Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards et al v. City of Long Beach et al
Plaintiff: Matt S Archer, David W Frazior, Brandon T Preciado, Robert D Mendoza, John R Hill, Kevin D Nelson, Brad A Scavone, Diana Hohman, Eduardo D Reyes, Jr, John Harrigan, Douglas Luther, Jason P Melvin, Mark McGuire, Sean D Deaton, David Frazior, Michael Demarco, Jeremy Boshnack, Gary S DePhillippo, Anthony M Brown, Richard Kaiser, Timothy P Hart, Timothy M Ferrill, Joseph V Bahash, Alex Angotti, Tai D Ro, Brian W Collette, John Magallanes, William D Foster, Michael K Whitcomb, Douglas Bacon, Kalid Abuhadwan, Matthew Solarski, Pablo R Orduno, Steven Jilek, David Williams, Paul Luyben, Gerardo J Perez, Tim Olson, Don P Reynolds, Laurence E Walker, Bradley M Johnson, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Rios, Johnny Miyasaki, Brent Record, Robert R Ryan, III, Dana Smith, Jason Kennedy, Thomas Vriens, Christian f Moody, Jeffrey A Meyer, Timothy L Van Coutren, Brian Dapello, James T Foster, Jacob Dillon, Blayne K Tom, Dean Piementel, Brandon N Deis, Rubi Castro, Eli L Moreno, Scott D Neal, Hilda Yvette Valenzuela, Danny Hernandez, Gregory S Eldridge, Ronald Bell, Albert Candeo, Eric Fritz, Kimberly Maddox, Jarrod M Lewis, Devin Stribich, Michael H Ham, Paul T Wright, Salvador Solorzano, Michael A Lewis, Shaleana R Benson, Bruce Lee, Robert Bernsen, Kevin T King, Shannon M Phillips, David Kofoed, Vicente Aceves, Christopher Thue, David Faris, Kenny Quaack, Eric Hooker, Roger D Montell, Jonathan A Calvert, Robert L Woods, Michael E Green, Mark L Nguyen, James R Clark, Ruben Martinez, Edward L Bonachea, Jesus Espinoza, Jeffrey NMI Garcia, Omar Martinez, Matthew Esproles, Ted Beard, Ramon Alcala, Anthony Anast, Joe P Pirooz, Travis R Muilenburg, Jayson Cochran, Ryan Watson, Dominick Scaccia, Joe Gaynor, Donald E Messer, Curtis Y Yee, Warner J Harris, Clinton A Grimes, Gamaliel Collazo, Philip Golia, Rachel Frausto, Richard Miller, Jr, Garey Bruyere, Melvin D McGuire, Daisy Ortiz, Daniel Barkwill, Troy Matsuura, Robin L Serli, Robert W Titus, II, Kevin Davis, Binh T Duong, Jr, Jose Yarruns, Claudia Lopez, David Demasi, Robert W Zottneck, Richard Carr, Isiah C Hughes, Jesus Macias, Jason M Kirk, Andre R Sanchez, Andrew Pringle, Tyrone Anderson, Dina Zapalski, Joshua S Castro, Brian Helm, Donald Mauk, Manuel Q Lopez, Christopher Silva, Ricardo Zatarain, Jorge Alberto Salazar, Jacqueline Bezart, Eric Matusak, Roque O Foster, Vaignte Marshall, Michael A Deprete, Sean Magee, Chih-Hang Chi, Victor L Thrash, Christopher G Palacios, Alexander Harris, Wayne Watson, Ralph E Robbins, Yul B Long, Donald J Goodman, Paul R Baum, Deborah M Clark, Jose R Orozco, Bo Pak, Eric Mifflin, Forrest R Andersen, David H Fritz, Delon Johns, Robert Kuroda, Jason T Ur, Gabriel Garrido, Mark W Swanson, Arthur Vega, David Jones, Adriana Jaurigui, Brian T Ekrem, Pedro Valenzuela, David Ternullo, Michael J White, Michael Hubbard, Don Kehoe, David Okerman, Kenneth M Green, Bret Milovich, William Neal, Sean E Parilla, Joel L Camrin, Larry Jones, Jonathan Ornelas, Oscar Dominguez, Jerry A Carter, Jr, Tomb T Neal, Cesar Velarde, Eric Hubbard, Felipa A Baccari, Mark Vinci, Edward Saldana, Alfredo Chairez, Heather Rebbeck, Victor Hafkenscheid, Brian T Ekern, Gordon Collier, Dianna L Anderson, James Earl Fellows, Bradley Futak, Margarit McCart, Ciaran Crawford, Tonya Kirk, Philip D Cooper, Daniel Molinar, Brian Fritz, Stephan C Ritchie, Hector H Cardiel, Eric Barich, Alex C Gassler, Ross Smillie, Jason Sean Garcia, Michael Erdelji, Derrick M Dinsmore, Christopher F Morgan, Richard Boatright, Ryan Christopher, Darren Adams, Joseph L Gludt, William B Kift, Janathan Lucero, Francisco Vasquez, Barry Miller, Timothy A Downs, Richard Chambers, Antonio G Haro, James C Newland, Byron D Blair, James H Kloss, Steven D Costa, Delmy V Morales, Ray L Alexander, Jorge Marquez, Carlos Del Real, Bradley Johnson, Francisco J Ramirez, Abram R Yap, Harry D Hampton, Bradley D Dinsdale, Richard Bell, Norman C Turley, Kevin King, Fernando Cook, Abel Morales, Gary Halliday, Douglas P Davidson, Darlene Wigmore, Ana Maria Gill, Lowe, Gregory L Schirmer, Michael L Soldin, Rocio NMI Gonzalez, Nikki R Alexander, A G Megas, Robert W Schroeder, James Stahmann, Michael D Pennino, Americo Fernandez, Luke McGee, Ryan B Lebaron, Donald Wood, Patrick J Burns, Vincent Otto, Cory J Brown, Todd Jenkins, Ramiro Herrera, Thomas Perez, Richard Birdsall, Robert B Knight, David Poss, Philip Cloughesy, Michael J Dugan, Marco Cruz, Victor Vidriales, Anthony Lopez, Songcheak Ier, Mark A Wong, Mario Aiello, Kerry R Parker, Jeff Meyer, Dana L Braak, Richard Gray, Jason Foerster, Paul Sanford, Ted W Pappas, Rodolfo Rodriguez, Kerry M Geisige, Leonard Gaeta, Kenny E Cruz, Nystedt, Lloyd Cox, Kenny Villegas, Eric M Ledesma, Peter Anderson, Alfonso Esqueda, David G Strong, Chris Nguyen, Max Jones, Aaron Alu, Joe Battle, Sr, Michael K Ogden, Rodney J Brown, Steven J Prell, Joshua Brearley, Brian P Mihkelson, Benjamin De Los Santos, Tina Louise Icorn, Paul Gallo, Michael T Beckman and James E Craig
Defendant: City of Long Beach
Case Number: 2:2005cv08990
Filed: December 29, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2012 Filing 1709 MINUTES: STATUS CONFERENCE: The parties inform the court that the settlement disbursement has been resolved by Judge George H Wu Court Reporter: Theresa Lanza. (ir) (Main Document 1709 replaced on 10/3/2012) (im). Modified on 10/3/2012 (im).
August 31, 2012 Filing 1708 REQUEST to Reopen Case For Limited Purposes of Setting Status Conference Regarding Status of Disbursement of Settlement Proceeds by Defendant City of Long Beach filed by Plaintiff David Faris. Request set for hearing on 9/17/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Reopening Instant Action for Limited Purposes of Setting Status Conference And Setting Status Conference)(Hafif, Greg)
August 31, 2012 Filing 1707 (Hafif, Greg)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1706 ORDER by Judge George H Wu : granting 1. The Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #1661 . The Court finds the settlement fair and reasonable as to all opt-in Plaintiffs. The Court adopts and incorporates its reasoning and analysis of its approval of the settlement from its October 31, 2011 Minute Order #1631 of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and its tentative ruling on the Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Defendant, City of Long Beach, is to adhere to and implement the settlement agreement approved by this Court pursuant to its specific terms and conditions. 2. All named Plaintiffs that have timely opted-out of the settlement pursuant to the Court approved Notice shall have sixty (60) days from the effective date of the Judgment to file an individual action. This Order and the Judgment shall preserve and/or toll their original statute of limitations beginning from their original opt-in date. 3. The Objection to Final Approval of Settlement filed by plaintiff John Lembi on January 3, 2012 #1647 is overruled. 4. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties, the late request to opt-out by plaintiff Derrick Dinsmore is granted. 5. The Court approves the allocation of attorneys fees and costs request of class counsel and those interested attorneys and/or firms, as fair and reasonable in the total amount of $300,000. Defendant City of Long Beach shall pay to class counsel the total sum of $300,000 in attorney fees and costs as identified in this Court's Order on Allocation of Attorney Fees and Costs #1704 . 6. Judgment is to be entered on the Settlement and the action of Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards v. City of Long Beach, USDC-Central, Case No. CV05-8990 GW (PLAx) dismissed with prejudice. (lom)
April 12, 2012 Filing 1705 JUDGMENT by Judge George H Wu. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1. The Court grants the Motion for Final Approval of the action. 2. Defendant, City of Long Beach, is to adhere to and implement the settlement agreement approved by this Court pursuant to its specific terms and conditions. 3. All named Plaintiffs that have timely opted-out of the settlement pursuant to the Court approved Notice shall have sixty (60) days from the effective date of this Judgment to file an individual action. This Judgment shall preserve and/or toll their original statute of limitations beginning from their original opt-in date.4. The Court approves and awards, and orders Defendant City of Long Beach to pay class counsel attorney's fees and costs in the total amount of $300,000, to be paid and divided amongst class counsel Law Offices of Herbert Hafif, Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh, and Gregory G. Petersen, individually, as stated within the separately filed and entered Order of the Court as to allocation of attorney's fees and costs. 5. That the action be dismissed with prejudice as to all opt-in Plaintiffs. Related to: Order #1704 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated).(lom)Related to: Order #1704 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1704 ORDER GRANTING ALLOCATION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS by Judge George H Wu.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Court finds the fee and cost request of $300,000 more than reasonable given the number of hours and work put into the case. The Court finds it has jurisdiction to rule on the matter of allocation of fees and costs pursuant to the provisions of the FLSA and its related case law. The Court finds the hourly rates and number of hours expended on the action by the lawyers and their staff reasonable. (See, Minute Order dated March 22, 2012 #1694 , attached hereto as Exhibit "A".) The Court, being in the best position to evaluate the quantity and quality of work performed by the lawyers and their firms and applying the Boeing factors (See Staton v. Boeing Co., 327 F.3d 938 (9th Cir. 2003), allocates the fees and costs of $300,000 as follows: 1. The first allocation is for advanced COSTS on the matter by the various firms and lawyers as follows: Law Offices of Herbert Hafif $78,317.23; Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh $27,561.21; and Gregory Petersen $251.54 2. The remaining portion, specifically $193,870.02, to paid for Attorney's Fees as follows: Law Offices of Herbert Hafif $116,322.00 (60%); Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh $38, 774.01 (20%); and Gregory Petersen $38,774.01 (20%). Defendant, City of Long Beach, is hereby ordered to pay the above firms and attorneys accordingly, by separate payment to each firm or attorney as ordered. re #1652 , #1646 , #1660 , #1677 . (See document for details.) [ (lom)
April 12, 2012 Filing 1703 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/22/2012 9:51 a.m. (Cuneo, Patricia)
April 12, 2012 Filing 1702 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/22/2012 9:51 a.m. Court Reporter: PAT CUNEO, CSR 1600, website: www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2012. (Cuneo, Patricia)
April 4, 2012 Filing 1701 DECLARATION of Samantha W. Zutler In Support of Defendant City of Long Beach's Compliance With 28 U.S.C. 1715 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zutler, Samantha)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1700 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order Granting Allocation of Attorneys Fees and Costs re MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 , APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Gregory G. Petersen #1652 , APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Allocation of Attorney's Fees and Costs)(Hafif, Greg)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1699 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Judgment re MOTION for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement #1661 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Judgment)(Hafif, Greg)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1698 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order Granting Motion for Final Approval of Settlement re MOTION for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement #1661 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Final Approval of Settlement)(Hafif, Greg)
March 29, 2012 Filing 1697 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT re MOTION for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement #1661 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Hafif, Greg)
March 29, 2012 Filing 1696 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING ALLOCATION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS re MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 , APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Gregory G. Petersen #1652 , APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Hafif, Greg)
March 29, 2012 Filing 1695 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT re MOTION for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement #1661 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Hafif, Greg)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1694 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL TO PROPOSED CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT (tlled 02/27/12) #1661 ; APPLICATION OF GREGORY G. PETERSEN FOR ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (filed 01/03/12) #1652 ; PLAINTIFFS OF THE LAW OFFICES OF HERBERT HAFIF'S MOTION FOR ALLOCATION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS (filed 01/03/12) #1646 ; JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS & PECKENPAUGH'S APPLICATION FOR-ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (filed 02/21/12) #1660 ;PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TO AUGMENT JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS & PECKENPAUGH'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS'FEES AND COSTS (filed 03/12/12) #1677 held before by Judge George H Wu. The tentative circulated as to Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Granting Final Approval to Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement is adopted as the Court's final ruling. Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED. The Court's Based on the tentative and for reasons stated on the record, Application of Gregory G. Petersen for Order Approving Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, Plaintiffs of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Motion for Allocation of Attorney's Fees and Costs, Jackson Demarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and Plaintiffs' Motion for to Augment Jackson Demarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs are GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART, and ALLOCATED. The Hafif Firm will prepare a Final Order and Judgment in this action and David Faris, et al. v. City of Long Beach, et al., Case No. SACV 07-954-GW(PLAx), by March 30, 2012. Any objections will be filed by April4, 2012. A non-appearance status conference is set for April 9, 2012. Court to issue orders and judgments. (See attached Tentative Ruling for details.) Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (lom)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1693 JOINDER filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #1692 . (Malik, M)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1692 Opposition to Chapter 7 Trustee's Response and Comments Regarding Attorney's Fees and Costs, Request for Continuance re: APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Greg Hafif In Sup[port of Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Opposition to Chapter 7 Trustee's Response and Comments Regarding Attorney's Fees and Costs, and Request for Continuance)(Hafif, Greg)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1691 REPLY In Support Of MOTION to AUGMENT APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 ; Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Su MOTION to AUGMENT APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 ; Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Su MOTION to AUGMENT APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 ; Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Su #1677 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Malik, M)
March 20, 2012 Filing 1690 CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE'S RESPONSE AND COMMENTS RE MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 , APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Gregory G. Petersen #1652 , APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 . (jag)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1689 Gregory G. Petersen's Opposition to Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Motion to Augment Its Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Opposition to Jackson DeMarco's Motion to Augment Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs re: MOTION to AUGMENT APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 ; Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Su MOTION to AUGMENT APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 ; Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Su MOTION to AUGMENT APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 ; Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Su #1677 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1688 Objections and Motion to Strike Declaration of James Nicholson In Support of Opposition to re: MOTION for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement #1661 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Objections and Motin to Strike Declaration of James Nicholson in Support of Opposition to Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement)(Hafif, Greg)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1687 Objections and Motion to Strike Declaration of Katherine Odenbreit In Support of Opposition to re: MOTION for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement #1661 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Objections and Motion to Strike Declaration of Katherine Odenbreit In Support of Opposition to Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement)(Hafif, Greg)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1686 Objections and Motion to Strike Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen In Support of Opposition to re: MOTION for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement #1661 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Objections and Motion to Strike Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen In Support of Opposition to Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement)(Hafif, Greg)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1685 REPLY In Support of Motion for Order Granting Final Approval to Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1684 REPLY In Support of MOTION for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement #1661 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Greg Hafif In Support of Reply to Gregory Petersen's Opposition Re Motion for Final Settlement Approval of Consolidated Actions)(Hafif, Greg)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1683 OPPOSITION GREGORY G. PETERSEN'S RESPONSE TO LAW OFFICES OF HERBERT HAFIF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF GREGORY G. PETERSEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION OF GREGORY G. PETERSEN FOR ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1682 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to AUGMENT APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 ; Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Su MOTION to AUGMENT APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 ; Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Su MOTION to AUGMENT APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 ; Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Su #1677 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Hafif, Greg)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1681 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement #1661 Supplemental Declaration of Greg Hafif In Support of Motion for Order Granting Final Approval of Settlement filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Hafif, Greg)
March 16, 2012 Filing 1680 OPPOSITION Gregory G. Petersen's Response to Jackson DeMarco's Evidentiary Objections and Motion to Strike Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen in Support of Application for Order Approving Payments of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
March 16, 2012 SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H Wu; The Court reminds the parties of the hearing set for March 22, 2012 at 9:00 a.m.: Re: MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 , MOTION for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement #1661 , APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Gregory G. Petersen #1652 , MOTION to AUGMENT APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs #1660 and MOTION to AUGMENT APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs #1677 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 15, 2012 Filing 1679 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. correcting EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to March 22, 2012 of Motion to Augment Application of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh For Attorneys' Fees and Costs [Docket No. 1677] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to March 22, 2012 of Motion to Augment Application of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh For Attorneys' Fees and Costs [Docket No. 1677] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to March 22, 2012 of Motion to Augment Application of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh For Attorneys' Fees and Costs [Docket No. 1677] #1678 DOCKET NO. 1678 MOOT (Malik, M)
March 15, 2012 Filing 1678 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to March 22, 2012 of Motion to Augment Application of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh For Attorneys' Fees and Costs [Docket No. 1677] filed by Former Class Counsel For Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Support of Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time on Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Motion to Augment Its Application For Attorneys' Fees and Costs [DKT. No. 1677], #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Support of, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Support of, #4 Proposed Order On Ex Parte Application For An Order Shortening Time)(Malik, M)
March 14, 2012 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H Wu; The Court, on its own motion, ADVANCES PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TO AUGMENT JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS & PECKENPAUGHS APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS #1677 previously scheduled for 04/12/12 to 3/22/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. Any Opposition will be filed and courtesy copy to chambers by noon March 19, 2012. Replies, if any, will be filed and a courtesy copy to chambers by noon on March 21, 2012.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 12, 2012 Filing 1677 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AUGMENT APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 ; Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Support Thereof filed by Former Class Counsel For Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Alim Malik In Support Thereof)(Malik, M)
March 12, 2012 Filing 1676 JOINDER in APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Notice of Joinder and Joinder to Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Objection to, and Motion to Strike, the Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen In Support of Opposition to Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Application for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Hafif, Greg)
March 12, 2012 Filing 1675 NOTICE Notice of Errata Re Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Odenbreit, Katherine)
March 9, 2012 Filing 1674 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement #1661 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory G Petersen in Support of Opposition to Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, #2 Declaration of Katherine J Odenbreit In Support of Opposition to Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, #3 Declaration of Certified Public Accountant James Nicholson, #4 Declaration of Derrick Dinsmore in Support of Opposition to Final Approval of Settlement and In Support of Request for Exclusion from Settlement)(Petersen, Gregory)
March 9, 2012 Filing 1673 Amendment to MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 Amended Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
March 8, 2012 Filing 1672 REPLY In Support of APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Gregory G. Petersen #1652 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration in Support of Petersen Application for Attorney's Fees, #2 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Katherine Odenbreit in Support of Petersen Application for Attorney's Fees)(Petersen, Gregory)
March 8, 2012 Filing 1671 OBJECTIONS TO, and Motion to Strike, the Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen in Support of Opposition to Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Application For Attorney's Fees and Costs In Support Of re: APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Objections to, and Motion to Strike, the Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen in Support of Opposition to Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Aplication for Attorney's Fees and Costs)(Malik, M)
March 8, 2012 Filing 1670 OBJECTION IN SUPPORT OF re: APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Objections To, and Motion to Strike, The Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen [Docket No. 1667-1] In Support of Opposition to Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Application For Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Malik, M)
March 8, 2012 Filing 1669 REPLY In Support Of APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of M. Alim Malik in Support of Consolidated Reply to Oppositions of Gregory Petersen and the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif to Jackson DeMarco's Application For Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Malik, M)
March 8, 2012 Filing 1668 REPLY in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Reply in Support of Motion for Allocation of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Greg K. Hafif, #2 Declaration Declaration of Fenja Klaus)(Hafif, Greg)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1667 OPPOSITION in Opposition and Objection to re: APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen in Support of Opposition to Application for Attorneys' Fees by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh, #2 Certificate of Service)(Petersen, Gregory)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1666 OPPOSITION in Opposition re: MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 and Costs for Law Offices of Herbert Hafif brought by Gregory G. Petersen filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Certicate of Service)(Petersen, Gregory)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1665 STATEMENT Non-Oppositions to Applications of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif, Gregory G. Petersen, and Jackson, DeMarco, Tidus & Peckenpaugh for Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by Defendant City of Long Beach re: MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 , APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Gregory G. Petersen #1652 , APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP #1660 . (Zutler, Samantha)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1664 Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Opposition to Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's APPLICATION for Attorneys' Fees and Costs #1660 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Hafif, Greg) Modified on 3/15/2012 (jag).
