Edwards v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sherman Edwards
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv06083
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/20/2020. Bench Trial set for 5/17/2021 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 29, 2020. (mjm)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mortgage, #2 Exhibit 2 - Correction Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit 3 - Assignment of Mortgage)(Trammell, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (mjm)
August 7, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2195668.. (Trammell, Bradley)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed by Sherman Edwards. (Originally filed in Circuit Court of Montgomery County on 6/29/2020 in case 49cv-20-25)(mjm) Modified on 8/6/2020 to edit text (mjm).
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
August 6, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney listed on Notice of Removal, #2 is not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:Kavita Goswamy Shelat. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (mjm)
August 6, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/10/2020. (mjm)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 49cv-20-25., filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(mjm)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley E Trammell
Represented By: Kavita Goswamy Shelat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman Edwards
Represented By: Jana Carole Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?