Moore v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Emily Moore
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2021cv06020
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Filing 11 ADDENDUM by Emily Moore to #10 Supplement Return Receipt - US Attorney General.. (Coleman, Nicholas)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Emily Moore to #9 Summons Returned Executed as to USA SSA Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Coleman, Nicholas)
February 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Moore. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Coleman, Nicholas)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to US District Attorney, Eastern District of Arkansas; Office of Chief Regional Counsel, SSA; Attorney General of the United States for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Coleman, Nicholas)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ( Filing Fee due by 2/23/2021). Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 9, 2021. (cnn)
February 9, 2021 Complaint filing fee paid re #2 Complaint : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2331731.. (Coleman, Nicholas)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Emily Moore. (Coleman, Nicholas)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Emily Moore. (Attachments: #1 Supplement AO 240)(Coleman, Nicholas)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 2/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(jlm)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Emily Moore against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Emily Moore.(Coleman, Nicholas)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Emily Moore. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (jlm)
February 8, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Robert T. Dawson and Honorable Barry A. Bryant, as the referral judge. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Moore
Represented By: Nicholas Lynn Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?