March 1, 2012 Filing 1663 Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Objection and Motion to Strike Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen In Support of Application of Gregory G. Petersen for Order Approving Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Opposition re: APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Gregory G. Petersen #1652 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Objections and Motion to Strike Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen In Support of Application of Gregory G. Petersen for Order Approving Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Hafif, Greg)
March 1, 2012 Filing 1662 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Gregory G. Petersen #1652 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Greg Hafif In Support of Law Offices of Herbert Hafif's Opposition to Application of Gregory G. Petersen for Order Approving Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Hafif, Greg)
February 27, 2012 Filing 1661 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Final Approval of Proposed Class and Collective Action Settlement filed by Plaintiff David Faris. Motion set for hearing on 3/22/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, #2 Declaration Declaration of Greg Hafif in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Karen Owens Regarding Notice in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement)(Hafif, Greg)
February 21, 2012 Filing 1660 APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs; and Objection by Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh to Fee Motions of the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif and Barge, Petersen & Odenbreit LLP filed by Former Class Counsel For Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Application set for hearing on 3/22/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Alim Malik in Support of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Application For Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of M. Alim Malik in Support of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Application For Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of M. Alim Malik in Support of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Application For Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of M. Alim Malik in Support of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Application For Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #5 Exhibit D (Part 1 of 2) to Declaration of M. Alim Malik in Support of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Application For Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #6 Exhibit D (Part 2 of 2) to Declaration of M. Alim Malik in Support of Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Application For Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Malik, M)
January 31, 2012 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge George H Wu The Court, on its own motion, continues MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 previously scheduled for February 9, 2012 8:30 a.m. to 3/22/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 3, 2012 Filing 1659 DECLARATION of Greg Hafif in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 Exhibit D, Part 8 to Declaration of Greg Hafif filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1658 DECLARATION of Greg Hafif in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 Exhibit D, Part 7 to Declaration of Greg Hafif filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1657 DECLARATION of Greg Hafif in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 Exhibit D, Part 6 to Declaration of Greg Hafif filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1656 DECLARATION of Greg Hafif in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 Exhibit D, Part 5 to Declaration of Greg Hafif filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1655 DECLARATION of Greg Hafif in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 Exhibit D, Part 4 to Declaration of Greg Hafif filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1654 DECLARATION of Greg Hafif in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 Exhibit D, Part 3 to Declaration of Greg Hafif filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1653 DECLARATION of Greg Hafif in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 Exhibit D, Part 2 to Declaration of Greg Hafif filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1652 APPLICATION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Gregory G. Petersen filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Application set for hearing on 3/22/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen in Support of Application for Attorneys Fees and Costs, #2 Declaration of Katherine J. Odenbreit)(Petersen, Gregory)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1651 DECLARATION of Greg Hafif In Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 Exhibit D, Part 1 to Declaration of Greg Hafif filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1650 DECLARATION of Greg Hafif In Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 Exhibits "G" thru "I" to Declaration of Greg Hafif filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1649 DECLARATION of Greg Hafif In Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 Exhibits "E" and "F" to Declaration of Greg Hafif filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1648 DECLARATION of Greg Hafif In Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees #1646 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to C)(Hafif, Greg)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1647 NOTICE of Objection to Final Approval of Collective Action Settlement filed by Objector John Lembi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen in Support of Objection to Final Approval of Settlement, #2 Declaration of Katherine J. Odenbreit, #3 Declaration of Objector John Lembi, #4 Declaration of Certified Public Accountant James Nicholson)(Petersen, Gregory)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1646 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 2/9/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fenja Klaus, #2 Declaration of Kenneth Mariboho, #3 Declaration of Larry Sackey, #4 Declaration of Miguel Caballero, #5 Declaration of Rachael Wager-Lacross)(Klaus, Fenja)
November 18, 2011 Filing 1645 AMENDED NOTICE TO CURRENT AND FORMER LONG BEACH POLICE OFFICERS RE: SETTLEMENT OF FEDERAL LAWSUIT PURSUANT TOCOURTS APPROVAL OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT by Judge George H Wu, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, that the Notice To Current And Former Long Beach Police Officers Re: Settlement Of Federal Lawsuit attached hereto asExhibit A shall be distributed to all current and former Long Beach Police Officers pursuant instructions identified in this Courts Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. (pj)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1644 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT by Judge George H Wu, The motion for preliminary approval is granted. The Court finds at this time that the settlement is fair, adequate and reasonable and the collective action remains certified as previously ordered. The Courts reasons are more fully outlined in the Courts October 31, 2011 tentative ruling which now becomes a part of this finalOrder. The Court further orders that the Notice be sent by the City pursuant to its terms no later than November 30, 2011. For any returned mail, the City shall use all available methods to locate a current address of the former officer and resend the Notice. The Court finds that the Opt-out and Opt-in forms are acceptable and are therefore approved. All Opt-Out and Opt-In forms must be postmarked by January 31, 2012. Any returned mail where notice was resent all Opt-Out and Opt-In forms must be returned by February 15, 2012. If a plaintiff files a timely Opt-Out Form, they willhave 60 days from Final Approval to file a new claim/lawsuit preserving the statuteon their original consent to join date. Any objections to the settlement must be filed in this court and served on bothPlaintiff and defense counsel by no later than January 3, 2012. Any objections filedand served after January 3, 2012 are invalid and void and will not be considered. The motion for final approval of the settlement will be heard before this Court on March 22, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. Said motion for final approval of the settlement must be filed no later than February 22, 2012, with all opposition papers filed nolater than March 9, 2012 and reply papers filed no later than March 16, 2012. (see attached for further details) (pj)
November 16, 2011 Filing 1642 Amended [Proposed] "Notice to Current and Former Long Beach Police Officers Re: Settlement of Federal Lawsuit" Pursuant to Court's Approval of Motion for Preliminary Approval Of Settlement re: MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consolidated Actions Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #1617 (Hafif, Greg)
November 16, 2011 Filing 1641 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement re: MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consolidated Actions Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #1617 (Hafif, Greg)
November 15, 2011 Filing 1643 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Hearing is held off the record. Court and counsel confer re notice to the class. The notice is approvedand the parties are required to file an amended version forthwith. The Status Conference set for November 17, 2011 is taken off-calendar. Court Reporter: None Present. (pj)
November 11, 2011 Filing 1639 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consolidated Actions Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #1617 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Hafif, Greg)
November 11, 2011 Filing 1638 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] "Notice To Current and Former Long Beach Police Officers Re Settlement of Federal Lawsuit" Pursuant to Court's Approval of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consolidated Actions Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #1617 (Hafif, Greg)
November 10, 2011 Filing 1640 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER (1) GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL TO PROPOSED CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT; (2) PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASSES AND COLLECTIVE ACTION; (3) DIRECTING DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE AND CLAIM FORM TO THE CLASS; AND (4) SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FINAL APPROVAL PROCESS(filed 10/17/11) #1617 . Motion for Settlement; Motion Hearing held before Judge George H Wu: Based on the tentative circulated on October 31, 2011 and for reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs motion is GRANTED. Final versions of the notice and a proposed order will be filed by November 14, 2011. A Status Conference is set for November 17, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. Parties may contact the clerk bynoon on November 16, 2011 if a hearing is necessary.The final approval schedule is set as follows:Initial brief February 27, 2012Opposition March 9, 2012Reply March 16, 2012Final Approval hearing March 22, 2012 at 9:00 a.m.Court Reporter: Nichole Rhynard. (pj)
November 8, 2011 Filing 1637 DECLARATION of Commander Josef Levy IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACHS OPPOSITION TO GREGORY PETERSENS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS OCTOBER 31, 2011 MINUTE ORDE filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
November 8, 2011 Filing 1636 DECLARATION of Samantha W. Zutler IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACHS OPPOSITION TO GREGORY PETERSENS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS OCTOBER 31, 2011 MINUTE ORDE filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
November 8, 2011 Filing 1635 OBJECTIONS DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACHS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF CERTIFIED PUBLIC ACCOUNTANT JAMES NICHOLSON RE: CALCULATION OF DAMAGE ESTIMATES filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
November 8, 2011 Filing 1634 DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACHS OPPOSITION TO GREGORY PETERSENS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS OCTOBER 31, 2011 MINUTE ORDER filed by Defendant City of Long Beach (Zutler, Samantha)
November 8, 2011 Filing 1633 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consolidated Actions Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #1617 filed by Plaintiff David Faris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Greg Hafif In Response to Gregory Petersen's Supplemental Briefing In Response To The Court's October 31, 2011 Minute Order)(Hafif, Greg)
November 4, 2011 Notice of Electronic Filing re Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,,,,,, #1631 e-mailed to gpetersen@bpolawyers.com, dlawrence@bpolawyers, kondenbreit@brolawyers.com and gsutter@bpolawyers.com bounced due to delivery expired (message to old). Primary e-mail address fine. Problems with their email. Added kodenbreit@class-actions-attorneys.com per firm. Greg@lawnet.com had already been entered by someone so emails were forwarded to that address as well.Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to greg@lawnet.com and kodenbreit@class-action-attorneys.com. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. (Wilson, Tammie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 4, 2011 Filing 1632 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Supplemental MOTION to Supplement Briefing in Response to the Court's October 31, 2011 Minute Order re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #1623 filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 11/10/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen, #2 Declaration Declaration of Certified Public Accountant James Nicholson re: Calculation of Damage Estimates, #3 Proof of Service)(Petersen, Gregory)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1631 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER (1) GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVALTO PROPOSED CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT; (2) PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASSES AND COLLECTIVE ACTION; (3) DIRECTING DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE AND CLAIM FORM TO THE CLASS; AND (4) SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FINAL APPROVAL PROCESS (filed 10/17/11) Motion Hearing held before Judge George H Wu: The Court's Tentative Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. Counsel for plaintiff will have until noon on November 4,2011 to submit their final argument based on the Court's ruling. A response by the defendant will be filed by 4:00 p.m. on November 8, 2011. Briefs will not exceed ten pages. The motion is continued to November 10, 2011 at 9:30 a.m..Court Reporter: Pam Batalo. (pj)
October 28, 2011 Filing 1630 DECLARATION of SAMANTHA W. ZUTLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
October 28, 2011 Filing 1629 STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT filed by Defendant City of Long Beach (Zutler, Samantha)
October 28, 2011 Filing 1628 OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) #1627 , Declaration (Motion related) #1626 of Greg Hafif and Fenja Klause in Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Unauthorized Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Express of Rejection of Proposed Settlement as Unauthorized filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Petersen, Gregory)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1627 DECLARATION of Fenja Klaus In Response to Greg Petersen's Opposition to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consolidated Actions Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #1617 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1626 DECLARATION of Greg Hafif In Response to Opposition of Greg Petersen to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consolidated Actions Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #1617 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1625 NOTICE Errata filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. re Declaration in Opposition to Unauthorized Motion of Greg Hafif For Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Express Of Rejection of Proposed Settlement as Unauthorized (Petersen, Gregory)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1624 DECLARATION of Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards in opposition MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consolidated Actions Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #1617 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Petersen, Gregory)
October 26, 2011 Filing 1623 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consolidated Actions Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #1617 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen in Support of Opposition to Motion for Approval of Settlement and Notice of Rejection of Proposed Settlement)(Petersen, Gregory)
October 20, 2011 Filing 1622 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER (1) GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL TO PROPOSED CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT; (2) PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASSES AND COLLECTIVE ACTION; (3) DIRECTING DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE AND CLAIM FORM TO THE CLASS; AND (4) SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FINAL APPROVAL PROCESS(filed 10/17/11) held before Judge George H Wu: For reasons stated on the record, the above-entitled motion and plaintiffs ex parte application, are continued to October 31, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. Supplemental brief by Barge, Peterson and Odenbreit will be filed by October 26, 2011. Court Reporter: Katherine Stride. (im)
October 19, 2011 Filing 1621 CORRECTED [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT re MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consolidated Actions Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement #1617 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Hafif, Greg)
October 19, 2011 Filing 1620 NOTICE Notice of Errata to Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Set Preliminary Hearing Re: Settlement Negotiations; Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen; Declaration of Katherine J. Odenbreit; [Proposed] Order filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Petersen, Gregory)
October 19, 2011 Filing 1619 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gregory G Petersen on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Petersen, Gregory)
October 19, 2011 Filing 1618 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from October 20, 2011 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Gregory G. Petersen in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Set Preliminary Hearing Re: Settlement Negotiations, #2 Declaration Declaration of Katherine J. Odenbreit in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Set Preliminary Hearing Re: Settlement Negotiations, #3 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)(Petersen, Gregory)
October 17, 2011 Filing 1617 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Consolidated Actions Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 10/20/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authoritis in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; Declaration of Greg Hafif, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)(Hafif, Greg)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1616 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H Wu: The Court, on its own motion, continues the hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, presently set for October 3, 2011, to October 20, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. Documents will be filed by no later than October 17, 2011. (jag)
September 30, 2011 Filing 1615 STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement of Consolidated Actions filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Klaus, Fenja)
September 26, 2011 Filing 1614 STATEMENT Re: Post-Mediation Status Conference (Zutler, Samantha)
July 28, 2011 Filing 1613 MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Hearing on Motion for preliminary approval of settlement is set for 10/3/2011 at 08:30 AM. Court Reporter: Maria Dellaneve. (jp)
July 26, 2011 Filing 1612 STATUS REPORT In Advance of July 28, 2011 Post Mediation Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Klaus, Fenja)
June 30, 2011 Filing 1611 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC Status Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Settlement is being finalized.The Status Conference is continued to July 28, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are advised that the status conference will be vacated and no appearance will be required provided that a Stipulation to Dismiss, with a proposed order, is filed by noon on July 26, 2011. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
May 31, 2011 Filing 1610 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Greg K Hafif counsel for Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Hafif, Greg)
May 23, 2011 Filing 1609 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Settlement is reached and being finalized. The Status Conference is continued to June 30, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are advised that the status conference will be vacated and no appearance will be required provided that a Stipulation to Dismiss, with a proposed order, is filed by noon on June 29, 2011. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (rp)
May 20, 2011 Filing 1608 STATUS REPORT (JOINT STATEMENT RE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE) filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1607 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Miguel G Caballero counsel for Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards.Miguel G. Caballero is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, et al. (Caballero, Miguel)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1606 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Statement and request #1605 The Post-Mediation Status Conference currently scheduled for April 21, 2011 will be rescheduled to May 23, 2011 at 8:30 a.m., with status reports due May 20, 2011. (lc)
April 19, 2011 Filing 1605 STATEMENT (Joint) In Advance of Post-Mediation Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Continuance of Post-Mediation Status Conference)(Klaus, Fenja)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1604 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Status Report #1603 . This Court ORDERS 1. The Post-Mediation Status Conference currently scheduled for March 31, 2011 will be rescheduled to April 21, 2011 at 8:30 a.m., with status reports due April 19, 2011. (pj)
March 28, 2011 Filing 1603 STATUS REPORT (Joint Statement) in Advance of Post-Mediation Status Conference filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zutler, Samantha)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1602 ORDER CONTINUING POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Continue #1601 , ( Status Report due by 3/28/2011., Post Mediation Status Conference set for 3/31/2011 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu.) (pj)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1601 STIPULATION to Continue Post Mediation Status Conference from March 10, 2011 to March 30, 2011 City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartinger, Arthur)
January 27, 2011 Filing 1600 MINUTES: PROCEEDINGS: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge George H Wu: Settlement negotiations are ongoing. The Status Conference is continued to 3/10/2011 at 8:30 AM. Status Report will be filed by 3/7/2011. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (jp)
