Boyd v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Boyd
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and LifePoint Corporate Services, General Partnership
Case Number: 6:2025cv06008
Filed: January 15, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2025 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Donovan, David)
February 13, 2025 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Donovan, David)
January 27, 2025 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Cathy Boyd. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 1/24/2025, answer due 2/14/2025. (Lacy, Brandon)
January 23, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Donovan on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Donovan, David)
January 17, 2025 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
January 16, 2025 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to LifePoint Corporate Services, General Partnership, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb)
January 16, 2025 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America and LifePoint Corporate Services, General Partnership for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
January 16, 2025 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against LifePoint Corporate Services, General Partnership, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AARWDC-3115527), filed by Cathy Boyd.(Lacy, Brandon)
January 15, 2025 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cathy Boyd. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (tmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Boyd
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifePoint Corporate Services, General Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?