Nikko Materials USA Inc v. Navcom Defense Electronics Inc et al
Case Number: 2:2005cv04158
Filed: June 9, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Victor B. Kenton
Presiding Judge: John F. Walter
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge John F. Walter, re Stipulation 736 . In the Report of Settlement filed on June 23, 2014, Dkt. No. 736, the parties represent that they have settled this action. As a result, the Court dismisses this action without prejudice subject to either party reopening the action on or before September 22, 2014. During this 90-day period, this Court retains full jurisdiction over this action. Thereafter, absent further order of the Court, the Clerk is ordered to dismiss this action with prejudice. All dates in this action, including the trial date are vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 735 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc., dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc., in the amount of $341,497.28, plus interest thereon at the rate of $7.58 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 729 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc., dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $479,745.07, plus interest thereon at the rate of $10.65 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 724 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc. dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $531,652.28, plus interest thereon at the rate of $11.80 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 707 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc. dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $652,350.34, plus interest thereon at the rate of $14.48 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 698 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc., dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc., in the amount of $450,997.64, plus interest thereon at the rate of $10.01 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 668 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., fka Nikko Materials USA, Inc., dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc., in the amount of $482,855.09, plus interest thereon at the rate of $10.72 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 656 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc. dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $545,294.23, plus interest thereon at the rate of $12.10 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 639 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc. dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $319,326.56, plus interest thereon at the rate of $7.09 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 619 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc. dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $400,195.76, plus interest thereon at the rate of $8,55 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (bp)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 612 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter, in favor of Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA Inc dba Gould Electronics, and against defendant Navcom Defense Electronics Inc in the amount of $276,689.47 plus interest thereon at the rate of $5.91 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (mg)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 586 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc., dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $525,306.37, plus interest thereon at the rate of $11.23 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 581 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc., dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $371,633.78, plus interest thereon at the rate of $7.94 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 576 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc. dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $412,738.73, plus interest thereon at the rate of $3.20 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 571 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc. dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $149,666.86, plus interest thereon at the rate of $3.20 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (kbr)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 565 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc. dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $33,045.04, plus interestthereon at the rate of $0.71 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 558 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc., dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc., in the amount of $73,610.03, plus interest thereon at the rate of $1.57 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 541 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc. dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant Navcom Defense Electronics Inc., in the amount of $155,261.90, plus interest thereon at the rate of $3.15 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (jp)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 535 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Materials USA, Inc. dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $395,418.51, plus interest thereon at the rate of $8.02 per diem from the date of entry of the judgment until paid. (kbr)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 514 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff Gould Electronics Inc., formerly known as Nikko Material USA, Inc. dba Gould Electronics, is hereby awarded judgment against Defendant NavCom Defense Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $2,706,889.46 for response costs paid through October 13, 2010, plus interest thereon at the rate of $154.17 per diem from October 31, 2010 until paid, plus costs, if any. (kbr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nikko Materials USA Inc v. Navcom Defense Electronics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?