S A Thomas v. Leroy Baca et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv08448
Filed: October 12, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Stephen J. Hillman
Presiding Judge: Dean D. Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2015 1102 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:Final judgment is entered against the County of Los Angeles and in favor of (1) Steven A. Thomas and (2) Denisha Gipson, as successor in interest to Eric Gipson. Plaintiffs Thomas and Gipson shall recover from the defendant County of Los Angeles the amount of $10,000.00each, attorneys fees in the sum of $384,275, out-of- pocket costs in the sum of $45,994.99, and costs. 3. All motions pending before the court are DENIED. (lc). Modified on 2/10/2015. (lc).
February 9, 2015 1101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: OUT OF POCKET COSTS 1046 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiffs motion is GRANTED, in part. The court reduces the award of out-of-pocket litigation costs to $45,994.99. (lc). Modified on 2/10/2015. (lc).
December 19, 2014 1098 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ATTORNEY FEES 1047 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiffs Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED, in part. The court awards 100 attorney hours at the current rate, or $75,000, for counsels efforts regarding Plaintiffs related, but ulti mately unsuccessful class action claims. The court finds that Marion Yagman reasonably expended 166.5 hours on this case at a reasonable rate of $750 per hour, and awards $124,875.00. The court finds that Stephen Yagman reasonably expended 100 hours on this case as an attorney and 100 hours as a paralegal. Applying respective rates of $750 per hour and $125 per hour to that work, the court awards $87,500. The court awards $11,400 for Mr. Bostwicks efforts and $ 10,875.00 for Mr. Chemerinskys efforts. As compensation for counsels efforts in bringing about the termination of Defendants impermissible floor sleeping practices, the court awards Plaintiffs a further $75,000, for a total of $384,275. Plaintiffs separate motion for out of pocket costs will be addressed by separate order of this court. (lc). Modified on 12/19/2014. (lc).
June 20, 2014 1000 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: denying 970 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application to substitute Dwain Gipson for his deceased brother,Plaintiff Eric L. Gipson. (lc). Modified on 6/20/2014. (lc).
March 22, 2012 870 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Decertifying Damage Class 825 , 841 , 842 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. For the reasons stated above, Defendants Motion to Decertify Damages Class is GRANTED. (See Order for Details). (sch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S A Thomas v. Leroy Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?