Lemus v. Agents Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Angel Lemus
Defendant: Agents Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv06116
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Agents Mutual Insurance Company re Set/Reset Hearings . (Hodges, David)
March 22, 2022 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Agents Mutual Insurance Company. (Hodges, David)
March 16, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Agents Mutual Insurance Company re Set/Reset Hearings . (Hodges, David)
March 14, 2022 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #16 Motion to Continue. The case is moved from the previous trial setting of April 18, 2022 to August 15, 2022. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 14, 2022. (apm)
March 14, 2022 Reset Hearing per 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/15/2022 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. (mjm)
March 13, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial by Angel Lemus. (Hurst, Josh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 15 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Agents Mutual Insurance Company. (Hodges, David)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Dismiss Case. The parties are hereby ORDERED to meet by 3/15/2022 to discuss rescheduling deadlines set forth in the Court's Final Scheduling Order (ECF No. 8) in order for the parties to resolve this case as soon as possible. The parties shall submit a joint report by March 22, 2022. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 23, 2022. (jlm)
February 1, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice filed by Angel Lemus. (Hurst, Josh)
January 18, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice by Agents Mutual Insurance Company. (Hodges, David)
January 18, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice by Agents Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ADefendants Initial Disclosures submitted to Plaintiff on October 1, 2021, #2 Exhibit BOctober 5, 2021, letter from Defendants attorney to Plaintiffs attorney attempting to confer about missing disclosures, #3 Exhibit CNovember 4, 2021, letter from Defendants attorney to Plaintiffs attorney attempting to confer about missing disclosures, #4 Exhibit DDefendants Responses to Plaintiffs Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents sent to Plaintiff on November 9, 2021, #5 Exhibit E--November 23, 2021, letter from Defendants attorney to Plaintiffs attorney attempting to confer)(Hodges, David)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Motion to Compel pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(f). Plaintiff is hereby ordered to submit initial disclosures to Defendant. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 20, 2021. (apm)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel by Agents Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2)(Hodges, David)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/18/2022 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 18, 2021. (jlm)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Agents Mutual Insurance Company. (Hodges, David)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/18/2021. Jury Trial set for 4/18/2022 09:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson.. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 22, 2021. (mjm)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Agents Mutual Insurance Company. (Originally filed in Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas on 7/22/2021 in case number 55-cv-21-52)(jlm)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Agents Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Angel Lemus. (Originally filed in Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas on 7/2/2021 in case number 55-cv-21-52)(jlm)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Pike County, Arkansas, case number 55CV-21-52, filed by Agents Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Documents)(jlm)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Agents Mutual Insurance Company. (jlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemus v. Agents Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Lemus
Represented By: Josh Q. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agents Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: David Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?