Woods v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Lisa Woods
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2021cv06123
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Woods. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Long, Martin)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Lisa Woods. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Long, Martin)
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to United States Attorney for the Western District of Arkansas for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Appearance, #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,, Order on Motion for Service,, #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service, #4 Notice (Other), #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons for US Attorney General, #2 Supplement Summons for Office of the General Counsel)(Long, Martin)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Lisa Woods. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Long, Martin)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; granting #5 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 20, 2021. (mjm)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(jlm)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Lisa Woods. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit IFP Affidavit)(Long, Martin)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Lisa Woods Certificate of Interested Persons (Long, Martin)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Long on behalf of Lisa Woods. (Long, Martin)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Lisa Woods.(Long, Martin)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lisa Woods. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (jlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Woods
Represented By: Martin Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?