December 9, 2010 Filing 1599 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC Status Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Counsel inform the Court that a proposal has been recommended to their clients. The Status Conference is continued to January 27, 2011 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appeartelephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by January 25, 2011.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
December 7, 2010 Filing 1598 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #1597 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION (G-06) under NOTICES. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj)
December 6, 2010 Filing 1597 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Notice of Change of Attorney Information (Hwang, Rex)
November 29, 2010 Filing 1596 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING AND ENFORCINGTHE TERMS OF COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTOR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SETTING AN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGREGARDING THE SAME (filed 10/25/10)DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONSAGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL PURSUANT TOF.R.C.P.ll AND28U.S.C.I927(filed 11/12/10)HEARING ON THE ISSUES OF DECERTIFICATION AND "DONNINGAND DOFFING" #1578 #1587 held before Judge George H Wu:Hearings are held. The tentative circulated is hereby adopted as the Court's final ruling (attached). The parties will appear before Judge Romero on December 2,2010, at 9:00 a.m. A telephonic status conference is set for December 9, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
November 23, 2010 Filing 1595 REPLY in support of MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff & Plaintiffs' Counsel Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927 #1587 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
November 22, 2010 Filing 1594 REPLY Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Opposition to Motion for Decertificaiton and Reconsideration of Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication on Donning and Doffing filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
November 22, 2010 Filing 1593 REPLY (Rebuttal Brief) in Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Decertification and Reconsideration of Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication on Donning and Doffing filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
November 19, 2010 Filing 1592 Plaintiff's Oppsition to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions Opposition to re: MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff & Plaintiffs' Counsel Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927 #1587 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hafif, Greg)
November 17, 2010 Filing 1591 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #1588 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Response in Support of Motion. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (vh)
November 15, 2010 Filing 1590 SUPPLEMENT BRIEF RE DECERTIFICATION AND RECONSIDERATION OF DONNING AND DOFFING RULING IN LIGHT OF RECENT NINTH CIRCUIT DECISION filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
November 15, 2010 Filing 1589 REPLY Opposition MOTION for Settlement Approval of Approval of Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Approving and Enforcing the Terms of Collective Action Settlement Agreement or in teh Alternative Setting an Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Same, D #1578 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Greg Hafif in Reply to Opposition to Motion For an Order Approving & Enforcing the Terms of Collective Action Settlement Agreement or in the Alternative Setting an Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Same)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 15, 2010 Filing 1588 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Motion for Decertification and Reconsideration of Summary Judgment of Summary Adjudication on Donning and Doffing (Caballero, Miguel)
November 12, 2010 Filing 1587 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff & Plaintiffs' Counsel Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 11/29/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samantha W. Zutler in Support of City of Long Beach's Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927, #2 Declaration of Geoffrey Spellberg in Support of City of Long Beach's Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927, #3 Declaration of Matthew C. Lewis in Support of City of Long Beach's Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11 and 28 U.S.C. 1927)(Zutler, Samantha)
November 9, 2010 Filing 1586 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS re: MOTION for Settlement Approval of Approval of Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Approving and Enforcing the Terms of Collective Action Settlement Agreement or in teh Alternative Setting an Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Same, D #1578 TO DECLARATION OF GREG HAFIF filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
November 8, 2010 Filing 1585 DECLARATION of ROBERT A. OROZCO in opposition to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Approval of Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Approving and Enforcing the Terms of Collective Action Settlement Agreement or in teh Alternative Setting an Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Same, D #1578 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
November 8, 2010 Filing 1584 DECLARATION of GEOFFREY SPELLBERG in opposition to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Approval of Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Approving and Enforcing the Terms of Collective Action Settlement Agreement or in teh Alternative Setting an Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Same, D #1578 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
November 8, 2010 Filing 1583 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Exhibit 4-7, #3 Exhibit 8-11, #4 Exhibit 12-15, #5 Exhibit 16-18, #6 Exhibit 19-22)(Orozco, Robert)
November 8, 2010 Filing 1582 OPPOSITION to re: MOTION for Settlement Approval of Approval of Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Approving and Enforcing the Terms of Collective Action Settlement Agreement or in teh Alternative Setting an Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Same, D #1578 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
November 4, 2010 Filing 1581 MINUTES: PROCEEDINGS: POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge George H Wu: Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Approving and Enforcing the Terms of Collective Action Settlement Agreement or in the Alternative, Setting an Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Same, filed on 10/25/2010, will remain on calendar for 11/29/2010 at 8:30 AM. The Court allows defense to file a motion for sanctions against plaintiffs. Parties may stipulate to the briefing schedule on both motions, except the reply, which will be due by close of business on 11/23/2010. Parties will also file simultaneous briefs on the issues of decertification and "donning and doffing," by 11/15/2010. Simultaneous rebuttal briefs will be filed by 11/22/2010. A hearing is set for 11/29/2010 at 8:30 AM. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (jp)
October 29, 2010 Filing 1580 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Post Mediation Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 28, 2010 Filing 1579 STATEMENT by Defendant in Advance of Post-Mediation Status Conference (Hartinger, Arthur)
October 25, 2010 Filing 1578 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Approval of Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Approving and Enforcing the Terms of Collective Action Settlement Agreement or in teh Alternative Setting an Evidentiary Hearing Regarding the Same, Declaration of Greg Hafif filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 11/29/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hafif, Greg)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1577 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR JOHN GREET by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff John Greet is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice #1575 . (jp)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1576 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, regarding Continuance of Post Mediation Status Conference and Trial Conference #1573 . The Post Mediation Status Conference and Trial Setting Conference will be scheduled to 11/4/2010 at 8:30 AM. (jp)
October 4, 2010 Filing 1575 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff John B Greet filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for John Greet)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 4, 2010 Filing 1574 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Peter Anderson filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Peter Anderson)(Caballero, Miguel)
September 27, 2010 Filing 1573 STIPULATION to Continue Post Mediation Status Conference and Trial Setting Conference from August 12, 2010 to November 2, 2010 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Continuance of Post Mediation Status Conference and Trial Setting Conference)(Orozco, Robert)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1572 ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. This Court hereby orders: The Post Mediation Status Conference and Trial Setting Conference currently scheduled for July 8, 2010 will be rescheduled to August 12, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. (rs)
July 6, 2010 Filing 1571 STIPULATION to Continue Post Mediation Status Conference and Trial Setting Conference from July 8, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. to August 12, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. filed by defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
May 18, 2010 Filing 1570 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Rex Hwang counsel for Plaintiffs Kalid Abuhadwan, Vicente Aceves, Darren Adams, Mario Aiello, Salvador Alatorre, Jesus Alcala, Ramon Alcala, Nikki R Alexander, Ray L Alexander, Jeff Alexen, Andrea Allen, Sandy Allen, Aaron Alu, Charlotte M Alu, Eric Alvarez, Eric Alvarez, Anthony Anast, Forrest R Andersen, Dianna L Anderson, Forrest R Anderson, Julie Anderson, Peter Anderson, Tyrone Anderson, Alex Angotti, Alex Angotti, Bobby J Anguiano, Stanley Appel, Paul Arcala, Raymond Arcala, Daniel A Arcese, Matt S Archer, Guillermo Arias, Ernest W Armond, Richard Armond, Brian Armstrong, Lawrence L Arnwine, William Arthur, Jennifer Arzola, Ebrahim Ashabi, Ali Assef, Corey Austin, Richard Austin, Jr, Alexander Avila, Juan Avila, George D Ayala, Jr, Felipa A Baccari, Nicholas G Bachert, II, Douglas Bacon, Joseph V Bahash, Banuelos, Jr, Bernardo Barajas, Elizabeth Barba, Barber E Barber, Eric Barich, Daniel Barkwill, Greg Barnhart, Christopher Bates, Joe Battle, Sr, Paul Baum, Paul R Baum, Larry Bautista, Randall Beach, Ted Beard, Adam Beaver, Michael T Beckman, Brian J Bell, Richard Bell, Ronald Bell, Doulglas R Bender, Sondra Benskin, Toby Benskin, Shaleana R Benson, Geoffrey A Berg, Jeffrey Berkenkamp, Robert Bernsen, Ernesto Betancourt, Jacqueline Bezart, Richard Birdsall, James J Bisetti, Stephen Black, Amy Blackburn, Byron D Blair, Darin Blizzard, Ronald A Boandl, Richard Boatright, Michael Bolling, Christopher Bolt, Edward L Bonachea, Edward L Bonachea, Andre Booker, Jeremy Boshnack, Gina M Bowen-Gilbert, Dana L Braak, Kevin Bradburn, Chris Brammer, Joshua Brearley, Laurie Briney, Marcus R Briones, Anthony M Brown, Cory J Brown, Rodney J Brown, Thomas E Brown, John D Bruce, Mark Brunson, Garey Bruyere, Steven D Buchheim, Ronald P Burgess, Erik B Burks, Bill J Burney, Patrick J Burns, William Burns, Andrew E Calderon, Jonathan A Calvert, Ralph Calvete, Dennis A Camaria, Sean R Campbell, Joel L Camrin, Philip Candelaria, Philip Candelaria, Albert Candeo, Leticia Caranza, Hector H Cardiel, Gabriel Carillo, Richard Carr, Gabriel Carrillo, Jerry A Carter, Jr, Armand M Castellanos, Christopher Castillo, Joshua S Castro, Rubi Castro, Richard Cawley, Efrain Cervantes, Alfredo Chairez, Richard Chambers, Richard R Chavez, Richard Chen, Chih-Hang Chi, Ryan Christopher, Deborah M Clark, James R Clark, Maria Clay, Maria Clay, Philip Cloughesy, Marc Cobb, Mark S Coble, Jayson Cochran, Thomas Cochran, Michael Colbert, Rick Colbert, Jonathan Cole, David Collazo, Gamaliel Collazo, Brian W Collette, Gordon Collier, Wayne Collins, Richard Conant, Jeff Conrad, Fernando Cook, Jeffrey L Cooper, Philip D Cooper, Tristan Corbett, Luis E Corona, Robert Correia, Christopher J Costa, Steven D Costa, Daniel Steven Covarubias, Mary Covarubias, Theodore A Covey, Lloyd Cox, James E Craig, Ciaran Crawford, Kenny E Cruz, Marco Cruz, Fernando Cuevas, Eugene e Cummings, Thomas Cummings, Robert NMI Curran, Jason P Dallas, David R Daniels, Brian Dapello, Michael Anthony Dapello, Brian L Darwin, Darren Davenport, Robert Davenport, Douglas P Davidson, John F Davies, Jeff C Davis, Kevin Davis, Loren Dawson, Nicholas L De La O, Eduardo De La Torre, Benjamin De Los Santos, Scott J De Stefano, Rick DeForest, Gary S DePhillippo, Sean D Deaton, Lee D Debrabander, Aldo Decarvalho, Brandon N Deis, Gerrit Dejohngh, Carlos Del Real, Norman A Delgado, Kevin Delorto, Jessica Delosh, Michael Demarco, David Demasi, Jeffrey Demeen, Eric Denmion, Michael A Deprete, Jack Dial, James Dickey, Jacob Dillon, Bradley D Dinsdale, Derrick M Dinsmore, Gabriel Doby, Aaron Dodson, Johnny Dodson, III, Johnny Dodson, III, Johnny A Dodson, James L Dodwell, Dominguez, Oscar Dominguez, Rodney D Donahue, Steven Richard Donahue, Stephen NMI Dougan, Karen Dougherty, Matthew Dougherty, Matthew Dougherty, Patrick A Dougherty, Timothy A Downs, Michael J Dugan, Norman Dumaplin, Allen Duncan, Binh T Duong, Jr, David Ebell, David A Ebell, Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, Bradley J Eggum, Brian T Ekern, Brian T Ekrem, Gregory S Eldridge, Chad C Ellis, Michael Erdelji, Thomas Erdelji, Harry Erickson, Robert Erickson, Derek Ernest, Diego Escutia, Paul Esko, Jesus Espinoza, Matthew Esproles, Alfonso Esqueda, Duane Evans, Jason Evans, Malcolm Evans, Timothy L Everts, John B Fagar, Richard A Farfan, David Faris, James Earl Fellows, Eric Fenner, Jon A Fenoglio, Joseph W Ferguson, Nestor Ferguson, Victor Feria, Americo Fernandez, Americo Fernandez, Eric Fernandez, Timothy M Ferrill, Adam Ferris, Donald R Field, Christopher Figal, Marlia Jo Figueroa, Keith A Finch, Richard W Firman, Wendy First, M Wesley Fisher, Jose G Flores, Jason Foerster, David Foltz, Steven R Fong, James T Foster, Roque O Foster, William D Foster, William D Foster, Andrew M Fox, Steven Fox, Jesus Fragoso, Jr, Rachel Frausto, David C Frazier, David Frazior, David W Frazior, Brian Fritz, David H Fritz, Eric Fritz, Bradley Futak, Leonard Gaeta, David Gage, Paul Gallo, Luis Galvan, Onorio Galvan, Leticia Gamboa, Alfonso Garcia, Anthony Garcia, Dave Garcia, Jason Sean Garcia, Jeffrey NMI Garcia, Rudio O Garcia, Sirilo L Garcia, Michael Gardinier, Armando Garica, Amy Garrett, Gabriel Garrido, Jason Garrido, Alex C Gassler, Joe Gaynor, David Geer, Kerry M Geisige, Mark A Gell, Matthew V George, Jerry M Gibbs, John S Gibbs, Ana Maria Gill, Joseph L Gludt, Philip Golia, Eric M Golz, Elaine Gomez, Elaine Gomez, Hector Gomez, Juan Gomez, Kenneth Gonyea, Robert Gonzales, Arturo Gonzalez, Fermin Gonzalez, Jose Gonzalez, Jose M Gonzalez, Jr, Rocio NMI Gonzalez, Donald J Goodman, Gary T Gotori, Jorge A Grajeda, Richard Gray, Kenneth M Green, Michael E Green, Brian Greene, John B Greet, Tamela R Gregory-Davis, Keith Gregrow, Carlos Grimaldo, Clinton A Grimes, Robert Guerrero, Hector A Gutierrez, Joe Gutierrez, Daniel S Haas, Victor Hafkenscheid, Jeremy Haining, David Hainley, Rory J Hainley, Monique Hainley-Glover, Darren T Hall, Stephanie N Hall, Gary Halliday, Michael H Ham, Harry D Hampton, Mark Hansen, Douglas S Hara, Antonio G Haro, John Harrigan, Alexander Harris, Jeffrey V Harris, Nicholas Harris, Warner J Harris, Warren Harris, Timothy P Hart, Harter, Marc Hawkins, Robin Hawkins, Robin Hawkins, Matthew Heady, Wally Hebeish, Brian Helm, Danny Hernandez, Jesus D Hernandez, Matthew R Hernandez, Alvino Herrera, Ramiro Herrera, John R Hill, Fawn Hines, Nicholas Ho, Marcus Hodge, Gary A Hodgson, Diana Hohman, William S Holder, Eric Hooker, John R Hotchkiss, Eric Hubbard, Michael Hubbard, David Hubbert, David Hubbert, Isiah C Hughes, Sean Hunt, Adrian Hunter, Michael Hutchinson, Michael Hynes, Tina Louise Icorn, Songcheak Ier, Christopher G Ignacio, Brent T Ikari, Sean Irving, Michael Jackson, Jeffrey C Jacobs, John C Jacobs, Jr, Stephen James, William Jarman, Adriana Jaurigui, Todd Jenkins, Patrick Jennings, Gregory Jensen, Scott W Jenson, Steven Jilek, Fernando Jimenez, Delon Johns, Bradley M Johnson, Bradley Johnson, Douglas R Johnson, Joel C Johnson, Jr, Joseph J Johnson, Satwan D Johnson, Todd Johnson, William A Johnston, Allan Jones, David Jones, Larry Jones, Max Jones, Jeffrey Jonkey, Julio E Juarez, Addiel E Julian, Ulises Julio, Richard Kaiser, Jennifer Kearns, David Keeney, Don Kehoe, Thomas H Keleher, Jason Kennedy, Robert Kennedy, Matthew Kennison, Asif Khan, William B Kift, Leonard Junyong Kim, Kevin King, Kevin T King, Timothy King, Jason M Kirk, Tonya Kirk, Randy J Kleber, Joseph Klein, James H Kloss, Robert B Knight, David Kofoed, Konkoly, Mark Kosoy, Gregory A Krabbe, James Kroeger, Steven P Kroesen, Justin Krueger, Shanda Kunkle, Robert Kuroda, Jason Lacey, Peter Lackovic, Randy Lacsina, Timothy L Lancaster, Darren Lance, Cory Lapworth, Linnear Lawless, Alex Lawrence, Gary Lawson, Ryan B Lebaron, William P Lebaron, Eric M Ledesma, Bruce Lee, Russell Lee, Ryan Lee, Allan R Legayada, Jason Lehman, John Lembi, John Lembi, Alberto Leon, Loren Lew, Jarrod M Lewis, Michael A Lewis, Dylan Lobascio, Timothy M Long, Yul B Long, Yul B Long, Fernando E Longcob, Jason Longoria, Anthony Lopez, Claudia Lopez, Manuel Q Lopez, Maria Lopez, Robert A Lopez, Robert A Lopez, Michael Lord, Shawn Loughlin, Jason Lovo, Lowe, Janathan Lucero, Douglas Luther, Paul Luyben, Hank Ly, Sovanna Ly, Patrick J Lyon, Jesus Macias, Kimberly Maddox, John Magallanes, Sean Magee, Leesa L Mahaffey, Gregory L Manis, Jack Manu, Vincenzo G Marchese, Jorge Marquez, Vaignte Marshall, Christopher S Martin, Christopher E Martinez, Fernando Martinez, Omar Martinez, Ruben Martinez, Michael Masai, Aaron C Mascorro, William K Matsubara, Troy Matsuura, Mark Mattia, Eric Matusak, Donald Mauk, Fernando Mayen, Michael W Mazzoni, Keith R McCart, Margarit McCart, Gina McConnon, Brian J McCormick, Lisa McCourt, Luke McGee, Charles McGowan, Mark McGuire, Melvin D McGuire, Samuel McKenzie, Juan J Medina, A G Megas, Melvin M Megee, Jason P Melvin, Daniel Mendoza, Robert D Mendoza, Jerry Meras, John M Mercado, Donald E Messer, Mark Mesun, Jeff Meyer, Jeffrey A Meyer, Eric Mifflin, Jason Mifflin, Brian P Mihkelson, Norman Mikkelson, Quincy Miles, Barry Miller, Craig Miller, Michele Miller, Michelle Miller, Richard Miller, Jr, Scott J Miller, Matthew J Mills, Bret Milovich, Scott - Minikus, Brandon T Mitchell, Johnny Miyasaki, Daniel Molinar, James Mondragon, Roger D Montell, Arturo Montes, Richard Montoya, Christian f Moody, Nancy Mora, Abel Morales, Delmy V Morales, Oscar Morales, Daniel K Moreno, Eli L Moreno, Christopher F Morgan, William Morrison, Keith Mortensen, Edmund Moscoso, Travis R Muilenburg, Keith D Mullally, Paul Munson, Lawrence F Murlock, Jr, Justin Murr, George Murray, Carlos Nava, Alfonso Navarro, Scott D Neal, Tomb T Neal, William Neal, Kevin D Nelson, Kris D Nelson, James C Newland, Chris Nguyen, Mark L Nguyen, Mark L Nguyen, Vuong Nguyen, Hector L Nieves, Elise Nikoletich, George Nogueira, Mark Northart, Carel C Nydell, Nystedt, Tim O'Hara, Sean O'Rourke, Daniel Ochoa, Michael K Ogden, Victor Ojeda, David Okerman, Mario M Olloque, Richard I Olmedo, Tim Olson, Kevin Ong, Pablo R Orduno, Cynthia Orel, Jonathan Ornelas, Marc N Ornelas, Jose R Orozco, Daisy Ortiz, Victor Ortiz, Victor Ortiz, Vincent Otto, Michael Padilla, Hollace Page, Bo Pak, Christopher G
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1569 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Continue #1568 . 1. The Post Mediation Status Conference and Trial Setting Conference currently scheduled for May 20, 2010 will be rescheduled to July 8, 2010 at 8:30a.m. (pj)
May 13, 2010 Filing 1568 STIPULATION to Continue Post Mediation Status Conference and Trial Setting Conference from May 20, 2010 to July 8, 2010 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
April 23, 2010 Filing 1567 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Miguel G Caballero counsel for Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Kenneth L. Mariboho will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Kenneth L. Mariboho is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
March 15, 2010 Filing 1566 AMENDED MINUTES before Judge George H Wu re #1565 (jag)
March 15, 2010 Filing 1565 MINUTES OF POST-MEDIATIONStatus Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Hearing is held. Mr. Orozco specially appears on behalf of the plaintiffs.Counsel for defendants inform the Court that the matter has not mediated.The Court continues the Post-Mediation Status Conference to April 20, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. Parties mayappear telephonically if notice is given to the clerk within two business days of the hearing. Court Reporter: Margaret Babykin. (pj)
January 21, 2010 Filing 1564 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (filed 10/01/09);HEARING RE CATEGORIZATION held before Judge George H Wu:, Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer. Judge Romero has agreed to expedited mediation. The issue of categorization will be resolved after mediation held before Judge Romero.A Post-Mediation Status Conference is set for March 15, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appeartelephonically, if notice is given to the clerk within two business days of the hearing. A stipulation andproposed order may be filed if additional time is required to mediate. #1433 , Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
January 14, 2010 Filing 1563 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (filed 10/01/09 held before Judge George H Wu: Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer. Parties inform the Court that mediation is scheduled beforeJudge Romero.A hearing regarding categorization is set for January 21, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appeartelephonically, if notice is given to the clerk within two business days of the hearing.The Court continues the hearing on plaintiffs motion to January 21, 2010 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
January 8, 2010 Filing 1562 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Amendment to Miscellaneous Document #1558 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REGARDING SHIFT/ASSIGNMENTS (Orozco, Robert)
January 8, 2010 Filing 1561 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. correcting Miscellaneous Document #1558 Joint Case Management Statement Regarding Shift/Assignments (Orozco, Robert)
January 7, 2010 Filing 1560 DECLARATION of COMMANDER GARY MORRISON re Miscellaneous Document #1558 in support of CITY OF LONG BEACH'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE: TRIAL MECHANISM filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
January 7, 2010 Filing 1559 DECLARATION of LIEUTENANT GALEN CARROLL re Miscellaneous Document #1558 in support of CITY OF LONG BEACH'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE: TRIAL MECHANISM filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
January 7, 2010 Filing 1558 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REGARDING SHIFT/ASSIGNMENTS filed by Defendant City of Long Beach (Orozco, Robert)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1557 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu granting #1555 Application to Continue. The hearing is continued from 12/21/2009 to 1/14/2010 at 08:30 AM. The last day for the parties to file supplemental briefing shall be 1/7/2010. (rj)
