American Bioscience v. Baker Norton, et al
Plaintiff: American Bioscience, Inc
Defendant: Zenith Goldline Pharmaceuticals Inc, Ivax Corporation, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 2:2000cv09589
Filed: September 7, 2000
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Mariana R Pfaelzer
Referring Judge: Andrew J Wistrich
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2003. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2003 Filing 98 JOINT STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice (el)
January 7, 2003 JOINT STIPULATION of DISMISSAL with prejudice (el)
January 7, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer granting motion to vacate memo opinion and order granting partial summary jgm [93-1] The court's order of January 11, 2002, as well as its order of March 7, 2002, denying reconsideration of the January 11 order, are hereby vacated terminating case (MD JS-6) (bg)
January 6, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTES: Hrg on plaintiff's motion to vacate memo opinion and order granting partial summary jgm [93-1] The Court finds that there is a basis to grant the motion and informs counsel that the propsed order previously submitted shall be executed by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer CR: Emma Lestro (el)
January 2, 2003 Filing 95 RESPONSE by IVAX defendants/counter-claimanta to motion to vacate memo opinion and order granting partial summary jgm [93-1] (el)
December 16, 2002 Filing 94 DECLARATION of ANDREA B HASEGAWA IN SUPPORT by plaintiff American Bioscience re motion to vacate memo opinion and order granting partial summary jgm [93-1] (pj)
December 16, 2002 Filing 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff American Bioscience to vacate memo opinion and order granting partial summary jgm ; motion hearing set for 10:00 1/6/03 Lodged proposed order (pj)
November 20, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer that the Court vacate its scheduling order with respect tot he summ jgm mottions pending hte completion of the sttlmnt negotiations (see doc for more details) (el)
October 1, 2002 Filing 91 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by plaintiff American Bioscience withdrawing motion for entry of separate judgment [86-1] (pj)
October 1, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 90 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Baker Norton, counter-claimant Baker Norton by Matthew W Buttrick. Designating Bruce A Wessel as local counsel. Approved by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer . (Fee pd) (pj)
September 30, 2002 Filing 89 REPLY by plaintiff American Bioscience in suppt to motion for entry of separate judgment [86-1] (pj)
September 23, 2002 Filing 88 RESPONSE by defendant Ivax Corporation to ABI's motion for entry of separate judgment [86-1] (el)
September 18, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer that hearing on ABI's motion for entry of separate judgment [86-1] is set on 10:00 10/7/02 and serve ABI cnsl by messenger; fur stipulated that IVAX will file an opp br to the motion on 9/23/02 and ABI will file a reply br, if necessary on 9/30/02 (el)
September 4, 2002 Filing 86 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by American Bioscience for entry of separate judgment ; motion hearing set for 10:00 9/10/02; Lodged propsd ord; propsd final jgm (el)
August 7, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer that dfts motion for leave to file 1st Amd Counterclaim was heard on 8/5/02. The Crt having considered the mot, the pldgs in suppt of & in opp the mot, & having considered the oral argument of cnsl, IT IS ORDERED that the motion for lv to file 1st amended counterclaim [77-1] is DENIED. (jp)
August 6, 2002 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED: [Proposed] Scheduling Order; Lodged 08/05/02 (jp)
August 5, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer that after having reviewed the ptys' Joint Rule 26(F) Report, the IN COURT HEARING RE: Summ Jgm mots to be heard on 10:00 12/16/02; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10:00 4/28/03 ; Trial: 5/5/03 at 9:00 a.m. (el)
August 5, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTES: Crt hears argument and DENIES part adding indiv to complaint and takes part adding two causes of actn under submission. The Court will issue order re motion for leave to file 1st Amd Counterclaim [77-1]; COURT sets IN COURT HEARING RE: Summ Jgm motions set on 10:00 12/5/02; trial in this matter set on 9:00 5/5/03 ; the Court fur orders the attys to meet and confer immediately after hrg and amd the propsd sched order to reflect the above agreed upon dates and to select a pretrial date by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer CR: Donna FitzSimons (el)
July 24, 2002 Filing 82 MINUTES: In chambers - The Cpurt continues hearing on dft's motion for leave to file 1st Amd Counterclaim [77-1] to 10:00 8/5/02. This continuance does not ext the time for filing opp or reply papers by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer CR: N/A (el)
July 23, 2002 Filing 81 REPLY by defendants in suppt of motion for leave to file 1st Amd Counterclaim [77-1] (el)
July 19, 2002 Filing 80 PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR SUMM JGM MOTIONS filed by plaintiff American Bioscience, counter-defendant American Bioscience (el)
