Tunnell v. Lingo
Plaintiff: Linda Tunnell
Defendant: Lingo
Case Number: 6:2020cv06111
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Hot Springs Office
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDERS. The Court entered Orders directing Plaintiff to File an IFP application or pay the filing fee, and to submit an Amended Complaint by October 22, 2020. These Orders were not returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why she failed to obey the Orders of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 11/25/2020.. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on November 4, 2020. (klk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 10/22/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 1, 2020. (klk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. With her complaint, Plaintiff failed to submit either an in forma pauperis (IFP) application or her filing fee. For this reason, the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank Prisoner IFP application. Plaintiff is given 21 days from the date of this Order to either return the completed application to this court for review and filing or pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee and 50.00 dollar administrative fee, a total of 400.00 dollars. This case shall be subject to dismissal for failure to obey an order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to return the completed IFP application or pay the 400.00 dollar filing fee by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 10/22/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 1, 2020. (klk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
October 1, 2020 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Eastern District of Arkansas. (lw)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00852. Docket sheet received.
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to transfer immediately Ms. Tunnell's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/30/2020. (jbh) [Transferred from ared on 10/1/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lingo, filed by Linda Tunnell.(kdr) [Transferred from ared on 10/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tunnell v. Lingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Tunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?