Tauth v. National Park Cardiology Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Tauth, M.D.
Defendant: Hot Springs National Park Hospital Holdings, LLC, Lifepoint Health, Inc., National Park Cardiology Services, LLC, Hot Springs National Park Hospital Holdings, LLC doing business as National Park Medical Center, National Park Cardiology Services, LLC doing business as Hot Springs Cardiology Associates and Lifepoint Health, Inc. doing business as LifePoint Health
Case Number: 6:2020cv06063
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Dismiss Case. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 2, 2020. (lw)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case & Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice by Hot Springs National Park Hospital Holdings, LLC, Lifepoint Health, Inc., National Park Cardiology Services, LLC. (Waddell, William)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendants' responsive pleading is due on or before June 30, 2020. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 23, 2020. (ljl)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint by Hot Springs National Park Hospital Holdings, LLC, Lifepoint Health, Inc., National Park Cardiology Services, LLC. (Waddell, William)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.SEALED DOCUMENT by Hot Springs National Park Hospital Holdings, LLC, Lifepoint Health, Inc., National Park Cardiology Services, LLC. An Order was entered on 6/22/2020 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to #6 Order on Motion to Seal Document, #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Waddell, William)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Seal Document. Defendants are permitted to file under seal an unredacted copy of Exhibit A to their Notice of Removal. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 22, 2020. (hnc)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Petition for Temporary Restraining Order against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey Tauth, M.D.(lw) (lw).
June 18, 2020 Notice of Removal fee received: $ 400.00, Tracking Id: AARWDC-2161305. (lw)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A as to #1 Notice of Removal by Hot Springs National Park Hospital Holdings, LLC, Lifepoint Health, Inc., National Park Cardiology Services, LLC. (lw)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by All Defendants. (lw)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Garland County, AR, case number 26CV-20-729, filed by Lifepoint Health, Inc., Hot Springs National Park Hospital Holdings, LLC, National Park Cardiology Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(lw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2020: #2 State Court Petiton - UNDERSEAL, #3 Affidavit - UNDERSEAL, #4 Exhibit A - UNDERSEAL, #5 Exhibit B - UNDERSEAL, #6 Exhibit C - UNDERSEAL) (lw). Modified on 6/19/2020 to grant applicable party access(mjm).
June 16, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/18/2020 (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tauth v. National Park Cardiology Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Tauth, M.D.
Represented By: Janet L. Pulliam
Represented By: Tim Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Springs National Park Hospital Holdings, LLC
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifepoint Health, Inc.
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Cardiology Services, LLC
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hot Springs National Park Hospital Holdings, LLC doing business as National Park Medical Center
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Cardiology Services, LLC doing business as Hot Springs Cardiology Associates
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifepoint Health, Inc. doing business as LifePoint Health
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?