December 11, 2009 Filing 1556 Opposiiton Opposition re: APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from December 21, 2009 to January 2010 #1555 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Miguel G. Caballero in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Extension of Filing Deadline and Conitnuance of Hearing)(Klaus, Fenja)
December 10, 2009 Filing 1555 APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from December 21, 2009 to January 2010 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samantha W. Zutler, #2 Proposed Order)(Zutler, Samantha)
November 30, 2009 Filing 1554 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, Document # 1553 is a duplication of document # 1552. Therefore, document #1553 is stricken. #1553 (ake)
November 23, 2009 Filing 1553 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer regarding matters to be litigated and the related scope of discovery. For reasons stated on the record, the Court may re-open discovery. The parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding matters to be litigated. Thereafter, the parties shall file a supplemental brief in chart format indicating issues for trial, any objections, and any related discovery. The brief shall also address going to mediation. The parties supplemental brief shall be filed by no later than December 16, 2009.The Court continues the hearing on plaintiffs motion to December 21, 2009 at 9:30 a.m.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (ake)
November 23, 2009 Filing 1552 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer regarding matters to be litigated and the related scope of discovery. For reasons stated on the record, the Court may re-open discovery. The parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding matters to be litigated. Thereafter, the parties shall file a supplemental brief in chart format indicating issues for trial, any objections, and any related discovery. The brief shall also address going to mediation. The parties supplemental brief shall be filed by no later than December 16, 2009.The Court continues the hearing on plaintiffs motion to December 21, 2009 at 9:30 a.m.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (ake)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1551 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1548 ,IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Rocio Gonzalez, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Rocio NMI Gonzalez terminated. (pj)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1550 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR TIMOTHY LONG by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1545 . IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Timothy Long, is hereby dismissedfrom the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Timothy M Long terminated. (pj)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1549 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR JASON LACEY by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1544 ,IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Jason Lacey, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice Jason Lacey terminated. (pj)
November 17, 2009 Filing 1548 STIPULATION to Dismiss Pliantiff Rocio NMI Gonzalez filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal of Rocio Gonzalez)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 16, 2009 Filing 1547 STATEMENT (JOINT) REGARDING COLLECTIVE ISSUES PURSUANT TO OCTOBER 26, 2009 ORDER filed by Defendant City of Long Beach re: Order on Application to Set Aside Order/Judgment, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, #1534 . (Orozco, Robert)
November 16, 2009 Filing 1546 NOTICE OF RELEVANT AUTHORITY REGARDING DECERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTIONS INVOLVING POLICE OFFICERS re MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 #1439 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
November 16, 2009 Filing 1545 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Timothy M Long filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal of Timothy Long)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 16, 2009 Filing 1544 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Jason Lacey filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal of Jason Lacey)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1543 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR JUAN MEDINA by Judge George H. Wu: Upon Stipulation #1536 , IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Juan Medina, is hereby dismissed from the matter without prejudice. (gk)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1542 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR JAMES FELLOWS by Judge George H. Wu: Upon Stipulation #1537 , IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, James Fellows, is hereby dismissed from the matter without prejudice. (gk)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1541 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR MATTHEW ESPROLES by Judge George H. Wu: Upon Stipulation #1538 , IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Matthew Esproles, is hereby dismissed from the matter without prejudice. (gk)
November 6, 2009 Filing 1540 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#14) to Prevent Prohibit any reference to Patterson, et al. v. City of Long Beach MOTION IN LIMINE (#14) to Prevent Prohibit any reference to Patterson, et al. v. City of Long Beach #1499 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
November 5, 2009 Filing 1539 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Fenja Klaus counsel for Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Klaus, Fenja)
November 2, 2009 Filing 1538 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Matthew Esproles filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Esproles)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 2, 2009 Filing 1537 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff James Earl Fellows filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for James Fellows)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 2, 2009 Filing 1536 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Juan J Medina filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Juan Medina)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 28, 2009 Filing 1535 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge George H. Wu re: MOTION to Compel Discovery #1433 . Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is set for hearing on 11/23/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. All other matters discussed at the hearing on 10/26/2009 will also be set for 11/23/2009. (rj)
October 26, 2009 Filing 1534 MINUTES OF HEARING RE DECERTIFICATION OF THE CLASS, DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF SEPTEMBER 21, 2009 MINUTE ORDER, PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY and PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE COMPENSABILITY OF DONNING AND DOFFING THE POLICE UNIFORM held before Judge George H Wu: [See document for details]. #1431 #1434 Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (ake)
October 26, 2009 Filing 1533 Non-Opposition Non-Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#15) to Prevent Prohibit any Reference or Testimony to Alleged Domestic Violence Complaints Against Former Police Chief Anthony Batts MOTION IN LIMINE (#15) to Prevent Prohibit any Reference or Testimony to Alleged Domestic Violence Complaints Against Former Police Chief Anthony Batts #1500 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 26, 2009 Filing 1532 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#14) to Prevent Prohibit any reference to Patterson, et al. v. City of Long Beach MOTION IN LIMINE (#14) to Prevent Prohibit any reference to Patterson, et al. v. City of Long Beach #1499 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 14 to Prohibit any Reference or Testimony to Pattersson, et al. v. City of Long Beach filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1531 Proposed Joint Exhibit List filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs and Defendants Proposed Joint Exhibit List)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1530 Joint Stipulated Facts For Trial filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards re: Jury Verdict (Proposed) #1526 , Jury Instructions (Proposed) #1529 , Statement #1527 , Witness List #1525 , Jury Instructions (Proposed) #1528 (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1529 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Plaintiff and Defendants Annotated Proposed Joint Jury Instructions set) filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards.. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1528 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Joint Annotated set) filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards.. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1527 STATEMENT Joint Statement of the Case filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards re: Jury Verdict (Proposed) #1526 , Witness List #1525 . (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1526 PROPOSED Special JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1525 Witness List filed by Plaintiffs' and Defendant's Proposed Joint Witness List Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards.. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1524 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#13) to Exclude Reference to any Discussion or Argument Outside of the Two Year Statute of Limitations Period Until Plaintiffs Meet Their Evidentiary Burden to Establish a Willful Violation MOTION IN LIMINE (#13) to Exclude Reference to any Discussion or Argument Outside of the Two Year Statute of Limitations Period Until Plaintiffs Meet Their Evidentiary Burden to Establish a Willful Violation #1464 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1523 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#11) to Exclude Witness from Courtroom Prior to Testifying MOTION IN LIMINE (#11) to Exclude Witness from Courtroom Prior to Testifying #1462 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1522 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE #8 to Preclude To Preclude Evidence of Affirmative Defenses #1450 Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 8 to Preclude References to and Evidence in Support of the City of Long Beach's Affirmative Defense of Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, Statute of Limitations, Estoppel and Waiver and Doctrine of Res Judicata and or Collateral Estoppel filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1521 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude Reference to a "Police Culture" Prohibiting the Submission of Overtime Requests; Declaration of Robert A. Orozco; Exhibits A-C MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude Reference to a "Police Culture" Prohibiting the Submission of Overtime Requests; Declaration of Robert A. Orozco; Exhibits A-C #1460 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1520 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Reference to any Other Police Department Policies Regarding the FLSA, Donning and Doffing or Other Departmental Procedures MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Reference to any Other Police Department Policies Regarding the FLSA, Donning and Doffing or Other Departmental Procedures #1459 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1519 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Reference to any Employer Training Obligation Under the FLSA MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Reference to any Employer Training Obligation Under the FLSA #1458 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1518 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE #7 to Preclude Testimony and Report of Designated Expert Witness Elaine Reardon #1449 Plaintiffs Reply to Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Testimony and Report of Disgnated Expert Elaine Reardon filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1517 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Reference to any Fear of Commuting to and from an Officer's Residence in Uniform MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Reference to any Fear of Commuting to and from an Officer's Residence in Uniform #1456 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1516 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Portions of Expert Report of Oliver Lee Drummond MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Portions of Expert Report of Oliver Lee Drummond #1455 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1515 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE #6 to Preclude Plaintiffs Annual Income #1448 Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 6 to Preclude all References to Plaintiffs Annual Income filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1514 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO ADMIT PRIOR INCONSISTENT DEPOSITION TESTIMONY re MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Admit Prior Inconsistent Deposition Testimony MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Admit Prior Inconsistent Deposition Testimony #1454 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1513 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE #5 to Preclude Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude All References to and Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs Past Personnel and or Disciplinary Issues not Relevant to the Case #1447 Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants Opposiiton to Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude All Reference to and Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs; Past Personnel and or Disciplinary Issues not Relevant to the Case filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1512 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiff to Exclude Granting Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 4 to Exclude All Witnesses and Exhibits Disclosed After the Parties L.R. 16-2 Meeting of Counsel, Or in the Alternative Previously Undisclosed Witnesses and Exhibits #1446 Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude All Witnesses and Exhibits Disclosed After the PartiesL.R. 16-2 Meeting of Counsel, or in the Alternative Previously Undisclosed Witnesses and Exhibits Pursuant to Rule 26 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1511 Opposition Opposiiton re: MOTION IN LIMINE #3 to Preclude References to and Evidence in Support of Extra-Judicial Statements Made by Non-Parties to this Action or any Parties' Attorneys #1445 Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude All Rerferences to And Evidence In Support of Extra-Judicial Statements Made By Non-Parties to This Action or Any Parties Attorneys filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1510 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE #2 to Preclude All Reference to The City of Long Beach's Current Budget Deficit, Intention to Seek Bankruptcy Protection Inability to Pay a Significant Monetary Judgment #1444 Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 2 to Preclude All References to The City of Long Beach's Current Budget Deficit, Intention to Seek Bankruptcy Protection and or Purported Inabeility Monetary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 23, 2009 Filing 1509 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE #1 to Exclude Non-Testifying Witnesses From The Courtroom #1443 Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion In Limine No. 1 to Exclude Non-Testifying Witnesses From The Courtroom filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 21, 2009 Filing 1508 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Fenja Klaus counsel for Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Changing firm name to Law Offices of Herbert Hafif. Changing e-mail to fklaus@hafif.com. Adding fklaus@hafif.com as attorney as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Kenneth Paul Edwards (Klaus, Fenja)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1507 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE #8 to Preclude To Preclude Evidence of Affirmative Defenses #1450 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1506 Opposition in opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE #7 to Preclude Testimony and Report of Designated Expert Witness Elaine Reardon #1449 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1505 Opposition in opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE #1 to Exclude Non-Testifying Witnesses From The Courtroom #1443 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1504 DECLARATION of Samantha W. Zutler in support of opposition MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiff to Exclude Granting Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 4 to Exclude All Witnesses and Exhibits Disclosed After the Parties L.R. 16-2 Meeting of Counsel, Or in the Alternative Previously Undisclosed Witnesses and Exhibits #1446 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1503 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiff to Exclude Granting Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 4 to Exclude All Witnesses and Exhibits Disclosed After the Parties L.R. 16-2 Meeting of Counsel, Or in the Alternative Previously Undisclosed Witnesses and Exhibits #1446 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1502 DECLARATION of Robert A. Orozco in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#14) to Prevent Prohibit any reference to Patterson, et al. v. City of Long Beach MOTION IN LIMINE (#14) to Prevent Prohibit any reference to Patterson, et al. v. City of Long Beach #1499 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#16) to Exclude Testimony of Craig Patterson, Warren Harris, and David Gage MOTION IN LIMINE (#16) to Exclude Testimony of Craig Patterson, Warren Harris, and David Gage #1501 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#15) to Prevent Prohibit any Reference or Testimony to Alleged Domestic Violence Complaints Against Former Police Chief Anthony Batts MOTION IN LIMINE (#15) to Prevent Prohibit any Reference or Testimony to Alleged Domestic Violence Complaints Against Former Police Chief Anthony Batts #1500 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1501 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#16) to Exclude Testimony of Craig Patterson, Warren Harris, and David Gage filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1500 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#15) to Prevent Prohibit any Reference or Testimony to Alleged Domestic Violence Complaints Against Former Police Chief Anthony Batts filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1499 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#14) to Prevent Prohibit any reference to Patterson, et al. v. City of Long Beach filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1498 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE #6 to Preclude Plaintiffs Annual Income #1448 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1497 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE #5 to Preclude Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude All References to and Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs Past Personnel and or Disciplinary Issues not Relevant to the Case #1447 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1496 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE #3 to Preclude References to and Evidence in Support of Extra-Judicial Statements Made by Non-Parties to this Action or any Parties' Attorneys #1445 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1495 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE #2 to Preclude All Reference to The City of Long Beach's Current Budget Deficit, Intention to Seek Bankruptcy Protection Inability to Pay a Significant Monetary Judgment #1444 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1494 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#13) to Exclude Reference to any Discussion or Argument Outside of the Two Year Statute of Limitations Period Until Plaintiffs Meet Their Evidentiary Burden to Establish a Willful Violation MOTION IN LIMINE (#13) to Exclude Reference to any Discussion or Argument Outside of the Two Year Statute of Limitations Period Until Plaintiffs Meet Their Evidentiary Burden to Establish a Willful Violation #1464 Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants MIL No. 13 to Exclude Reference to any Discussion or Agrument outside of Two Year Statute fo LImitation Until Plaintiffs Meet Their Evidentiary Burden to Establish a Willful Violation filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1493 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#12) to Introduce /Identify Witness Scheduled to Testify Before Being Called MOTION IN LIMINE (#12) to Introduce /Identify Witness Scheduled to Testify Before Being Called #1463 Plaintiffs Non-Opposition to Defendants MIL No. 12 to Identify Witness Scheduled to Testify Before Being Called filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1492 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#11) to Exclude Witness from Courtroom Prior to Testifying MOTION IN LIMINE (#11) to Exclude Witness from Courtroom Prior to Testifying #1462 Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition to Defendants MIL No. 11 to Preclude Witness from Courtroom Prior to Testifying filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1491 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) to Exclude Non-Disclosed and Undeposed Witnesses MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) to Exclude Non-Disclosed and Undeposed Witnesses #1461 Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition to Defendants MIL No.10 to Exclude Non-Disclosed and Undeposed Witnesses filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1490 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Reference to any Other Police Department Policies Regarding the FLSA, Donning and Doffing or Other Departmental Procedures MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Reference to any Other Police Department Policies Regarding the FLSA, Donning and Doffing or Other Departmental Procedures #1459 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 9 to Exclude Reference to a "Police Culture" Prohibiting the Submission of Overtime Requests & Declaration of Fenja Klaus filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1489 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Reference to any Other Police Department Policies Regarding the FLSA, Donning and Doffing or Other Departmental Procedures MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Reference to any Other Police Department Policies Regarding the FLSA, Donning and Doffing or Other Departmental Procedures #1459 Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants MIL No. 8 to Exclude Reference to Any Other Police Department Policies Re The FLSA, Donning & Doffing or other Departmental Procedures filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1488 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Reference to any Employer Training Obligation Under the FLSA MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Reference to any Employer Training Obligation Under the FLSA #1458 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants MIL No. 7 to Exclude Reference to Any Employer Training Obligation Under the FLSA filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1487 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Reference to any Other FLSA Lawsuits against Police Departments or Cities MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Reference to any Other FLSA Lawsuits against Police Departments or Cities #1457 Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 6 to Exclude Reference to any Other FLSA Lawsuits against Police Departments or Cities filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1486 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Reference to any Fear of Commuting to and from an Officer's Residence in Uniform MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Reference to any Fear of Commuting to and from an Officer's Residence in Uniform #1456 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants MIL No. 5 to Exclude Reference to any Fear of Commuting to and From an Officer's Residence in Uniform filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1485 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Portions of Expert Report of Oliver Lee Drummond MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Portions of Expert Report of Oliver Lee Drummond #1455 Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants MIL no. 4 to Exclude Portions of Expert Report of Oliver Lee Drummond & Declaration of Fenja Klaus filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1484 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Admit Prior Inconsistent Deposition Testimony MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Admit Prior Inconsistent Deposition Testimony #1454 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Admit Prior Inconsistent Deposition Testimony filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1483 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Reference or Evidence of Settlement Discussions Between Plaintiffs and the City of Long Beach MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Reference or Evidence of Settlement Discussions Between Plaintiffs and the City of Long Beach #1453 Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Reference or Evidence of Settlement Discussions Between Plaintiffs and the City of Long Beach filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 19, 2009 Filing 1482 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Reference to any Previous FLSA Lawsuit Against Defendant City of Long Beach MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Reference to any Previous FLSA Lawsuit Against Defendant City of Long Beach #1452 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Reference to Any Previouse FLSA Lawsuit Against Defendant City of Long Beach filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 16, 2009 Filing 1481 REPLY Opposition MOTION for Reconsideration re Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,, #1389 MOTION for Reconsideration re Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,, #1389 MOTION for Reconsideration re Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,, #1389 MOTION for Reconsideration re Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,, #1389 #1434 Plaintiffs' Reply to Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration Re Compensability of Donning and Doffing The Police Uniform filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 16, 2009 Filing 1480 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 14, 2009 Filing 1479 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER before Judge George H Wu: Counsel are hereby notified, that on the Courts own motion, the Hearing re Decertification of the Class and Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery #1433 , filed on October 1, 2009, and presently set for hearing on October 19, 2009, are continued to October 26, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jag)
