Hayes v. Daniel, et al
Plaintiff: Steven C. Hayes
Defendant: Nurse Jason M. Kelley, Jorge Dominicis, Dr. Thomas N. Daniel, Dr. Jeffrey Stieve, Staff Psychiatrist Eugene Y. Lee, Staff Psychiatrist Raymond K. Molden, Staff Psychiatrist Shawn M. Richard, Physician Assistant Sharonda S. Long, Dr. Larry Davis, D.D.S., Dr. Nanette Vowell, Gerard "Jerry" Boyle, Stan Wofford, Dr. Talliaferro, D.D.S., Ombudsman Charlotte Gardner, Rory Griffin, Nurse Parsons, Mail Room Supervisor Sue Alford and Dr Madison Talliaferro, D.D.S.
Case Number: 6:2020cv06058
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #9 Amended Complaint by Steven C. Hayes. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(mjm) (Main Document 17 replaced on 8/7/2020) (mjm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2020: #1 Unredacted motion) (mjm).
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Clerk is DIRECTED to add the first name of Madison to Defendant Dr. Taliaferro's name.. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 5, 2020. (klk)
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #9 Amended Complaint John Doe name is Madison Teliafero by Steven C. Hayes. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(cnn)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.ADDRESS INFORMATION PROVIDED for Gerard F. Boyle. (cnn)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 ***DISREGARD, DUPLICATE ENTRY*** THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.ADDRESS INFORMATION PROVIDED for Sue Alford. (mjm) Modified on 7/31/2020 to disregard (mjm).
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.ADDRESS INFORMATION PROVIDED for Sue Alford. (hnc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.ADDRESS INFORMATION PROVIDED for Gerard F. Broyles. (lw)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steven C. Hayes. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lw)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Steven C. Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(lw)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff to submit an Amended Complaint by July 1, 2020. This Order was not returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2020.. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 9, 2020. (klk)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 7/1/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 10, 2020. (klk)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing ADC - OUACHITA RIVER UNIT to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $77.53; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (mjm)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00 Further, denying #3 Motion to Accept Long Form Civil Rights Complaint. The Clerk is directed to return the 362-page document to the Plaintiff. ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed. (Amended Complaint due by 6/30/2020). Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 9, 2020. (mjm)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Accept Long Form Civil Rights Complaint by Steven C. Hayes. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(mjm)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Steven C. Hayes. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(mjm)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Gerard "Jerry" Boyle, Thomas N. Daniel, Larry Davis, D.D.S., Jorge Dominicis, Ombudsman Charlotte Gardner, Rory Griffin, Jason M. Kelley, Eugene Y. Lee, Sharonda S. Long, Raymond K. Molden, Shawn M. Richard, Jeffrey Stieve, Talliaferro, D.D.S., Nanette Vowell, Stan Wofford, filed by Steven C. Hayes.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Daniel, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jason M. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Dominicis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Thomas N. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jeffrey Stieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff Psychiatrist Eugene Y. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff Psychiatrist Raymond K. Molden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff Psychiatrist Shawn M. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician Assistant Sharonda S. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Larry Davis, D.D.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Nanette Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard "Jerry" Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Talliaferro, D.D.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ombudsman Charlotte Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mail Room Supervisor Sue Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Madison Talliaferro, D.D.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven C. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?