Glover v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Harold Glover
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and New York Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2022cv06001
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1362 ERISA
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Life Insurance Company of North America - answer due 4/2/2022; New York Life Insurance Company - answer due 4/2/2022. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 3, 2022. (mjm)
March 3, 2022 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Daniel K. Ryan is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 3, 2022. (ljl)
March 3, 2022 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. James M. Brodzik is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 3, 2022. (ljl)
March 2, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2552016) by Life Insurance Company of North America, New York Life Insurance Company. (Williams, A.)
March 2, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney James M. Brodzik to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2552006) by Life Insurance Company of North America, New York Life Insurance Company. (Williams, A.)
March 2, 2022 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America, New York Life Insurance Company. (Williams, A.)
March 2, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Gene Williams on behalf of All Defendants. (Williams, A.)
March 2, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Party New York Life Insurance Company by Harold Glover. (Webb, Daniel)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Harold Glover and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
January 6, 2022 Complaint fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 2519692. (lw)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to New York Life Insurance Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Webb, Daniel)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Life Insurance Company of North America for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Webb, Daniel)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Harold Glover.(Webb, Daniel)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Harold Glover. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mjm)
January 3, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 1/5/2022.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Glover
Represented By: Daniel Allen Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: A. Gene Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Gene Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?