T. Jeffrey Simpson, et al v. Homestore.Com, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: California State Teachers Retirement System and T Jeffrey Simpson
Defendant: AOL Time Warner Inc, Akonix Systems Inc, Cendant Corporation, CityRealty.com.Inc, Classmates Online, Inc, David Colburn, CornerHardware.com, Does 1-10, Dorado Corporation, John M Giesecke, Jr, Catherine Kwong Giffen, GlobeXplorer,Inc, Homestore.Com, Inc., Internet Pictures Corporation, Jeff Kalina, Eric Keller, L90, Sophia Losh, Allan P Merrill, PricewaterhouseCoope, Privista Inc, PromiseMark, Inc, RevBox,Inc, David M Rosenblatt, Joseph J Shew, SmartHome,Inc, Richard A Smith, Peter B Tafeen, Top Producer Systems Inc, Stuart H Wolff and Evelyn Yalung
Movant: Matt L Brody
Objector: Josephine Drucker, Ronald K Drucker and Steven F Helfand
Intervenor: Wade Koehmstedt, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Daniel Musso, Michael Myers and United States of America
Acquired By Semotus: WizShop.com Inc
Case Number: 2:2001cv11115
Filed: March 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald S.W. Lew
Presiding Judge: Carla M. Woehrle
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1409 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT STUART H. WOLFF by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. IT IS Ordered: 1. On February 24, 2011, the jury rendered its Special Verdict in favor of Lead Plaintiff California State Teachers Retirement System and the Plaintiff Class. Bas ed upon the jury's Special Verdict, and because of the application of the mandatory reduction provisions of the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, 15 U.S.C. §§ 78u-4(f)(7)(B), Lead Plaintiff California State Teachers Retirement System and the Plaintiff Class (including each member of the Plaintiff Class as defined above), and each of them, shall take nothing from defendant Stuart H. Wolff in this consolidated action; 2. The operative Second Amended and Consolidated Complain t, including each and every purported claim alleged therein against defendant Stuart H. Wolff, and this consolidated action and each of its constituent actions, are fully and finally dismissed with prejudice as against defendant Stuart H. Wolff; 3. D efendant Stuart H. Wolff shall not recover his costs of suit from Lead Plaintiff California State Teachers Retirement System as taxed by the Clerk; and, 4. Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 78u-4(c)(1), the Court finds that each party, and each attorney r epresenting Lead Plaintiff and each attorney representing defendant Stuart H. Wolff, complied with Rule 11(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to any and all complaints, responsive pleadings, dispositive motions, and other matters filed in this action. Related to: Order, 279 , Jury Verdict 1362 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER approved by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The foregoing admissions having been made by the parties, and the parties having specified the foregoing issues of fact and law remaining to be litigated, this pretrial conference order shall supersede the pleadings and govern the course of the trial of this cause, unless modified to prevent manifest injustice. (lom)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: denying 1206 Defendant Stuart H. Wolff's Motion to Continue the Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates. The Court finds that Defendant has not established that there is sufficient good cause here to continue the Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates. (lom)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 ORDER APPROVING: (1) FINAL CLASS SETTLEMENT WITH CENDANT AND RICHARD A.SMITH; (2) PLAN OF ALLOCATION; (3) AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OFEXPENSES; (4) DISTRIBUTION OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION FUNDS; AND (5) TIMING OF DISTRIBUTION: Lead Plai ntiffs Counsel are hereby granted an award of attorneys fees in the amount of $420,000.00, to be paid from the Settlement Fund. Lead Plaintiffs Counsel is hereby granted reimbursement of all expenses incurred to date, to be paid from the Settlem ent Fund received from theSettling Defendants, in the amount of $20,994.67.In addition, Lead Plaintiffscounsel may pay for the costs of notice and claims administration up to $350,000without further Court approval. Lead Plaintiffs Counsel i s authorized to pay applicable taxes and fees to tax preparers during the time it holds the settlement funds. The Court hereby allows Lead Plaintiffs Counsel to defer distributing the Settlement Fund until there can be simultaneous distribution of the other settlements, which monies are held in trust on behalf of the Class, or distribute the Cendant/Smith settlement monies separately, whichever makes the most sense from a time and cost perspective by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (lc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T. Jeffrey Simpson, et al v. Homestore.Com, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL Time Warner Inc
Represented By: Peter T Barbur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akonix Systems Inc
Represented By: Pamela J Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cendant Corporation
Represented By: Robert A Fumerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CityRealty.com.Inc
Represented By: Phillip H Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classmates Online, Inc
Represented By: Douglas J Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Colburn
Represented By: Graeme W Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CornerHardware.com
Represented By: Charles L Zetterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorado Corporation
Represented By: Stuart A Shanus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Giesecke, Jr
Represented By: Jan Lawrence Handzlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Kwong Giffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlobeXplorer,Inc
Represented By: Eric W Benisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homestore.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Louise Tomkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internet Pictures Corporation
Represented By: Thomas O Helton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Kalina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Keller
Represented By: Everett C Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L90
Represented By: Michael C Tu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophia Losh
Represented By: Nanci L Clarence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan P Merrill
Represented By: Tanya Chutkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PricewaterhouseCoope
Represented By: Lynn M Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privista Inc
Represented By: William K Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PromiseMark, Inc
Represented By: Richard J Babnick, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RevBox,Inc
Represented By: Mary T Huser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Rosenblatt
Represented By: Krista J Martinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J Shew
Represented By: Robert Harold Fairbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmartHome,Inc
Represented By: Torgny R Nilsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey H Dasteel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter B Tafeen
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Producer Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart H Wolff
Represented By: E Lawrence Barcella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Yalung
Represented By: Sharon Louise Tomkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Matt L Brody
Represented By: Nicholas Koluncich, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California State Teachers Retirement System
Represented By: Peter E Borkon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T Jeffrey Simpson
Represented By: Peter E Borkon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Josephine Drucker
Represented By: Laurie A Traktman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Ronald K Drucker
Represented By: Laurie A Traktman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Steven F Helfand
Represented By: John William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wade Koehmstedt
Represented By: Francis M Gregorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Merrill Lynch & Co Inc
Represented By: Ronda J McKaig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Daniel Musso
Represented By: Francis M Gregorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Michael Myers
Represented By: Francis M Gregorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States of America
Represented By: Michael R Wilner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Acquired by semotus: WizShop.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?