Jefferson v. John Doe Jail Doctor et al
Plaintiff: Andre Jefferson
Defendant: John Doe Jail Doctor, Nurse B. Johnson, Nurse Betty Doe and Chief Elrod
Case Number: 6:2021cv06111
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT in toto #4 Report and Recommendations. Further, Plaintiff's #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Andre Jefferson, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 7, 2021. (mjm)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Not Here. Mail originally sent to Andre Jefferson at Garland County Detention Center - 3564 Albert Pike Road, Hot Springs AR including #4 Report and Recommendations. No new address available. New Address due by 9/23/2021. (mjm)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Andre Jefferson. Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2021. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 17, 2021. (jlm)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Amended Complaint due by 8/3/2021. Completed IFP due by 8/3/2021. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 12, 2021. (jlm)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Betty Doe, Elrod, John Doe Jail Doctor, B. Johnson, filed by Andre Jefferson.(jlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. John Doe Jail Doctor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Jail Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Betty Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Elrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?