Guyton v. JIABAO, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lacy Guyton
Defendant: JIABAO, Inc and Yi Zhang
Case Number: 6:2021cv06165
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by JIABAO, Inc, Yi Zhang.(Hurst, Josh)
January 31, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: JIABAO, Inc answer due 2/22/2022; Yi Zhang answer due 2/22/2022. (cnn)
January 31, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants shall have until no later than February 22, 2022 to file. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 31, 2022. (apm)
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF Motion re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Lacy Guyton. (Qualls, Colby)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Yi Zhang. (jlm)
January 11, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lacy Guyton. Yi Zhang served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Sanford, Josh)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lacy Guyton. JIABAO, Inc served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Sanford, Josh)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to JIABAO, Inc, Yi Zhang and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Jiabao, Inc., and Yi Zhang for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Sanford, Josh)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JIABAO, Inc, Yi Zhang ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2514556), filed by Lacy Guyton.(Sanford, Josh)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lacy Guyton. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guyton v. JIABAO, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacy Guyton
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Colby Qualls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIABAO, Inc
Represented By: Josh Q. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yi Zhang
Represented By: Josh Q. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?