October 14, 2009 Filing 1478 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 #1439 City's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objection and Motion to Strike Report and Declaration of Elaine Reardon in Support of Decertification Briefing filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
October 14, 2009 Filing 1477 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Incorrect defendant Laurence Walker Jr was selected. The correct defendant re the "Order and Dismissal" filed on 9/21/2009 is Laurence E Walker #1429 (pj)
October 12, 2009 Filing 1476 OBJECTIONS to Supplement(Motion related) #1436 , Reply (Motion related) #1468 Defendant City of Long Beach's Objection and Response to Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Supplemental Briefing filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
October 12, 2009 Filing 1475 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 9, 2009 Filing 1474 DECLARATION of Robert A. Orozco in support of MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 #1439 re reply to supplemental opposition filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 9, 2009 Filing 1473 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS re: MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 #1439 to Declaration of Miguel G. Caballero filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 9, 2009 Filing 1472 REPLY to Supplemental Opposition to Motion to Decertify filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 9, 2009 Filing 1471 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Reconsideration re Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,, #1389 MOTION for Reconsideration re Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,, #1389 MOTION for Reconsideration re Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,, #1389 MOTION for Reconsideration re Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,, #1389 #1434 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
October 9, 2009 Filing 1470 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Memorandum of Contentions of fact and law under PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DOCUMENTS RE: Miscellaneous Document #1466 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
October 9, 2009 Filing 1469 Objection Objection re: MOTION for Hearing Decertification, Trial Management, Motion to Compel, re MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) #1433 , MOTION to Se MOTION for Hearing Decertification, Trial Management, Motion to Compel, re MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) #1433 , MOTION to Se MOTION for Hearing Decertification, Trial Management, Motion to Compel, re MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) #1433 , MOTION to Se MOTION for Hearing Decertification, Trial Management, Motion to Compel, re MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) #1433 , MOTION to Se #1437 , MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 #1439 Plaintiffs Objection and Motion to Strike Report of Elaine Reardon in Support of Decertification Briefing filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 9, 2009 Filing 1468 REPLY To Defendants Supplemental Briefing Regarding Selecting Representative Plaintiff For Trial and Manner of Conducting Trial filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 9, 2009 Filing 1467 REPLY MOTION for Hearing Decertification, Trial Management, Motion to Compel, re MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) #1433 , MOTION to Se MOTION for Hearing Decertification, Trial Management, Motion to Compel, re MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) #1433 , MOTION to Se MOTION for Hearing Decertification, Trial Management, Motion to Compel, re MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) #1433 , MOTION to Se MOTION for Hearing Decertification, Trial Management, Motion to Compel, re MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) #1433 , MOTION to Se #1437 , MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 #1439 Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Supplemental Briefing Regarding Decertification filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1466 Contentions of Fact and Law Pursuant to Local Rule 16-4 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach (Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1465 DECLARATION of Robert A. Orozco in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#13) to Exclude Reference to any Discussion or Argument Outside of the Two Year Statute of Limitations Period Until Plaintiffs Meet Their Evidentiary Burden to Establish a Willful Violation MOTION IN LIMINE (#13) to Exclude Reference to any Discussion or Argument Outside of the Two Year Statute of Limitations Period Until Plaintiffs Meet Their Evidentiary Burden to Establish a Willful Violation #1464 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Admit Prior Inconsistent Deposition Testimony MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Admit Prior Inconsistent Deposition Testimony #1454 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Reference to any Other FLSA Lawsuits against Police Departments or Cities MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Reference to any Other FLSA Lawsuits against Police Departments or Cities #1457 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Reference to any Previous FLSA Lawsuit Against Defendant City of Long Beach MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Reference to any Previous FLSA Lawsuit Against Defendant City of Long Beach #1452 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Reference to any Fear of Commuting to and from an Officer's Residence in Uniform MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Reference to any Fear of Commuting to and from an Officer's Residence in Uniform #1456 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#12) to Introduce /Identify Witness Scheduled to Testify Before Being Called MOTION IN LIMINE (#12) to Introduce /Identify Witness Scheduled to Testify Before Being Called #1463 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) to Exclude Non-Disclosed and Undeposed Witnesses MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) to Exclude Non-Disclosed and Undeposed Witnesses #1461 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Reference to any Other Police Department Policies Regarding the FLSA, Donning and Doffing or Other Departmental Procedures MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Reference to any Other Police Department Policies Regarding the FLSA, Donning and Doffing or Other Departmental Procedures #1459 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Reference to any Employer Training Obligation Under the FLSA MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Reference to any Employer Training Obligation Under the FLSA #1458 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#11) to Exclude Witness from Courtroom Prior to Testifying MOTION IN LIMINE (#11) to Exclude Witness from Courtroom Prior to Testifying #1462 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Portions of Expert Report of Oliver Lee Drummond MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Portions of Expert Report of Oliver Lee Drummond #1455 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Reference or Evidence of Settlement Discussions Between Plaintiffs and the City of Long Beach MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Reference or Evidence of Settlement Discussions Between Plaintiffs and the City of Long Beach #1453 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude Reference to a "Police Culture" Prohibiting the Submission of Overtime Requests; Declaration of Robert A. Orozco; Exhibits A-C MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude Reference to a "Police Culture" Prohibiting the Submission of Overtime Requests; Declaration of Robert A. Orozco; Exhibits A-C #1460 Meet and Confer re City's Motions in Limine filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1464 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#13) to Exclude Reference to any Discussion or Argument Outside of the Two Year Statute of Limitations Period Until Plaintiffs Meet Their Evidentiary Burden to Establish a Willful Violation filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1463 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#12) to Introduce /Identify Witness Scheduled to Testify Before Being Called filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1462 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#11) to Exclude Witness from Courtroom Prior to Testifying filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1461 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#10) to Exclude Non-Disclosed and Undeposed Witnesses filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1460 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#9) to Exclude Reference to a "Police Culture" Prohibiting the Submission of Overtime Requests; Declaration of Robert A. Orozco; Exhibits A-C filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1459 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#8) to Exclude Reference to any Other Police Department Policies Regarding the FLSA, Donning and Doffing or Other Departmental Procedures filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1458 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Reference to any Employer Training Obligation Under the FLSA filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1457 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude Reference to any Other FLSA Lawsuits against Police Departments or Cities filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1456 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Reference to any Fear of Commuting to and from an Officer's Residence in Uniform filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1455 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Portions of Expert Report of Oliver Lee Drummond filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1454 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Admit Prior Inconsistent Deposition Testimony filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1453 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Reference or Evidence of Settlement Discussions Between Plaintiffs and the City of Long Beach filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1452 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Reference to any Previous FLSA Lawsuit Against Defendant City of Long Beach filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1451 DECLARATION of Kenneth L. Mariboho, II re MOTION IN LIMINE #7 to Preclude Testimony and Report of Designated Expert Witness Elaine Reardon #1449 , MOTION IN LIMINE #6 to Preclude Plaintiffs Annual Income #1448 , MOTION IN LIMINE #1 to Exclude Non-Testifying Witnesses From The Courtroom #1443 , MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiff to Exclude Granting Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 4 to Exclude All Witnesses and Exhibits Disclosed After the Parties L.R. 16-2 Meeting of Counsel, Or in the Alternative Previously Undisclosed Witnesses and Exhibits #1446 , MOTION IN LIMINE #5 to Preclude Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude All References to and Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs Past Personnel and or Disciplinary Issues not Relevant to the Case #1447 , MOTION IN LIMINE #2 to Preclude All Reference to The City of Long Beach's Current Budget Deficit, Intention to Seek Bankruptcy Protection Inability to Pay a Significant Monetary Judgment #1444 , MOTION IN LIMINE #8 to Preclude To Preclude Evidence of Affirmative Defenses #1450 , MOTION IN LIMINE #3 to Preclude References to and Evidence in Support of Extra-Judicial Statements Made by Non-Parties to this Action or any Parties' Attorneys #1445 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1450 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #8 to Preclude To Preclude Evidence of Affirmative Defenses filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Pltf's MIL No. 8 to Preclude Evidence of Affirmative Defenses)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1449 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #7 to Preclude Testimony and Report of Designated Expert Witness Elaine Reardon filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 7 to Preclude Testimony and Report of Designated Expert Witness Elaine Reardon)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1448 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #6 to Preclude Plaintiffs Annual Income filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine 6 to Preclude all References to Plaintiffs' Annual Income)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1447 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #5 to Preclude Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude All References to and Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs Past Personnel and or Disciplinary Issues not Relevant to the Case filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude All References to and Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs Past Personnel and or Disciplinary Issues not Relevant to the Case; Declaration of Kenneth L. Mariboho)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1446 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiff to Exclude Granting Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 4 to Exclude All Witnesses and Exhibits Disclosed After the Parties L.R. 16-2 Meeting of Counsel, Or in the Alternative Previously Undisclosed Witnesses and Exhibits Pursuant to Rule 26 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Granting Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 4 to Exclude All Witnesses and Exhibits Disclosed After the Parties L.R. 16-2 Meeting of Counsel, Or in the Alternative Previously Undisclosed Witnesses and Exhibits Pursuant to Rule 26)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1445 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #3 to Preclude References to and Evidence in Support of Extra-Judicial Statements Made by Non-Parties to this Action or any Parties' Attorneys filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3 to Precluse All Reference to and Evidence in Support of Extra-Judicial Statements Made by Non-Parties to This Action or any Parties' Attorneys)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1444 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #2 to Preclude All Reference to The City of Long Beach's Current Budget Deficit, Intention to Seek Bankruptcy Protection Inability to Pay a Significant Monetary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 2 to Preclude all References to the City of Long Beach's Current Budget Deficit, Intention to Seek Bankruptcy Protection and or Purposed Inability to Pay a Significant Monetary Judgment)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1443 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE #1 to Exclude Non-Testifying Witnesses From The Courtroom filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Non-Testifying Witnesses From the Courtroom)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1442 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards.. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1441 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 8, 2009 Filing 1440 PROPOSED Special JURY VERDICT filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
October 5, 2009 Filing 1439 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Motion to Decertify re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Zutler, Samantha)
October 5, 2009 Filing 1438 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion for Decertification and Declaration of Miguel G. Caballero in Support of Plaintiff Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion for Decertification filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Miguel G. Caballero in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion for Decertification, #2 100509 - Exh 84 - 85 Bate Stamp 1 -18, #3 100509 - Exh 86 Bate Stamp 19 - 59, #4 100509 - Exh 86 Bate Stamp 60 - 119, #5 100509 - Exh 86 Bate Stamp 120 - 189, #6 100509 - Exh 86 Bate Stamp 190 - 259, #7 100509 - Exh 86 Bate Stamp 260 - 324, #8 100509 - Exh 87 - 88 Bate Stamp 325 - 389, #9 100509 - Exh 89 Bate Stamp 390 - 437, #10 100509 - Exh 90 - 94 Bate Stamp 438 - 456)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 5, 2009 Filing 1437 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Hearing Decertification, Trial Management, Motion to Compel, re MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) #1433 , MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 , MOTION for Order for Regarding Selection of Representative Plaintiffs for Trial & Manner of Conducting Trial #1293 , Notice of Hearing For Decertificaiton Motion and Motion on Trial Management and motion to Compel, Declaration of Miguel G. Caballero filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 5, 2009 Filing 1436 SUPPLEMENT BRIEF RE AN ORDER RE SELECTION OF REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFFS FOR TRIAL AND MANNER OF CONDUCTING TRIAL filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
October 5, 2009 Filing 1435 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Order for Regarding Selection of Representative Plaintiffs for Trial & Manner of Conducting Trial #1293 Supplemental Briefing on Manner of Conducting Trial in The Instant Case; Declaration of Miguel G. Caballero filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
October 2, 2009 Filing 1434 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Motion Hearing, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,, #1389 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration re Compensability of Donning & Doffing the Police Uniform, Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Untroverted Fact re Motion to Reconsider Compensability of Donning & Doffing of Uniform, #3 Plaintiffs Appendix of Evidence in Support of Motion for Reconsideration re Compensability of Donning & Doffing Uniform, #4 Exhibit Tab Bate Stamp 000001 - 000048, #5 Exh Tab Bate Stamp 000049 - 000089, #6 Exh Tab Bate Stamp 000090 - 000135, #7 Exh Tab Bate Stamp 000136 - 000181, #8 Order re Motion for Reconsideration re compensability of donning & doffing uniform)(Caballero, Miguel)
October 1, 2009 Filing 1433 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery (Filed Concurrently with Joint Stipulation) filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' Discovery Request, #2 Declaration of Miguel G. Caballero re Joint Stipulaiton Regarding Plaintiffs' Disvovery Requests)(Caballero, Miguel)
September 28, 2009 Filing 1432 Opposition Opposition re: APPLICATION to Set Aside Order on Motion for Summary Adjudication,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, Motion Hearing, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1430 APPLICATION to Set Aside Order on Motion for Summary Adjudication,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, Motion Hearing, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1430 #1431 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Application for Clarification/Modification of Minute Order Issued September 21, 2009 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
September 25, 2009 Filing 1431 APPLICATION to Set Aside Order on Motion for Summary Adjudication,, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, Motion Hearing, Link Motions to Minutes,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1430 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zutler, Samantha)
September 21, 2009 Filing 1430 MINUTES of Motion Hearing held before Judge George H Wu: Proceedings: Plaintiffs' #1319 Motion for Summary Adjudication Re: Donning and Doffing; Plaintiffs' #1320 Motion for Summary Adjudication Re: Defendant's 207K Exemption Defense; Defendant City of Long Beach's #1325 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Donning and Doffing; Defendant City of Long Beach's #1342 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Sergeants and Lietenants. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication Re Donning and Doffing is denied. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense is denied. Defendant City of Long Beach's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Donning and Doffing is denied. Defendant City of Long Beach's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Sergeants and Lieutenants is denied. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox (mg)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1429 ORDER upon Stipulation #1416 dismisses plaintiff Laurence Walker, Jr without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1428 ORDER upon Stipulation #1418 dismisses plaintiff Richard Bell without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1427 ORDER upon Stipulation #1417 dismisses plaintiff Brian J Bell without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc) Modified on 9/21/2009 (lc).