July 15, 2002 Filing 79 OPPOSITION by plaintiff American Bioscience to motion for leave to file 1st Amd Counterclaim [77-1] (pj)
July 3, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer that the hearing on motion for leave to file 1st Amd Counterclaim [77-1] is continued to 10:00 7/29/02; Fur Stip that ABI will file an opp br on 7/15/02 and IVAX will file a reply br on 7/22/02 (el) Modified on 07/08/2002
July 1, 2002 PLACED IN FILE - NOT USED re Final jgm as to cmp and cournt 1 of counterclaims (el)
June 25, 2002 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEM OF PA in suppt by counter-claimant Baker Norton, counter-claimant Zenith Goldline, counter-claimant Ivax Corporation for leave to file 1st Amd Counterclaim ; motion hearing set for 10:00 7/15/02 (el)
April 22, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTES: status conference held Cnsl discuss their theories of the case. Crt directs cnsl to lodge an ord re dates. Dates for filing moitons, incl dispositive motions and a date for trl shall be incl in the order by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer CR: Deborah Gackle (el)
April 18, 2002 Filing 75 JOINT RULE 26 DISCOVERY PLAN filed; est length of trial 50-70 hours (el)
March 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Wm. M. Byrne that this stipulated protective order is hereby approved and entered, and shall govern discovery proc(s) in this actn. (el)
March 6, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer that ABI's motion for reconsideration is GRANTED with regard to the evid re the skill in the art of administering Taxol prior to 1993. However as to the remaining grounds asserted for reconsideration, the mot is DENIED. The Crt's decision invalidating every asserted clm of ABI's '331 patent stands (ENT 3/7/02) Send/Ntc (el)
March 4, 2002 Filing 72 JOINT MOTION/STIPULATION filed for entry of stipulated protective order ; Lodged PROTO (el)
February 20, 2002 Filing 70 MINUTES: In chambers: Cnsl notified that the Crt will iss a ruling on mot for recon; taking motion for reconsideration of the Crt's Mem of Decision granting summ jgm of invalidity [64-1] off calendar and the matter stands submitted; fur, the Crt on its own mot continues status conference for 10:00 4/22/02 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer (el)
February 19, 2002 Filing 71 REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT by plaintiff American Bioscience of its motion for reconsideration of the Crt's Mem of Decision granting summ jgm of invalidity [64-1] (el)
February 11, 2002 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM filed by dfts/cntclmnts Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation in opposition to motion for reconsideration the Crt's Mem of Decision granting summ jgm of invalidity [64-1] (el)
January 28, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer that the status conference is cont to 10:00 2/25/02 ; No fur continuances on any ground (el)
January 25, 2002 Filing 67 WITHDRAWAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by defendants Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation withdrawing w/o prej of ex parte application to shorten delay of FDA approval for failure to coop [59-1] (jp)
January 22, 2002 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Steven H Sklar authenticating exhs in suppt by plaintiff American Bioscience re motion for reconsideration of the Crt's Mem of Decision granting summ jgm of invalidity [64-1] (el)
January 22, 2002 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff American Bioscience of motion for reconsideration of the Crt's Mem of Decision granting summ jgm of invalidity [64-1] (el)
January 22, 2002 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff American Bioscience for reconsideration of the Crt's Mem of Decision granting summ jgm of invalidity ; motion hearing set for 10:00 2/25/02 (el)
January 18, 2002 Filing 63 OPPOSITION by plaintiff American Bioscience to dfts' ex parte application to shorten delay of FDA approval for failure to coop [59-1], ex parte application for entry of final judgment [59-2] (el)
January 18, 2002 Filing 62 MINUTES: The Crt sets a status conference set for 1:00 1/25/02 , in Courtroom 12, 312 S Spring Street by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer CR: N/A (el)
January 16, 2002 Filing 61 DECLARATION of William L Mentlik by dfts Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation re ex parte application to shorten delay of FDA approval for failure to coop [59-1], ex parte application for entry of final judgment [59-2] (el)
January 16, 2002 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Bruce A Wessel by dfts Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation re ex parte application to shorten delay of FDA approval for failure to coop [59-1], ex parte application for entry of final judgment [59-2] (el)
January 16, 2002 Filing 59 EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by dfts Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation to shorten delay of FDA approval for failure to coop , and for entry of final judgment ; Lodged Final jgm (el)
January 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer that dfts' Renewed motion for partial summary judgment of invalidity [40-1], is GRANTED as to all the claims asserted; finding the stip to ext time to answer complaint [1-1] as [11-1] moot. (ENT 1/14/02) PSend/Ntc (el)
