Perfect 10 Inc v. George Dranichak et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Perfect 10 Inc
Defendant: Does and George Dranichak
Case Number: 2:2004cv02581
Filed: April 13, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Referring Judge: Jennifer T. Lum
Presiding Judge: A Howard Matz
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2004 15 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz that all claims in this action between plaintiff and defendant George Dranichak shall be dismissed, with prejudice, with each of the settling parties to bear its or his own costs and attorneys fees. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)(nhac, )
October 28, 2004 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) Scheduling Conference by Judge A. Howard Matz. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on 12/20/04 at 1:30 PM. The conference will be held pursuant to FRCP 16(b). The parties are reminded of their obligations under FRCP 26(a)(1) to disclose information... See documents for further details.(nhac, )
September 28, 2004 9
MINUTES: Order Discharging Further Order to Show Cause regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution; Court DISCHARGES the order to show cause by Judge A. Howard Matz Court Reporter: Not Reported. (ir )
September 17, 2004 8
MINUTES: Further Order to Show Cause regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution; Court on its own motion, now orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than 9/29/04 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by Plaintiff, Court will accept a motion for default judgment or request for clerk to enter default judgment if it is filed on or before the above date. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff is due by Judge A Howard Matz Court Reporter: Not Reported. (ir )
July 15, 2004 6
MINUTES: Order Discharging Order to Show Cause regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution; Court DISCHARGES the order to show cause. Plaintiff is again advised that if necessary, it must pursue Rule 55 remedies promptly upon default of any defendant by Judge A. Howard Matz Court Reporter: Not Reported. (ir)
July 9, 2004 5
MINUTES: Order to Show Cause regarding Dismissal for lack of prosecution; Court on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than 7/26/04 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendans for lack of prosecution.As an alternative to a written response by Plaintiff(s) Court will accept one of the following if it is filed on or before date as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Proof of service of summons and complaint (applicable for defendant(s) who have not been served), In cases removed from State Court, responsive pleadings filed by all default, Request for entry of default by Plaintiff (s) (applicable where defendants have been served but not answered), motion for default judgment or request for clerk to enter default judgment; No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court; Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by Plaintiff(s) is due by Judge A. Howard Matz Court Reporter: Not Reported. (ir)
May 19, 2004 4 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Lourdes G. Baird, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 97-6967 LGB (SHx)(rn, )
April 14, 2004 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
INITIAL ORDER following filing of complaint assigned to Judge A Howard Matz by Judge A. Howard Matz (lc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perfect 10 Inc v. George Dranichak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Dranichak
Represented By: John A Case, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfect 10 Inc
Represented By: Daniel J Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?