Frederick Lee Jackson v. Michael Barnes et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv08017
Filed: September 27, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Ronald S.W. Lew
Referring Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2016 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that (1) Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Michael Barnes' liability; (2) Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to Patricia M. Murphy's and Ventura County Sheriff's Department's liability; (3) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Patricia M. Murphy's liability; and (4) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to Michael Barnes' and the Ventura County Sheriff's Department's liability. (es)
May 5, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ORDER 151 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. Magistrate Judge Zarefsky'sOrder 151 denying Plaintiff's Motion for Review isHEREBY VACATED. See order for complete details. (jre)
March 17, 2015 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate Judge Order Denying Appointment of Counsel and Stay of Proceedings, construed as Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge and Modify or Set Aside Magistrate Judge Order 139 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs Motion. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER AND COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre)
March 3, 2015 137 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH 30 DAYS LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky. (See document for details). (ib)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frederick Lee Jackson v. Michael Barnes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?