December 27, 2001 Filing 57 RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 12/3/01 CR: Laura Elias (dlu)
December 27, 2001 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 12/3/01 (dlu)
December 3, 2001 Filing 56 MINUTES: Case called; that the Crt takes dfts' motion for partial summary judgment of invalidity [40-1] under submission by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer CR: Laura Elias (el)
November 30, 2001 Filing 55 SURREPLY by plaintiff American Bioscience to dfts' renewed motion for partial summary judgment of invalidity [40-1] (el)
November 27, 2001 Filing 54 CORRECTED REPLY Memo of Dfts by defendant Baker Norton, defendant Zenith Goldline, defendant Ivax Corporation re in support of [40-1]; declarations of Carolyn Wahrman and Diane Collett. (pbap)
November 19, 2001 Filing 53 REPLY MEMORANDUM by dfts Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation in support of their renewed motion for partial summary judgment of invalidity [40-1]; Decl of Carolyn Wahrman and Diane Collett (el)
November 19, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): The Crt by its own motion continues the hrg on mot for partial summ jgm [40-1] to 12/3/01 at 10:00; Furthermore, the Crt deems moot dfts Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline & Ivax Corp Ex Parte Appl for an order setting hrg on shortened time for dfts' mot for partial summ jgm [43-1] by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer; CR: (not present) (PSEND) (nhac)
November 13, 2001 Filing 51 STMT OF GENUINE ISSUES of Material Fact in opp by plaintiff American Bioscience to IVAX's renewed motion for partial summary judgment of invalidity [40-1] (el)
November 13, 2001 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM of PA filed by American Bioscience in opposition to dfts' renewed motion for partial summary judgment of invalidity [40-1] (el)
November 13, 2001 Filing 49 REPLY by Baker Norton in suppt of ex parte application for ord setting hearing on shortened time for dfts' mot for partial summ jgm of invalidity [43-1] (el)
November 9, 2001 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff American Bioscience on 11/9/01 of Reply in suppt of ex parte not to shorten time served on William L Mentlik, Richard M Cooper, JB Shapiro and Bruce A Wessel by facsimile (el)
November 9, 2001 Filing 47 REPLY by plaintiff American Bioscience in suppt of plf's opp to dfts' ex parte application for ord setting hearing on shortened time for dfts' mot for partial summ jgm of invalidity [43-1] (el)
November 8, 2001 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Sean K Lokey in suppt by dfts Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation re ex parte application for ord setting hearing on shortened time for dfts' mot for partial summ jgm of invalidity [43-1] (el)
November 8, 2001 Filing 43 EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by dfts Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation for ord setting hearing on shortened time for dfts' mot for partial summ jgm of invalidity ; Lodged order (el)
November 7, 2001 Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff American Bioscience on 11/7/01 of Opp to dft's ex parte appl for order shortening time served on (see service lisrt) by fax (el)
November 7, 2001 Filing 45 OPPOSITION by plaintiff American Bioscience to ex parte application for ord setting hearing on shortened time for dfts' mot for partial summ jgm of invalidity [43-1] (el)
October 29, 2001 Filing 42 DECLARATION of William L Mentlik in suppt by dfts Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation re motion for partial summary judgment of invalidity [40-1] (el)
October 29, 2001 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF PA IN SUPPORT by dfts Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation of motion for partial summary judgment of invalidity [40-1] (el)
October 29, 2001 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by dfts Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation for partial summary judgment of invalidity ; motion hearing set for 10:00 11/26/01; Lodged State of UFCL; prop order (el)
October 5, 2001 Filing 39 RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS Submitted To Exhibits Custodian filed. Submitted to Custodian; Exceptions: Demo Exhibit "B" withdrawn (jp)
September 7, 2001 Filing 38 EXHIBIT AND WITNESS list submitted (pj)
August 31, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re Partial Claim Construction by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer that the Crt holds the fol: the term "sufficient quantity of taxane" needs no construction; the clause "wherein said formulation is useful for the reduction of serum testosterone levels in a subject" is a substantive limitation; the term "vessel" means "container."; the term "pharmaceutically acceptable" means "acceptable for admin."; the term "unit dosage form" means "a vessel containing a sufficient quantity of taxane to allow systematic admin at a dose in the ranges specified to clms 31 and 41 respectively over an admin period of less than 3 hrs. (SEND) (el)
