Ellis v. PLD Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Ellis
Defendant: PLD Transport, Inc., Lee Lucy and Lynn Lucy
Case Number: 6:2021cv06159
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jacquelyn Ellis. (Ford, Daniel)
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/15/2022, 9:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 5, 2022. (lw)
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Lee Lucy, Lynn Lucy, PLD Transport, Inc..(Keech, Kevin)
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Lee Lucy, Lynn Lucy, PLD Transport, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to PLD Transport, Inc., Lee Lucy and Lynn Lucy for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Sanford, Josh)
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Lee Lucy, Lynn Lucy, PLD Transport, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2511210), filed by Jacquelyn Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join -- Jacquelyn Ellis)(Sanford, Josh)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jacquelyn Ellis. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. PLD Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Ellis
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Daniel Demotte Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLD Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P. Keech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Lucy
Represented By: Kevin P. Keech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Lucy
Represented By: Kevin P. Keech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?