Richard v. Covenant Recovery et al
Plaintiff: Christopher W. Richard
Defendant: Covenant Recovery, Program Director Bryan Donoho and Jeremy Mckenzie
Case Number: 6:2024cv06160
Filed: December 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2025 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Christopher W. Richard. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2025. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on January 27, 2025. (bjb)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; ORDER DIRECTING that a/an Amended Complaint be filed.(Amended Complaint due by 1/15/2025). Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on December 12, 2024. (jlm)
December 11, 2024 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY Complaint to align parties(jlm)
December 10, 2024 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
December 10, 2024 Filing 3 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Christopher W. Richard. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A Bryant.(jlm)
December 10, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Christopher W. Richard. (jlm)
December 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Covenant Recovery, Bryan Donoho and Jeremy Mckenzie, filed by Christopher W. Richard.(jlm) Modified text on 12/11/2024 (hnc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard v. Covenant Recovery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covenant Recovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Program Director Bryan Donoho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Mckenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher W. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?