v. Muse Design, Inc.
Plaintiff: VMN Arkadelphia, LLC
Defendant: Muse Design, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Anna Anthros
Case Number: 6:2020cv06019
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service, filed by Muse Design, Inc.. Anna Anthros served on 3/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Botteicher, Dylan)
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/10/2021 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 31, 2020. (hnc)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Anna Anthros, VMN Arkadelphia, LLC. (Gershner, David)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER/REPLY to #5 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Anna Anthros, VMN Arkadelphia, LLC.(Davidson, Charles)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Anna Anthros and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Anna Anthros for service of the following document: #5 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, #3 Complaint. (Botteicher, Dylan)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/30/2020. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2021 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 4, 2020. (hnc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against VMN Arkadelphia, LLC by Muse Design, Inc. and Anna Anthros. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Botteicher, Dylan) Modified on 3/4/2020 to add counter defendant Anna Anthros per pleading (hnc).
February 26, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2088150.. (Botteicher, Dylan)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
February 25, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/27/2020 (hnc)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against VMN Arkadelphia, LLC, filed by VMN Arkadelphia, LLC. Originally filed on 1/8/20 in the Circuit Court of Clark County.(hnc)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Muse Design, Inc.. (hnc)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clark County, case number 10CV-20-2., filed by Muse Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VMN Arkadelphia, LLC v. Muse Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VMN Arkadelphia, LLC
Represented By: Charles D. Skip Davidson, Sr
Represented By: David L. Gershner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muse Design, Inc.
Represented By: Cade Cox
Represented By: Dylan J. Botteicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Anna Anthros
Represented By: Charles D. Skip Davidson, Sr
Represented By: David L. Gershner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?