Ramsdell v. Tenet Healthcare Corporation et al

Defendant: Jeffrey C Barbakow and Tenet Healthcare Corporation
Case Number: 2:2004cv03654
Filed: December 1, 2009
Court: California Central District Court
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald S.W. Lew
Referring Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: The Court hereby Orders Plaintiff, Barry D. Ramsdell, to show cause as to why the above-captioned matter should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution (re filing of a motion to re-transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts). Response to Order to Show Cause due by 12/15/2009. (jre)
September 16, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: This Order is issued pursuant to FRCP 4(m), which requires that plaintiff(s) serve the summons and complaint upon all de fendants within 120 days after filing the complaint. The Court may dismiss the action prior to the 120 days, however, if plaintiff(s) has/have not diligently prosecuted the action. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show caus e in writing no later than 9/23/2009 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept Proof of service of the Summons and Co mplaint on ALL defendants, if it is filed on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. Court Reporter: None Present. (gk) ** ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE VACATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL MINUTES OF 9/28/2009 35 ** Modified on 9/28/2009 (gk).
March 17, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by the Honorable Ronald S.W. Lew, Senior, U.S. District Court Judge. The Court orders parties to show cause in writing not later than 3/27/09 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution regarding the parties failure to submit final dismissal paperwork. (pp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramsdell v. Tenet Healthcare Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey C Barbakow
Represented By: Daniel S Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenet Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Daniel S Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?