David Grober v. Mako Products Inc et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv08604
Filed: October 18, 2004
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Stephen G. Larson
Referring Judge: Oswald Parada
Nature of Suit: Patent

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2016 593 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT ORDER by Judge Jack Zouhary. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendants in the amount of One Hundred Thirty-Two Thousand Dollars ($132,000). (See document for specifics.) (iva)
July 24, 2015 504 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Jack Zouhary. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/7/2015. (mrgo)
July 30, 2010 419 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Jack Zouhary, in favor of Air Sea Land Productions Inc, Blue Sky Aerials Inc, Cinevideotech Inc, Mako Products Inc, Spectrum Effects Inc against David Grober Related to: Stipulation for Judgment 418 . THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that final judgment be entered and that said Plaintiffs take nothing from said Defendants, and that Defendants take nothing as a result of the counterclaims. (mrgo)
November 6, 2008 257 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER SCHEDULING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS; ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF POST-MARKMAN SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF (DOCKET # 256) held before Judge Stephen G. Larson re: M OTION to Compel documents, namely emails, photographs and videos from defendant Mako 228 , MOTION to Compel Deposition of Kleins and Dann in Los Angeles and for Sanctions Against Defendant Mako 227 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Ba sed on Co-Inventorship of the Patent at Issue 217 , MOTION for Review OF DEFENDANTS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEYS EYES ONLY DESIGNATIONS, COMPELING RE-DESIGNATIONS OF ALL DOCUMENTS AND FOR SANCTIONS FOR ABUSE OF PROTECTIVE ORDER; 233 . ( Motions reset for hearing on 1/12/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen G. Larson.) (mrgo)
October 28, 2008 250 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Stephen G. Larson DENYING plaintiff's EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing for District Judge to Decide Related Discovery Motions As Part of Nov 3rd Hearing 237 . (mrgo)
October 6, 2008 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Stephen G. Larson, granting in part and denying in part the Joint Stipulation to Reschedule Markman hearing, 223 :( Markman Hearing reset on 11/3/2008 at 01:00 PM before Judge Stephen G. Larson.) The hearing on Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment hearing shall be scheduled at the time of the Markman Hearing. (mrgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Grober v. Mako Products Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?