Jones v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Diana L Jones and Dianne L. Jones
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2020cv06041
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Barnard, Nathan)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Barnard, Nathan)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of the SSA for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Barnard, Nathan)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Barnard, Nathan)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Eric Barnard on behalf of Dianne L. Jones. (Barnard, Nathan)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Nathan E. Barnard is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 27, 2020. (ljl)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Nathan Barnard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2149082) by Dianne L. Jones. (Gallo, Meghan)
May 12, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney listed on Complaint #1 is not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas: Nathan E. Barnard. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (mll)
April 24, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Susan O. Hickey and Honorable Barry A. Bryant, as the referral judge. (lw)
April 13, 2020 Complaint fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 2022343. (lw)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 consent/reassignment)(hnc)
April 9, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/13/2020.(hnc)
April 9, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney(s) listed on Complaint #1 is (are) not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:Nathan E. Barnard. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (hnc)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Dianne L Jones. (hnc) Modified Plaintiff's name on 4/10/2020 (mfr).
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Dianne L Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Unfavorable Decision, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Action)(hnc) Modified Plaintiff's name on 4/10/2020 (mfr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana L Jones
Represented By: Nathan E. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne L. Jones
Represented By: Meghan M Gallo
Represented By: Nathan Eric Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?