August 8, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 36 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for plaintiff American Bioscience by Robert F Green. Designating Carlton A Varner as local counsel. Approved by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer . (Fee pd) (SEND) (el)
July 19, 2001 Filing 35 ERRATA by plaintiff American Bioscience to its' Opening Claim Construction memo (ir)
July 13, 2001 Filing 34 COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS in suppt of American Bioscience Inc's Claim Construction Memo & Certification of Steven H Sklar (ir)
July 13, 2001 Filing 33 REPLY Claim Construction memo by plaintiff American Bioscience (ir)
July 13, 2001 Filing 32 EXHIBITS to Claim Construction reply brief [31-1] fld by Dfts Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals Inc, Zenith Goldline Pharamaceuticals Inc & Ivax Corp (ir)
July 13, 2001 Filing 31 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY brief by defendants Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation (ir)
July 12, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 30 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for plaintiff American Bioscience by Steven H Sklar. Designating Carlton A. Varner as local counsel. Approved by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Fee pd) (ir)
July 10, 2001 Filing 28 MINUTES: PREHEARING TELEPHONIC CONF; Crt & cnsl discuss claim construction hrg & briefing sched. Cnsl for Plf re cont of the claim construction hrg now set for 7/24/01; Crt grants req & ord Claim Construction hrg cont to 10:00 8/14/01 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer CR: Lena Villegas (ir)
July 9, 2001 Filing 27 EXHIBITS to the Opening Claim Construction brief [26-1] for Dfts Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals Inc, Zenith Goldline Pharmaceuticals Inc & Ivax Corporation (ir)
July 9, 2001 Filing 26 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF FILED by defendants Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation (ir)
July 9, 2001 Filing 25 COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS in suppto f Americfan Bioscience Inc's Claim Construction Memo [24-1] (ir)
July 9, 2001 Filing 24 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION memo fld by American Bioscience Inc's (ir)
July 6, 2001 Filing 23 EXPLANATORY Addendum to Stip to cont Claim Construction Hrg fld by Plf (ir)
July 5, 2001 Filing 29 MINUTES: by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer; In light of the parties failure to file timely br the crt grants a one wk cont. The clm construcion hrging is now set for 7/24/01 ! 11am. A telephonice prehrging w/be held on Tuesday 7/10/01 @ 11am. CR: NA P SND (yc)
June 15, 2001 Filing 22 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION Prehearing statement (ir)
June 11, 2001 LODGED APPLICATION for Non-resident atty Steven H. Sklar to appear pro hac vice submitted by plaintiff American Bioscience (FWD TO CRD) (ir)
May 22, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer that Dft's motion for partial summary judgment of invalidity [18-1] now set for 6/4/01 is off calendar @ this time & it is fur ord that a Claim Construction hrg be held to resolve all relevant disputes re the interpretation of claim limitations in US Patent No 6,096,331; Crt will consider the constructions propsd by ptys according to the following claim construction sched: On 5/25/01 ptys shalll exchange a list of claim terms, phrases, or clauses that ea ptys contends should be construed by Crt, also identifying any claim elements that it contends should be governed by 35 USC subsection 112 paragraph 6; On 6/4/01 ptys shall simultaneously exchange a preliminary propsd construction of ea claim term, phrase or clause that ptys collectively have identified for claim construction purposes; On 6/15/01 ptys shall complete & file a Joint Claim Constructions & Prehearing Stmt, which shall contain the following info (See doc for fur details); 10 days after filing the Joint Claims Constructions & Prehearing Stmt, ea pty shall serve & file an opening brief & any evidence suppt its claims construction; NLT 10 days after serving & filing its opening brief, ea pty may file a reply brief in suppt of its claim construction; Crt will hold a Claim Construction hrg on 7/17/01. The length of this hrg will be determined @ or shortly after the Prehearing Conf (SEND) (ir)
May 10, 2001 Filing 20 DECLARATION of William L. Mentlik by defendants Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation re motion for partial summary judgment of invalidity [18-1] (ir)
May 10, 2001 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM of PA by defendants Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation in support of their motion for partial summary judgment of invalidity [18-1] (ir)
May 10, 2001 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendants Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation for partial summary judgment of invalidity ; motion hearing set for 10:00 6/4/01; Lodged Propsd Stmt & Ord (ir)
April 10, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 17 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendants/counter-claimants Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Zenith Goldline Pharmaceuticals Inc by Jay B Shapiro. Designating Bruce A. Wessel as local counsel. Approved by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Fee pd) (ir)
