Nolen v. Cash et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Terrail Nolen
Defendant: Sheriff Mike Cash and John Doe Officers
Case Number: 6:2021cv06151
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Barry A Bryant
2 Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint by December 10, 2021. This Order was not returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 2/4/2022.. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on January 14, 2022. (klk)
December 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address for Thomas Nolen. Documents that have previously been returned are being resent including #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). (mjm)
December 7, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender. Mail originally sent to Thomas Terrail Nolen at ADC - Ouachita River Unit, P. O. Box 1630 Malvern, AR 72104 including #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) filed by Thomas Terrail Nolen. No new address available. New Address due by 1/6/2022. (mjm)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing ADC - OUACHITA RIVER UNIT to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (mjm)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 30, 2021. (klk)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Thomas Terrail Nolen. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mjm)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Further, DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed.(Amended Complaint due by 12/10/2021; Completed IFP due by 12/10/2021). Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on November 18, 2021. (mjm)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Thomas Terrail Nolen. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mjm)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Mike Cash, John Doe Officers, filed by Thomas Terrail Nolen.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolen v. Cash et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Terrail Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Mike Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?