Pate v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Julie Pate
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2020cv06051
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Julie Pate. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit domestic return receipt)(Carroll, Shannon)
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/13/2020) (hnc).
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Andrew Saul for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #6 Order on Motion for Service,,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,. (Carroll, Shannon)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to William Barr for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #6 Order on Motion for Service,,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,. (Carroll, Shannon)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Mark Webb for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #6 Order on Motion for Service,,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,. (Carroll, Shannon)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 11, 2020. (mjm)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Julie Pate. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Carroll, Shannon)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Reassingment Form)(lw)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Julie Pate. (lw)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Julie Pate. (lw)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Julie Pate.(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pate v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Pate
Represented By: Shannon Muse Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?