Burke v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Victor Burke
Defendant: Bradley Industrial Construction, LLC and United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv06131
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #2 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by United Healthcare Insurance Company.(Brodzik, James)
November 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Keenan Ryan on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Ryan, Daniel)
November 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Brodzik on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Brodzik, James)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have through January 4, 2021 to file. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 25, 2020. (mcc)
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 , #9 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Daniel K. Ryan and James N. Brodzik are directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter appearances in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 25, 2020. (mcc)
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Bradley Industrial Construction, LLC by Victor Burke. (Lacy, Brandon)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Williams, A.)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Attorney JAMES M. BRODZIK to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2279269), First MOTION for Leave to Appear by Video Conference by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Williams, A.)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Attorney DANIIEL K. RYAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2279258) by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Williams, A.)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Gene Williams on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Williams, A.)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Victor Burke. United Healthcare Insurance Company served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Lacy, Brandon)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Bradley Industrial Construction, LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to United HealthCare Insurance Company and Bradley Industrial Construction, LLC for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Bradley Industrial Construction, LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2269756), filed by Victor Burke.(Lacy, Brandon)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Victor Burke. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Burke
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Industrial Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: A. Gene Williams
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?