April 4, 2001 RESPONSE by Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jay B Shapiro for intervenors Baker & Zenith ; PHV fee: paid (lc)
December 13, 2000 Filing 16 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM [12-2] by counter-defendant American Bioscience Inc (bg)
November 30, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Baker Norton, defendant Zenith Goldline by William L Mentlik . Designating Bruce A Wessel as local counsel. Approved by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer . (Fee pd) (bg)
November 30, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Baker Norton, defendant Zenith Goldline by Rou H Wepner . Designating Bruce A Wessel as local counsel. Approved by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer . (Fee pd) (bg)
November 28, 2000 LODGED appl of non resident atty William L Mentlik submitted by defendant Baker Norton, defendant Zenith Goldline (FWD TO CRD) (bg)
November 28, 2000 LODGED appl of non resident atty Roy H Wepner submitted by defendant Baker Norton, defendant Zenith Goldline (FWD TO CRD) (bg)
November 20, 2000 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Baker Norton, defendant Zenith Goldline, defendant Ivax Corporation (bg)
November 20, 2000 Filing 12 ANSWER to complaint [1-1] and COUNTERCLAIM by defendant Baker Norton, defendant Zenith Goldline, defendant Ivax Corporation against plaintiff American Bioscience ; summons not issued (bg)
November 9, 2000 Filing 11 STIPULATION filed to extend time to answer complaint [1-1] to 11/20/00 as to defendant Ivax Corporation (bg)
October 25, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Baker Norton, defendant Zenith Goldline by Michael H Teschner. Designating Bruce A Wessel as local counsel. Approved by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer . (Fee Pd) (bg)
October 19, 2000 LODGED Appl of Non-Resident Atty Michael H Teschner to appear in a specific case submitted by defendant Baker Norton, defendant Zenith Goldline, defendant Ivax Corporation (FWD TO CRD) (ir)
October 18, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendants Baker Norton, Zenith Goldline, Ivax Corporation by Paul H Kochanski. Designating Bruce A Wessel as local counsel. Approved by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Fee pd) (ir)
October 12, 2000 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements filed (yl)
October 12, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER transferring civil action under GO 224/3.1 by Judge Wm. M. Byrne Case reassigned from Judge Wm. M. Byrne to Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer for all further proceedings Case now reads as CV 00-9589 MRP (AJWx) (cc: all counsel) (rn)
October 6, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 (Related Case) filed. [ Related Case no.: CV 00-8577 WMB (AJWx)] Case transferred from Judge A. H. Matz to Judge Wm. M. Byrne for all further proceedings. , Case referred from Discovery Jeffrey W. Johnson to Discovery Andrew J. Wistrich . The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge [ CV 00-9589 WMB (AJWx)] (cc: all counsel) (rn)
October 3, 2000 Filing 7 MINUTES: CONFERENCE CALL (IN CHAMBERS) In chambers & off rec, ; telephone conference held ; Crt informs cnsl it would resolve the low number iss & possibly tranfer this case to Judge Pfaelzer; No new dates are sched at this time by Judge Wm. M. Byrne CR: Not Present (ir)
September 27, 2000 Filing 4 MINUTES: CONFERENCE CALL (IN CHAMBERS) In chambers & off rec, conf call hld. Cnsl disc status of the case & Crt sched a fur ; telephone conference set on 10:30 10/3/00 by Judge Wm. M. Byrne CR: Not Present (SEND) (ir)
September 11, 2000 Filing 3 NOTICE by plaintiff American Bioscience of related case(s) CV 8577 WMB (AJWx) (kc)
September 11, 2000 NOTICE PHV Appl mailed to atty Robert F Green on 9/11/00 (pc)
September 7, 2000 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff American Bioscience (pc)
September 7, 2000 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Summons(es) Issued referred to Discovery Jeffrey W. Johnson; Jury Demand (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Bioscience v. Baker Norton, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenith Goldline Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael H Teschner
Represented By: Roy H Wepner
Represented By: Jay B Shapiro
Represented By: William L Mentlik
Represented By: Bruce A Wessel
Represented By: Paul H Kochanski
Represented By: Charles C Cavanagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivax Corporation
Represented By: Roy H Wepner
Represented By: William L Mentlik
Represented By: Bruce A Wessel
Represented By: Paul H Kochanski
Represented By: Charles C Cavanagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael H Teschner
Represented By: Roy H Wepner
Represented By: Jay B Shapiro
Represented By: William L Mentlik
Represented By: Bruce A Wessel
Represented By: Matthew W Buttrick
Represented By: Paul H Kochanski
Represented By: Charles C Cavanagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Bioscience, Inc
Represented By: Carlton A Varner
Represented By: Robert F Green
Represented By: Joseph Francis Coyne, Jr
Represented By: Daniel W Park
Represented By: Andrea Beth Hasegawa
Represented By: Steven H Sklar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?