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1426 ORDER upon Stipulation #1419 dismisses Plaintiff, Chris Valdez without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1425 ORDER upon Stipulation #1420 dismisses plaintiff Michael A Lewis without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
September 16, 2009 Filing 1424 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Gregory G Petersen counsel for Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Fenja Klaus will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Fenja Klaus is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Petersen, Gregory)
September 16, 2009 Filing 1423 NOTICE Notice of Unavailability of Plaintiff's Counsel - Gregory G. Petersen filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Petersen, Gregory)
September 16, 2009 Filing 1422 Opposition Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Response to Discovery Requests #1421 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant City of Long Beach's Statement re Discovery Responses (City's Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth L. Mariboho II, In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant City of Long Beach's Statement re Discovery Responses(City's Motion to Compel))(Mariboho, Kenneth)
September 14, 2009 Filing 1421 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Response to Discovery Requests filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 2), #3 Exhibit Exh. B (Part 1), #4 Exhibit Exh. B (Part 2), #5 Exhibit Exh. B (Part 3), #6 Exhibit Exh. B. (Part 4), #7 Exhibit Exh. C (Part 1), #8 Exhibit Exh. C (Part 2), #9 Exhibit Exh. C (Part 3), #10 Exhibit Exh. C (Part 4), #11 Exhibit Exh. C (Part 5), #12 Exhibit Exh. D, #13 Exhibit Exh. E (Part 1), #14 Exhibit Exh. E (Part 2), #15 Exhibit Exh. F)(Zutler, Samantha)
September 14, 2009 Filing 1420 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael A Lewis filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Michael Lewis)(Caballero, Miguel)
September 14, 2009 Filing 1419 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Chris Valdez filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Chris Valdez)(Caballero, Miguel)
September 14, 2009 Filing 1418 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Richard Bell filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Richard Bell)(Caballero, Miguel)
September 14, 2009 Filing 1417 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Brian J Bell filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Brian Bell)(Caballero, Miguel)
September 14, 2009 Filing 1416 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Laurence Walker, Jr filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Laurence E. Walker)(Caballero, Miguel)
September 11, 2009 Filing 1415 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS RE DE MINIMIS BRIEF filed by Defendant City of Long Beach re: Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) #1411 (Orozco, Robert)
September 11, 2009 Filing 1414 DECLARATION of Robert A. Orozco in support of Supplemental MOTION to Supplement Brief re De Minimis Doctrine #1412 ; Exhibits A - W filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - Q, #2 Exhibit R - W)(Orozco, Robert)
September 11, 2009 Filing 1413 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS in support re: Supplemental MOTION to Supplement Brief re De Minimis Doctrine #1412 to Plaintiffs' Evidence filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
September 11, 2009 Filing 1412 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Supplemental MOTION to Supplement Brief re De Minimis Doctrine filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 9/21/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Orozco, Robert)
September 11, 2009 Filing 1411 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Regarding Donning and Doffing #1319 Notice of Recent Relevant Authority Re: Plaintiffs' Supplemental Filing re De Minimis filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Mariboho, Kenneth)
September 11, 2009 Filing 1410 SUPPLEMENT Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Sergeants and Lieutenats filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth L. Mariboho II, In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: Sergeants & Lieutenants)(Mariboho, Kenneth)
August 31, 2009 Filing 1409 SUPPLEMENT Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief re De Minimis Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Untroverted Facts re De Minimis Brief, #2 083109 - Plfts Appendix of Evident in Support of Pltfs De Minimis Brief, #3 Exhibit 100 - 112 Bate Stamp 000001 - 000031, #4 Exhibit 113 - 129 Bate Stamp 000032 - 000065, #5 Exhibit 130 -147 Bate Stamp 000066 - 000102, #6 Exhibit 148 - 169 Bate Stamp 000103 -000149, #7 Exhibit 170 - 189 Bate Stamp 000150 - 000189, #8 Exhibit 190 - 209 Bate Stamp 000190 - 000233, #9 Exhibit 210 - 229 Bate Stamp 000234 -000273, #10 Exhibit 230 - 247 Bate Stamp 000274 - 000315, #11 Exhibit 248 - 269 Bate Stamp 000316 - 000359, #12 Exhibit 270 - 289 Bate Stamp 000360 - 000401, #13 Exhibit 290 - 309 Bate Stamp 000402 - 000442, #14 Exhibit 310 - 329 Bate Stamp 000443 - 000482, #15 Exhibit 330 - 341 Bate Stamp 000483 - 000511, #16 083109 - Dec of Oliver Lee Drummond In Support of Plfs Deminims Brief with Exh A - Q)(Caballero, Miguel)
August 31, 2009 Filing 1408 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to SERGEANTS AND LIEUTENANTS - THIS DOCUMENT REPLACES DOC #1329 WHICH INADVERTENTLY HAD THE WRONG ATTACHMENT #1342 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samantha W. Zutler in Support of City of Long Beach's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Sergeants and Lieutenants (RE 29 C.F.R. 541.3(B)(1)), #2 Declaration of Sergeant Blair in Support of City of Long Beach's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Sergeants and Lieutenants (RE 29 C.F.R. 541.3(B)(1)), #3 Declaration of Lieutenant Josef Levy in Support of City of Long Beach's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Sergeants and Lieutenants (RE 29 C.F.R. 541.3(B)(1)))(Zutler, Samantha)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 ORDER AND DISMISSAL OF RICHARD RAMIREZ re Stipulation #1402 by Judge George H Wu. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff, Richard Ramirez, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1406 ORDER upon Stipulation #1400 that Plaintiff, Ryan Le Baron, is hereby dismissedfrom the above-captioned matter without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 ORDER upon Stipulation #1401 that Plaintiff, Charlotte Alu, is hereby dismissedfrom the above-captioned matter without prejudice by Judge George H Wu, (lc)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1404 ORDER upon Stipulation #1403 that Plaintiff, Delon Johns, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
August 19, 2009 Filing 1403 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Delon Johns filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Delon Johns)(Caballero, Miguel)
August 19, 2009 Filing 1402 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Ricardo Ramirez filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Richard Ramirez)(Caballero, Miguel)
August 19, 2009 Filing 1401 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Charlotte M Alu filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal of Charlotte Alu)(Caballero, Miguel)
August 19, 2009 Filing 1400 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Ryan B Lebaron filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal Fro Ryan Le Baron)(Caballero, Miguel)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1399 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff Reginald Vega is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Re: Stipulation #1394 . (mg)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1398 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff Eric Hooker is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Re: Stipulation #1393 . (mg)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1397 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff James Williams is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Re: Stipulation #1392 . (mg)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1396 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff Carlos Del Real is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Re: Stipulation #1391 . (mg)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff William Neal is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Re Stipulation #1390 . (mg)
August 14, 2009 Filing 1394 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Reginald Vega filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Reginald Vega)(Caballero, Miguel)
August 14, 2009 Filing 1393 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Eric Hooker filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal of Eric Hooker)(Caballero, Miguel)
August 14, 2009 Filing 1392 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff James A Williams filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal of James Williams)(Caballero, Miguel)
August 14, 2009 Filing 1391 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Carlos Del Real filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal of Carlos Del Real)(Caballero, Miguel)
August 14, 2009 Filing 1390 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff William Neal filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal for William Neal)(Caballero, Miguel)
August 10, 2009 Filing 1389 MINUTES OF re Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudiciation re: Donning and Doffing #1319 ; Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudiciation re: Defendant's 207K Exemption Defense #1320 ; Defendant City of Long Beach's Motion for partial Summary Judgment re Donning and Doffing #1325 ; Defendant City of Long Beach's Motion for partial Summary Judgment with respect to Plaintiffs' claims for liquidated damages and "willfulness" #1334 ; Defendant City of Long Beach's Motion for partial Summary Judgment re Sergeants and Lieutenants #1342 Hearing held before Judge George H Wu. Court hears oral argument as to the above-entitled motions. For reasons stated on the record, the parties will file supplemental briefs on or before August 31, 2009. Responses will be due on or before September 11, 2009. The above-entitled motions are continued to September 21, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. The Court's tentative ruling is hereby circulated (attached). Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (lom)
August 5, 2009 Filing 1388 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Deposition Transcripts re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to REGARDING DONNING AND DOFFING #1325 (Orozco, Robert)
August 4, 2009 Filing 1387 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of lodging Deposition Transcript in Connection with Motions For Summary Judgment re MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Regarding Donning and Doffing #1319 (Caballero, Miguel)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1386 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR DAN PRATT by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Dan Pratt, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1376 (Dan Pratt terminated.) (ake)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1385 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR ANDREW CALDERON by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Andrew Calderon, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1377 (Andrew E Calderon terminated.) (ake)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1384 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR MARK STEENHAUSEN by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Mark Steenhausen, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1378 (Mark Steenhausen terminated.) (ake)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1383 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR HILDE-YVETTE VALENZUELA by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Hilde-Yvette Valenzuela, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1379 (Hilda Yvette Valenzuela terminated.) (ake)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1382 MINUTES OF COURT ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H Wu. Counsel are hereby notified, that on the Court's own motion, the following motions, presently set for August 3, 2009, are continued to August 10, 2009 at 8:30 a.m.: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication re: Donning and Doffing, #1319 filed on June 26, 2009; 2. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication re: Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense #1320 , filed on June 26, 2009; 3. Defendant City of Long Beach's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment RegardingDonning and Doffing #1325 , filed on June 26, 2009; 4. Defendant City of Long Beach's Motion for Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Claims for Liquidated Damages and "Willfullness," #1334 filed on June 26, 2009;5. Defendant City of Long Beach's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment RegardingSergeants and Lieutenants #1329 , #1342 , filed on June 29, 2009. (lom)
July 27, 2009 Filing 1381 Objection Opposition re: MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Summary Adjudication re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense #1320 Plaintiffs' Objection To Defendants' Declarations Used to Support Its Opposition The Motion For Summary Adjudication, Re: Defendant's 207(k) Exemption Defense filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
July 27, 2009 Filing 1380 REPLY Opposition Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Opposition to The Motion for Summary Adjudication, re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
July 23, 2009 Filing 1379 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Hilda Yvette Valenzuela filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal of Hilde-Yvette Valenzuela)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 23, 2009 Filing 1378 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Mark Steenhausen filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal of Mark Steenhausen)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 23, 2009 Filing 1377 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Andrew E Calderon filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Andrew Calderon)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 23, 2009 Filing 1376 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Dan Pratt filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Dan Pratt)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1375 DECLARATION of ROBERT OROZCO in opposition to MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Summary Adjudication re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense #1320 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1374 DECLARATION of MICHAEL MANNING in opposition to MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Summary Adjudication re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense #1320 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1373 DECLARATION of SUZANNE MASON in opposition to MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Summary Adjudication re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense #1320 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-7)(Orozco, Robert)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1372 DECLARATION of WILLIAM H. STOREY in opposition to MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Summary Adjudication re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense #1320 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1371 DECLARATION of MICHAEL M. KUNST in opposition to MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Summary Adjudication re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense #1320 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1370 DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENCE re MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Summary Adjudication re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense #1320 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1369 DEFENDANT'S GENUINE ISSUES OF MATERIAL FACT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION re MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Summary Adjudication re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense #1320 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1368 OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Summary Adjudication re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense #1320 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1367 DECLARATION of Debra Bonesteel-Smith in support of opposition to MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Regarding Donning and Doffing #1319 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1366 DECLARATION of Lieutenant Galen Carroll in support of opposition to MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Regarding Donning and Doffing #1319 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1365 DECLARATION of Commander Gary Morrison in support of opposition MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Regarding Donning and Doffing #1319 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1364 DECLARATION of Chief of Police Anthony Batts in support MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Regarding Donning and Doffing #1319 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1363 DECLARATION of Samantha W. Zutler in support of MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Regarding Donning and Doffing #1319 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - P, #2 Exhibit Q - EE; F)(Zutler, Samantha)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1362 STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication re: Donning/Doffing MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Regarding Donning and Doffing #1319 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1361 Defendant City of Long Beach's Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication re: Donning/Doffing in opposition re: MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Regarding Donning and Doffing #1319 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1360 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Regarding Donning and Doffing #1319 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1359 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Sergeants and Lieutenants filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summ Judgment Regarding Sergeants and Lieutenants, #2 Declaration of Kenneth L. Mariboho in Support of Opposition to Defendants Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Sergeants & Lieutenants, #3 Exhibit A Bate Stamp 000001 - 000065, #4 Exhibit B - K Bate Stamp 000066 - 000135, #5 Exhibit L - X Bate Stamp 000136 - 000217)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1358 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion For Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Claims for Liquidated Damages and Willfulness filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Support of Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issues of Liquidated Damages and Willfulness, #2 Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment re Liquidated Damages and Willfulness Declaration of Miguel G. Caballero, #3 Exhibit 1 - 7 Bate Stamp 000001 - 000091, #4 Exhibit 8 - 14 Bate Stamp 000092 - 000195, #5 Exhibit 15 - 19 Bate Stamp 000196 - 000285, #6 Exhibit 20 - 25 Bate Stamp 000286 - 000356, #7 Exhibit 26 - 30 Bate Stamp 000357 - 000434, #8 Exhibit 31 - 36 Bate Stamp 000435 - 000509, #9 Exhibit 37 - 41 Bate Stamp 000510 - 000592, #10 Exhibit 42 -47 Bate Stamp 000593 - 000657, #11 Exhibit 48 - 53 Bate Stamp 000658 - 000716, #12 Exhibit 54 - 57 Bate Stamp 000717 - 000794, #13 Exhibit 58 - 64 Bate Stamp 000795 - 000858, #14 Exhibit 65 - 71 Bate Stamp 000859 - 000924, #15 Exhibit 72 - 78 Bate Stamp 000925 - 000989, #16 Exhibit 79 - 86 Bate Stamp 000990 - 001062, #17 Exhibit 87 - 90 Bate Stamp 001063 - 001123)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 17, 2009 Filing 1357 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Donning and Doffing and Points and Authorities filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Genuine Isues of Material Fact in Support of Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Donning & Doffing of The Uniform, #2 Plaintiffs Appendix II of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Adjudication, re Donning & Doffing and Supplemental Declaration of Kenneth L. Mariboho, #3 Exhibit 83 to 89 Bate Stamp 000702 - 000770, #4 Exhibit 90 to 99 Bate Stamp 000771 to 000839)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1356 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File #1353 The current filing deadline for all Oppositions to motions now scheduled for hearing on August 3, 2009 shall be continued from July 10, 2009 to July 17, 2009. (pj)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 ORDER continue the trial date and the final pre trial conference by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Continue #1354 :( Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2009 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu., Jury Trial set for 9/29/2009 09:00 AM before Judge George H Wu.) (pj)
July 10, 2009 Filing 1354 STIPULATION to Continue Trial from August 25, 2009 to September 29, 2009 filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Continue the Trial and Final Pre-Trial Conference)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 9, 2009 Filing 1353 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication set for hearing on August 3, 2009 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zutler, Samantha)
July 8, 2009 Filing 1352 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge George H Wu: The followings motions set for July 16, 2009 are continued to August 3, 2009 8:30am. (see attached for further details) #1320 , #1342 , #1334 , #1319 , #1325 . ( Motion set for hearing on 8/3/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu.) (pj)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1351 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1346 , IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Jerry Gibbs, is hereby dismissed fromthe above-captioned matter without prejudice. Jerry M Gibbs terminated. (pj)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1350 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1345 : Gary Halliday terminated.IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Gary Halliday, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (pj)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1349 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1344 . IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Timothy Lancaster, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Timothy L Lancaster terminated. (pj)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1348 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1343 . IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, William Johnston, is hereby dismissedfrom the above-captioned matter without prejudice, William A Johnston terminated. (pj)
July 2, 2009 Filing 1347 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER REGARDING SELECTION OF REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFFS FOR TRIAL AND MANNER OF CONDUCTING TRIAL IN THE INSTANT CASE (filed 06/10/09) DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S MOTIONS FOR: (1) SEVERANCE OF THE DONNING AND DOFFING CLAIMS PENDING A DECISION BY THE NINTH CIRCUIT; AND (2) PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS' UNREPORTED OVERTIME CLAIMS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DECERTIFY THESE CLAIMS FOR LITIGATION AS A COLLECTIVE ACTION (filed 06/11/09) before Judge George H Wu: Hearing is held. The tentative circulated is hereby adopted as the Court's final ruling (attached). The Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Regarding Selection ofRepresentative Plaintiffs for Trial and Manner of Conducting Trial in the Instant Case and Defendant City of Long Beach's Motions For: (1) Severance of the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit; and (2) Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime Claims, or in the Alternative, to Decertify These Claims for Litigation as a Collective Action, are denied without prejudice.All Pretrial requirements are stayed until July 16,2009. #1293 #1295 Motion to Sever; Motion Hearing held Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
