Jarek Molski v. Taco Bell Corp et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv08406
Filed: October 8, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Florence-Marie Cooper
Referring Judge: Ralph Zarefsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Jacqueline H. Nguyen. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause, in writing, why the stay should not be lifted and the mattershould not be DISMISSED in its entirely and WITH PREJUDICE by no later than July 2, 2010. Failure to respond by that date will result in this matter being DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (rrey)
February 8, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER ON TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE NGUYEN and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS by Judge Jacqueline H. Nguyen: re Transferred Case, 32 . This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN, United States Distr ict Judge. Please substitute the initials JHN in place of the initials FMC. The case number will now read: 2:04-cv-008406-JHN-RZx. Henceforth, it is imperative that the initials JHN be used on all documents to prevent any delays in processing of d ocuments. Judge Nguyen's courtroom deputy clerk is Alicia Mamer and can be reached at (213) 894-2554. Judge Nguyen's courtroom is located on the 16th floor of the Spring Steet Courthouse, Courtroom # 1600. Additional information about Jud ge Nguyen's procedures is available on her website profile ( at www.cacd.uscourts.gov).The Court, on its own motion, ORDERS that counsel for plaintiff show cause in writing on or before February 22, 2010, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the Court's previous order for regular reports. The Court will consider the filing of the following, on or before the above date, as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause:-status report pursuant to the Court s Minutes, filed on March 8, 2005 10 .Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7.11, oral argument will not be heard in this matter unless so ordered by the Court. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of counsel's response. Failure to respond to the Court's order may result in the dismissal of the action. (ama)
July 17, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS by Judge Florence-Marie Cooper: Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/31/2009. (ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarek Molski v. Taco Bell Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?