July 2, 2009 Filing 1346 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Jerry M Gibbs filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal of Jerry Gibbs)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 2, 2009 Filing 1345 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Gary Halliday filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 2, 2009 Filing 1344 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Timothy L Lancaster filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal for Timothy Lancaster)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 2, 2009 Filing 1343 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff William A Johnston filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal of William JOhnston)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 29, 2009 Filing 1342 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to SERGEANTS AND LIEUTENANTS - THIS DOCUMENT REPLACES DOC #1329 WHICH INADVERTENTLY HAD THE WRONG ATTACHMENT filed by DEFENDANT City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1340 STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR LIQUIDATED DAMAGES AND "WILLFULNESS" AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #1334 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1339 DECLARATION of ANTHONY BATTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR LIQUIDATED DAMAGES AND "WILLFULNESS" AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #1334 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1338 DECLARATION of DEBRA BONESTEEL-SMITH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR LIQUIDATED DAMAGES AND "WILLFULNESS" AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #1334 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1337 DECLARATION of MICHAEL MANNING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR LIQUIDATED DAMAGES AND "WILLFULNESS" AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #1334 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1336 DECLARATION of SUZANNE MASON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR LIQUIDATED DAMAGES AND "WILLFULNESS" AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #1334 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1335 DECLARATION of SAMANTHA W. ZUTLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR LIQUIDATED DAMAGES AND "WILLFULNESS" AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #1334 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1334 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR LIQUIDATED DAMAGES AND "WILLFULNESS" AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by DEFENDANT City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1333 STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to REGARDING SERGEANTS AND LIEUTENANTS #1329 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1332 DECLARATION of SAMANTHA W. ZUTLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to REGARDING SERGEANTS AND LIEUTENANTS #1329 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1331 DECLARATION of MICHAEL S. MANNING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to REGARDING SERGEANTS AND LIEUTENANTS #1329 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1330 DECLARATION of CHIEF OF POLICE ANTHONY BATTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to REGARDING SERGEANTS AND LIEUTENANTS #1329 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1329 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to REGARDING SERGEANTS AND LIEUTENANTS filed by DEFENDANT City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1328 STATEMENT of OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to REGARDING DONNING AND DOFFING #1325 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1327 DECLARATION of SAMANTHA W. ZUTLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to REGARDING DONNING AND DOFFING #1325 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1326 DECLARATION of CHIEF OF POLICE ANTHONY BATTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to REGARDING DONNING AND DOFFING #1325 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1325 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to REGARDING DONNING AND DOFFING filed by DEFENDANT City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Zutler, Samantha)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1324 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 Claims to Plaintiffs' Genuine Issues of Material Facts in Support of Opposition filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1323 Objection to Plaintiffs' Evidence in Opposition re: MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 Claims filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1322 DECLARATION of Michael S. Manning in support of MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 Claims filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1321 REPLY in support of MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 Claims filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1320 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Summary Adjudication re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication re Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense Mem of P's & A's, #2 Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Untroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication on Defendant's 207k Exemption Defense, #3 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Summary Adjudication re 207k Exemption and Dec of Miguel G. Caballero, #4 Exh 1 Plfs' Appendix of Evidence in Supp of Pltfs' Mtn for Summ Adjudic re 207k Exemption, #5 Exh 2 - 7 to Plfs' Appendix of Evidence in Supp of Pltfs' Mtn for Summ Adjudic re 207k Exemption, #6 Exh 7 - 11 to Plfs' Appendix of Evidence in Supp of Pltfs' Mtn for Summ Adjudic re 207k Exemption, #7 Exh 12 - 13 to Plfs' Appendix of Evidence in Supp of Pltfs' Mtn for Summ Adjudic re 207k Exemption, #8 Exh 14 - 17 to Plfs' Appendix of Evidence in Supp of Pltfs' Mtn for Summ Adjudic re 207k Exemption, #9 Proposed Order re Plfs' Mtn for Summ Adjudic re 207k Exemption)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1319 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Regarding Donning and Doffing filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Motion For Summary Adjudication, re Donning-Doffing; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts & Conclusions of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication, re Donning/Doffing, #3 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing; and Declaration of Kenneth L. Mariboho II, #4 Exh 1-7 to Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing, #5 Exh 8-13 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing, #6 Exh 14-19 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing, #7 Exh 20-27 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing, #8 Exh 28-35 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing, #9 Exh 36-41 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing, #10 Exh 42-50 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing, #11 Exh 51-59 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing, #12 Exh 60- 63 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing, #13 Exh 64-78 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing, #14 Exh 79-82 Plaintiffs' Appendix of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing, #15 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adudication, re Donning/Doffing)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 26, 2009 Filing 1318 Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion Regarding Selecting Representative Plaintiffs for Trial and Conducting The Trial in The Instant Case Opposition re: MOTION for Order for Regarding Selection of Representative Plaintiffs for Trial & Manner of Conducting Trial #1293 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge George H Wu: #1314 proposed order (pj)
June 23, 2009 Filing 1317 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's ex Parte Application to Continue Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative to Stay the Donning and Doffing Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the July 16, 2009 Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the "Donning and Doffing of the Uniform" Claim by Plaintiffs Pending the Ninth Circuit's Review of Bamonte v. City of Mesa; or, in the alternative, #1314 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
June 22, 2009 Filing 1316 DECLARATION of Robert A. Orozco in opposition to MOTION for Order for Regarding Selection of Representative Plaintiffs for Trial & Manner of Conducting Trial #1293 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
June 22, 2009 Filing 1315 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order for Regarding Selection of Representative Plaintiffs for Trial & Manner of Conducting Trial #1293 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
June 22, 2009 Filing 1314 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the July 16, 2009 Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the "Donning and Doffing of the Uniform" Claim by Plaintiffs Pending the Ninth Circuit's Review of Bamonte v. City of Mesa; or, in the alternative, stay the Donning & Doffing Claims filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1313 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1311 ,IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Eric Denmion, is hereby dismissedfrom the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Eric Denmion terminated. (pj)
June 22, 2009 Filing 1312 Opposition to Motion For Severance Partial Summary Judgement and Decertification Opposition re: MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Support of Opposition to Defendants Motion For Partial Summary Judgement, #2 Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Motion For Severance, Partial Summary Judgment and Decertification, and Declaration of Miguel G. Caballero, #3 Exhibit 1 -7 Bate Stamp 000001 - 000091, #4 Exhibit 8 - 14 Bate Stamp 000092 - 000195, #5 Exhibit 20 - 25 Bate Stamp 000286 - 000356, #6 Exhibit 26 - 30 Bate Stamp 000357 - 000434, #7 Exhibit 31 - 36 Bate Stamp 000435 - 000509, #8 Exhibit 15 - 19 Bate Stamp 000194 - 000285, #9 062209 - Exhibit 37 - 41 Bate Stamp 000510 - 000592, #10 Exhibit 42 - 47 Bate Stamp 000593 - 000657, #11 Exhibit 48 - 53 Bate Stamp 000658 - 000716, #12 Exhibit 54 - 59 Bate Stamp 000717 - 000803, #13 Exhibit 60 - 64 Bate Stamp 000804 - 000871, #14 Exhibit 65 - 67 Bate Stamp 000872 000917, #15 Exhibit 68 - 69 Bate Stamp 000918 - 000940, #16 Exhibit 70 - 71 Bate Stamp 000941 - 000983, #17 Exhibit 72 - 75 Bate Stamp 000984 - 001036, #18 Exhibit 76 - 78 Bate Stamp 001037 - 001076, #19 Exhibit 79 Bate Stamp 001077 - 001087, #20 Exhibit 80 - 83 Bate Stamp 001088 - 001123)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 18, 2009 Filing 1311 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Eric Denmion filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal for Eric Denmion)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 18, 2009 Filing 1306 REQUEST FOR PLAINTIFFS TO LODGE ORIGINAL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS RE CITY OF LONG BEACH'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1305 . IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Dennis Robbins, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Dennis Robbins terminated. (pj)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1309 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1303 . IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Christopher J. Costa, is herebydismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Christopher J Costa terminated. (pj)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1304 . IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Theodore Covey, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Theodore A Covey terminated. (pj)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1302 . IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Dana Braak, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Dana L Braak terminated. (pj)
June 16, 2009 Filing 1305 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Dennis Robbins filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Dennis Robbins)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 16, 2009 Filing 1304 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Theodore A Covey filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 16, 2009 Filing 1303 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Christopher J Costa filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Christopher Costa)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 16, 2009 Filing 1302 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Dana L Braak filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Dana Braak)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1301 STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1300 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1299 DECLARATION of Michael S. Manning in support of MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1298 DECLARATION of Art Hartinger in support of MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1297 DECLARATION of Chief of Police Anthony Batts in support of MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Orozco, Robert)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1296 DECLARATION of Robert Orozco in support of MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime #1295 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F-L, #2 Exhibit M-S, #3 Exhibit T-Z)(Orozco, Robert)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1295 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever the Donning and Doffing Claims Pending a Decision by the Ninth Circuit and Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Plaintiffs' Unreported Overtime filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 7/2/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Robert)
June 11, 2009 Filing 1294 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. correcting MOTION for Order for Regarding Selection of Representative Plaintiffs for Trial & Manner of Conducting Trial #1293 Regarding Omission of Pages Three to Five of Exhibit Three (Caballero, Miguel)
June 10, 2009 Filing 1293 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Regarding Selection of Representative Plaintiffs for Trial & Manner of Conducting Trial filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Motion set for hearing on 7/2/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re; Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Regarding Selection of Representative Plaintiffs for Trial and Manner of Conducting Trial in the Instant Case; Declaration of Miguel G. Caballero)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1292 ORDER upon Stipulation #1275 dismisses plaintiff Stephen Dougan without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1291 ORDER upon Stipulation #1276 that plaintiff Bobby J Anguiano is dismissed without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1290 ORDER upon Stipulation #1277 dismisses plaintiff Donald J Goodman without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1289 ORDER upon re Stipulation #1278 dismisses plaintiff Eric Hubbard without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1288 ORDER Regarding Rescheduling of Pre-Trial Conference #1285 by Judge George H Wu. The Pre-Trial Conference currently scheduled for August 13, 2009 will be rescheduled to July 27, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. (Note: Changes Have Been Made to this Document). (sch)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 ORDER upon Stipulation #1279 dismisses plaintiff Gregory L Schirmer witout prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 ORDER upon Stipulation #1280 dismisses plaintiff Mike Solomita without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
June 2, 2009 Filing 1285 STIPULATION to Reschedule Pre-Trial Conference filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Rescheduling of Pre-Trial Conference)(Orozco, Robert)
June 2, 2009 Filing 1284 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment; combined stipulation and order format is not applicable in e-filing. Proposed orders for Judge'sapproval are to be formally and separately prepared and submitted as a separate attachment to main document. RE: Stipulation to Continue #1283 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
June 1, 2009 Filing 1283 STIPULATION to Continue Pre-Trial Conference from August 13, 2009 to July 23, 2009 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach.(Orozco, Robert)
June 1, 2009 Filing 1282 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Stephen NMI Dougan filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Stephen Dougan)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 1, 2009 Filing 1281 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. correcting Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1275 Notice of Errata For Stipulation for Dismissal As to Plaintiff Stephen Dougan (Caballero, Miguel)
June 1, 2009 Filing 1280 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Mike Solomita filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Mike Solomita)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 1, 2009 Filing 1279 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Gregory L Schirmer filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Gregory Schirmer)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 1, 2009 Filing 1278 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Eric Hubbard filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Eric Hubbard)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 29, 2009 Filing 1277 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Donald J Goodman filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Donald Goodman)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 29, 2009 Filing 1276 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Bobby J Anguiano filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Bobby Anguiano)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 29, 2009 Filing 1275 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Stephen Dougan)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR AMY BLACKBURN by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Amy Blackburn, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1269 (Amy Blackburn terminated.) (ake)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1273 ORDERAND DISMISSAL FOR DANIEL HAAS by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Daniel Haas, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1270 (Daniel S Haas terminated.) (ake)
May 20, 2009 Filing 1270 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Daniel S Haas filed by Plaintff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Daniel Haas)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 20, 2009 Filing 1269 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Amy Blackburn filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Amy Blackburn)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1272 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR DAVID HAINLEY by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, David Hainley, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1267 (David Hainley terminated.) (ake)
May 18, 2009 Filing 1271 MINUTES OF POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer. The parties inform the Court that they were not able to settle at mediation. As stated on the record, the Court grants defendants to take additional depositions. The Court continues the motion cut off date to June 26, 2009 and sets the following schedule: Motion for Summary Judgment (Joint): June 26, 2009; Oppositions to Motion for Summary Judgment (Joint): July 10, 2009; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment: July 16, 2009 at 8:30 am. The Pretrial Conference is continued to August 13, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. The Trial will remain as scheduled for August 25, 2009 at 9:00 a.m.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (ake)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1268 ORDER upon Stipulation that plaintiff James Dowdell, is hereby dismissedfrom the above-captioned matter without prejudice by Judge George H Wu #1267 , (lc)
May 15, 2009 Filing 1267 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff David Hainley filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for David Hainley)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 14, 2009 Filing 1261 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Post Mediation Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
May 14, 2009 Filing 1258 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff James L Dodwell filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for James Dowdell)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 14, 2009 Filing 1257 NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 City's Post Mediation Case Management Statement, #2 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Orozco, Robert)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1264 ORDER AND DISMISSAL re Stipulation #1250 by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff Byron Blair, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1263 ORDER AND DISMISSAL re Stipulation #1251 by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff Ronald Burgess, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1262 ORDER AND DISMISSAL re Stipulation #1252 by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff Steven Kroesen, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
May 13, 2009 Filing 1260 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk for Judge George H Wu. The documents are accepted as filed. Further entries will include counsel's name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. Failure to do so, will result in your documents stricken for failure to comply with CM/ECF procedures. RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1252 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1250 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1253 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1251 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1248 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1249 (pj)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1259 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu re: Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1253 . Plaintiff Anthony Lopez is dismissed without prejudice. (rj)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1256 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu re: Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1253 . Anthony Lopez is dismissed from the above-captioned case without prejudice. (rj)
May 13, 2009 Filing 1255 STATEMENT Post Mediation Case Management Statement filed by Defendant City of Long Beach (Orozco, Robert)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1266 ORDER AND DISMISSAL by Judge George H Wu, IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Robert Correia, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1249 (es)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1265 ORDER AND DISMISSAL by Judge George H Wu, IT IS SO ORDERED Plaintiff, Lloyd Cox, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1248 (es)
May 12, 2009 Filing 1254 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: The proposed order is lacking the attorney information. Your PDF attachment is missing the counsel's name, address, telephone number and e-mail address RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1252 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1250 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1253 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1251 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1248 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1249 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (pj)
May 11, 2009 Filing 1253 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Anthony Lopez filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Anthony Lopez)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 11, 2009 Filing 1252 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Steven P Kroesen filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal of Steven Kroesen)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 11, 2009 Filing 1251 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Ronald P Burgess filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal of Ronald Burgess)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 11, 2009 Filing 1250 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Byron D Blair filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Byron Blair)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 8, 2009 Filing 1249 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Robert Correia filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Robert Correia)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 8, 2009 Filing 1248 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Lloyd Cox filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Lloyd Cox)(Caballero, Miguel)
May 8, 2009 Filing 1247 Application for Clarification/Modification of Minute Order Issued March 19, 2009 filed by Defendants City of Long Beach, Doe (Hartinger, Arthur)
May 6, 2009 Filing 1246 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Case called. Parties made their appearances. Settlement Conference held. No settlement was reached. If the parties believe that a further settlement conference would be beneficial at a later date, they should contact the court clerk to schedule such conference.Tape #: CS 5/6/09. (ch) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2009: #1 Minute Order) (ch).
April 30, 2009 Filing 1245 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Bradley R Mathews counsel for Plaintiffs Elizabeth Barba, Bernardo Barajas, Banuelos, Jr, Barber E Barber, Christopher Bates, Randall Beach, Joe Battle, Sr, Cory J Brown, Anthony M Brown, Ronald P Burgess, Bill J Burney, Geoffrey A Berg, Michael T Beckman, Doulglas R Bender, Edward L Bonachea, Ronald A Boandl, Richard Birdsall, Jeffrey Berkenkamp, Satwan D Johnson, William A Johnston, Larry Jones, Ignacio Zavala, Ricardo Zatarain, Dina Zapalski, Douglas Bacon, Felipa A Baccari, Richard Bell, Ronald Bell, Toby Benskin, Kevin Bradburn, Laurie Briney, Marcus R Briones, Brian T Ekern, Derek Ernest, David A Ebell, Danielle Quinones, Ronald D Quarn, Robert Torres, Donald Radcliff, Robert Tamparong, Frank Torres, Ron Trott, Rogelio Q Trias, Norman C Turley, Brian G Tuliau, Kenneth W Turner, Michael J White, David Williams, James A Williams, John W Williams, Alan P Wilson, Ernest G Wolosewicz, Jason T Wood, Donald Wood, Gregory Woodruff, Robert L Woods, Michael Wooldridge, Paul T Wright, Laurence Walker, Jr, Leonard L Washington, Royce Wexler, Michael K Whitcomb, George Sargent, Dominick Scaccia, Jason T Ur, Lorenzo J Uribe, Eduardo E Urquiza, Adrian Tul, Mark W Swanson, Edward Saldana, Alexander Saldana, Eddie H Sanchez, Andre R Sanchez, Paul Sanford, James Stahmann, Bradford Stein, Matthew Solarski, Robert W Schroeder, Kevin Skeen, Aristeo Sandoval, David Okerman, Gregory L Schirmer, Michael L Soldin, Leslie A Soto, Leroy Staes, Wendy K Starbird, Dave Stennick, Parine Soth, Suradech Sriwanthana, Cory Strang, David G Strong, Kenneth Sutton, Mark Mesun, Eli L Moreno, John M Mercado, Jason P Melvin, Michael Erdelji, Jesus Espinoza, Sean Irving, Michael Jackson, John C Jacobs, Jr, Todd Jenkins, Patrick Jennings, Steven Jilek, Fernando Jimenez, Douglas R Johnson, Joel C Johnson, Jr, Bret Milovich, Eric Mifflin, Christopher F Morgan, Luis E Corona, Rubi Castro, James R Clark, Gamaliel Collazo, Daniel Molinar, Jeff Meyer, Luke McGee, David Collazo, Andrew D Vanholt, Sharon Van Duin, Dave Garcia, Jayson Cochran, Rudio O Garcia, Amy Garrett, Jason Garrido, Gabriel Garrido, Armand M Castellanos, Alex C Gassler, Mark A Gell, Rory J Hainley, Monique Hainley-Glover, Leticia Caranza, Harry D Hampton, Douglas S Hara, John Harrigan, Fernando Cook, Thomas H Keleher, Robert Kuroda, Gregory A Krabbe, Robert Davenport, Konkoly, Robert Kennedy, William B Kift, Kevin T King, Jason M Kirk, Norman A Delgado, Robert B Knight, Asif Khan, Jack Dial, Lee D Debrabander, Justin Krueger, Jeffrey V Harris, Nicholas Harris, John F Davies, Timothy P Hart, Russell Lee, Michael W Mazzoni, Christopher E Martinez, Nicholas L De La O, Jeffrey A Meyer, Jason Mifflin, Jack Manu, Rick DeForest, Sean Magee, Aaron C Mascorro, Delmy V Morales, Gerrit Dejohngh, Daniel K Moreno, Travis R Muilenburg, Justin Murr, Joseph L Gludt, Brian Dapello, Kerry M Geisige, Michael E Green, Keith Gregrow, Benjamin De Los Santos, Clinton A Grimes, Robert Guerrero, Hector A Gutierrez, Gabriel Doby, Joe Gutierrez, Luis Galvan, Anthony Garcia, Eric M Golz, Timothy A Downs, Armando Garica, Hector Gomez, Elaine Gomez, Dominguez, Kenneth Gonyea, Fermin Gonzalez, Jose M Gonzalez, Jr, Carlos Del Real, Donald J Goodman, Gary T Gotori, Jorge A Grajeda, Ulises Julio, Brandon N Deis, Bradley Futak, Richard A Farfan, David Faris, Bradley D Dinsdale, Jon A Fenoglio, Eric Fernandez, Americo Fernandez, Derrick M Dinsmore, Adam Ferris, Jose G Flores, Roque O Foster, William D Foster, Johnny Dodson, III, Steven Fox, Jesus Fragoso, Jr, David H Fritz, Karen Dougherty, Eric Fritz, Miguel A Valenzuela, Jennifer Valenzuela, Michael J Dugan, Cesar Velarde, Victor Vidriales, Albert Vargas, Oscar Valenzuela, Jason P Dallas, Timothy L Van Coutren, Steven T Vanden Bosch, Francisco Vasquez, Norman Dumaplin, Reginald Vega, Xavier Veloz, Nelson Villoria, Michael Demarco, Kevin Voorhes, Chris Valdez, Paul Luyben, David Demasi, Gary S DePhillippo, Ernesto Betancourt, Christian f Moody, Tyrone Anderson, Julie Anderson, Kalid Abuhadwan, Charlotte M Alu, Ramon Alcala, Darren Adams, Nikki R Alexander, Peter Anderson, Anthony Anast, Ernest W Armond, Bobby J Anguiano, Guillermo Arias, Jennifer Arzola, Alexander Avila, Eric Alvarez, Forrest R Anderson, Alex Angotti, Philip Candelaria, Gabriel Carillo, Aldo Decarvalho, David Ebell, Joe Gaynor, Randy J Kleber, Richard W Firman, Stephanie N Hall, Cesar Velarde, Ismael Rubio, Thomas G Rodriquez, Herbert C. Smith, David Smart, Mark Sisneros, Kurt D Sine, Christopher Silva, Patricia Whybrew, David Hubbert, Mega Zabel, Jeffrey Shurtleff, Leticia Gamboa, Curtis Shur, Jason Sheffield, Sean E Parilla, Hector L Nieves, Scott D Neal, Carlos Nava, Paul Munson, Donald Mauk, Mark Mattia, Jorge Marquez, Vincenzo G Marchese, Craig Patterson, Melvin D McGuire, Lisa McCourt, Brian J McCormick, Keith R McCart, Margarit McCart, Quincy Miles, Norman Mikkelson, Donald E Messer, Melvin M Megee, Juan J Medina, Joshua Brearley, Craig Miller, Barry Miller, Michelle Miller, Scott J Miller, Carlos Grimaldo, John B Greet, Brian Greene, Arturo Gonzalez, Robert Gonzales, David Hubbert, Dana L Braak, Chris Brammer, Michael D Pennino, Conrad Penn, Shea L Robertson, Gregory A Roberts, Bruce Roberson, Stephan C Ritchie, Adam Rim, Abram R Yap, Robert W Zottneck, John Watkins, Ryan Watson, Curtis Y Yee, Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, Gerardo Prieto, Kenny Quaack, Francisco J Ramirez, Luis E Ramirez, Brent Record, Robert A Lopez, Alberto Leon, Adrian Tol, Gary Tymich, Kevin Delorto, Michael Lord, Gary A Hodgson, Jason Lehman, John Lembi, Adriana Jaurigui, Mark Hansen, Darren T Hall, Samuel McKenzie, Marcus Hodge, Danny Hernandez, Wally Hebeish, Robin Hawkins, Warren Harris, Stephen James, Jeffrey C Jacobs, Sean Hunt, Michael Hubbard, John R Hotchkiss, Louis M Perez, Dennis S Price, Michael T Potter, David Poss, Vincent A Platt, Max Jones, Joseph J Johnson, Todd Johnson, Joe P Pirooz, Randy Petersen, John Magallanes, Patrick J Lyon, Jason Lovo, Jennifer Kearns, Shawn Loughlin, Joseph Klein, Kevin King, Jason Kennedy, Cory Lapworth, Gregory L Manis, Julio E Juarez, Scott Sorenson, Richard Kaiser, Jeffrey Jonkey, David Jones, Salvador Torres, Allan R Legayada, Bruce Lee, Kevin Stinson, James Kroeger, Stephen T Stough, Victor L Thrash, Milton G Thomas, Mario Talavera, Jayson Torres, Richard Weldin, Armondo R Yearwood, Jonathan Steinhauser, William Swaim, David Strohman, Ricardo Solorio, Dana Smith, Ross Smillie, Neil R Vadnais, David M Urbina, Christopher Silva, Kurt D Sine, Dan Visser, David Weise, Salvador Solorzano, Jeannie M Villanueva, Thomas Vriens, Ismael Rubio, Thomas G. Rodriguez, Mark Sisneros, Megan Zabel, Matthew Whybrew, Eduardo D Reyes, Jr, Herbert C. Smith, David Smart, Robert Trout, Arthur Vega, Jose Yarruns, Noe Yanez, Jason K. Wong, Javier Sepulveda, Joseph P Seminara, Brad A Scavone, Voom Sawai, Randy Sany, Ralph Calvete, Jonathan A Calvert, Patrick J Burns, Steven D Buchheim, George T Reno, Efrain Cervantes, Jerry A Carter, Jr, Hector H Cardiel, Sean R Campbell, Dennis A Camaria, Darin Blizzard, Onorio Galvan, David Gage, Rachel Frausto, Johnny Miyasaki, Larry Bautista, Sondra Benskin, Jacqueline Bezart, James J Bisetti, Byron D Blair, Brian Armstrong, Ebrahim Ashabi, Ali Assef, Richard Austin, Jr, Daniel Barkwill, Vicente Aceves, Jeff Alexen, Andrea Allen, Aaron Alu, Paul Arcala, Matthew J Mills, Michael Colbert, Mark S Coble, Maria Clay, Alfredo Chairez, Theodore A Covey, Jeff Conrad, Gordon Collier, Jonathan Cole, Rick Colbert, Eduardo De La Torre, Sean D Deaton, Douglas P Davidson, David R Daniels, James E Craig, Jacob Dillon, James Dickey, Eric Dennison, Jeffrey Demeen, Jessica Delosh, Diego Escutia, Gregory S Eldridge, Binh T Duong, Jr, Matthew Dougherty, Oscar Dominguez, Victor Feria, Nestor Ferguson, Eric Alvarez, Joseph W Ferguson, John B Fagar, Forrest R Andersen, Timothy L Everts, Alex Angotti, Philip Candelaria, Gabriel Carrillo, Joel L Camrin, Fernando Cuevas, Albert Candeo, Lloyd Cox, Ciaran Crawford, Kenny E Cruz, James Mondragon, Andrew M Fox, Marco Cruz, James T Foster, Eugene e Cummings, Jason Foerster, Joshua S Castro, M Wesley Fisher, Paul Gallo, Alfonso Garcia, Thomas Cummings, Keith D Mullally, Edmund Moscoso, Richard R Chavez, Keith Mortensen, Richard Cawley, Oscar Morales, Philip Cloughesy, Ana Maria Gill, Richard Chambers, Jerry M Gibbs, Tristan Corbett, Matthew V George, Michael Gardinier, Troy Matsuura, Sirilo L Garcia, Jesus Macias, Michael P Parcells, Hank Ly, Victor Ortiz, Brandon T Mitchell, Cynthia Orel, Roger D Montell, Elise Nikoletich, Kimberly Maddox, Juan Gomez, Gina McConnon, Fernando Mayen, William K Matsubara, Robert D Mendoza, Michael Masai, Fernando Martinez, Jose M Serenil, Thomas Perez, Kevin D Peterson, Leesa L Mahaffey, Julie D Prior, Mark McGuire, Joseph S Pueliu, Matt S Archer, Joseph Rabe, Richard Armond, Lawrence L Arnwine, Ricardo Ramirez, Corey Austin, Tai D Ro, George D Ayala, Jr, Thomas G. Rodriguez, Raymond F Panek, Bo Pak, Rudy Romero, Christopher D Roth, Alfonso Navarro, Robert R Ryan, III, Tomb T Neal, Jose M Serenil, Mark L Nguyen, Adam Sturgeon, Vuong Nguyen, George Nogueira, John D Bruce, Nystedt, Christopher J Costa, Tim Olson, Daniel Steven Covarubias, Jonathan Y Poon, Steven Richard Donahue, Jerry B Poole, Jr, Daniel Steven covarubias, Shannon M Phillips, Rodney D Donahue, Russell Peterson, Brian T Ekrem, Steven Petersen, Michael Hynes, Ernesto Perez, Jacqueline Parkhill, Peter Lackovic, Kerry R Parker, Juan Carlos Reyes, Mark Vinci, Christopher Thue, Francisco Pena, Blayne K Tom, Andrew Pringle, Tina Louise Icorn, Songcheak Ier, Steven J Prell, Brandon T Preciado, Dan Pratt, Christopher G Ignacio, John A Pope, Brent T Ikari, Ben Vargas, Jr, Scott W Jenson, Lowe, Delon Johns, Leonard Junyong Kim, Janathan Lucero, James H Kloss, Douglas Luther, David Kofoed, Fernando E Longcob, Mark Kosoy, Manuel Q Lopez, Anthony Lopez, Deborah M Clark, Steven P Kroesen, Jarrod M Lewis, Shanda Kunkle, Dylan Lobascio, Ryan B Lebaron, Yul B Long, Thomas Erdelji, Harry Erickson, Sovanna Ly, Duane Evans, Jason Lacey, James Earl Fellows, Randy Lacsina, Americo Fernandez, Timothy L Lancaster, Timothy M Ferrill, Michael Anthony Dapel
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 ORDER AND DISMISSAL by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff Gabriel Carrillo is dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1233 . (jp)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1243 ORDER AND DISMISSAL by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff Wayne Collins is dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1234 . (jp)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1242 ORDER AND DISMISSAL by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff, Marco Cruz is dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1235 . (jp)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1241 ORDER AND DISMISSAL by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff Ron Trott is dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1236 . (jp)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1240 ORDER AND DISMISSAL by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff Jesse Valadez, is dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1237 . (jp)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1239 ORDER AND DISMISSAL by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff, William Arthur, is dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1225 . (jp)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1238 ORDER AND DISMISSAL by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff Ronald Boandl, is dismissedfrom the above-captioned matter without prejudice, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1232 . (jp)
April 23, 2009 Filing 1237 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Jesse Valadez filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Jesse Valadez)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 23, 2009 Filing 1236 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Ron Trott filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Ron Trott)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 23, 2009 Filing 1235 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Marco Cruz filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Marco Cruz)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 23, 2009 Filing 1234 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Wayne Collins filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Wayne Collins)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 23, 2009 Filing 1233 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Gabriel Carillo filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Gabriel Carrillo)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 22, 2009 Filing 1232 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Ronald A Boandl filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Ronald Boandl)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1231 ORDER upon Stipulation #1219 dismissing plaintiff Matthew Kennison with prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1227 ORDER upon Stipulation #1223 dismisses plaintiff Darlene Wigmore without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
April 22, 2009 Filing 1225 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff William Arthur filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Willaim Arthur)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1230 ORDER upon Stipulation #1220 dismissing plaintiff Michael D Pennino with prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1229 ORDER upon Stipulation #1221 dismissing plaintiff Brad A Scavone with prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1228 ORDER upon Stipulation #1222 dismissing plaintiff Jennifer Valenzuela without prejudice by Judge George H Wu (lc)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1226 ORDER re Stipulation #1224 dismissing plaintiff Robert W Zottneck without prejudioe by Judge George H Wu. (lc)
April 18, 2009 Filing 1224 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Robert W Zottneck filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Roger Zottneck)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 18, 2009 Filing 1223 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Darlene Wigmore filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Darlene Wigmore)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 18, 2009 Filing 1222 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Jennifer Valenzuela filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Jennifer Valenzuela)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 18, 2009 Filing 1221 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Brad A Scavone filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Brad Scavone)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 18, 2009 Filing 1220 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael D Pennino filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Michael Pennino)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 18, 2009 Filing 1219 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Matthew Kennison filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Matthew Kennison)(Caballero, Miguel)
April 17, 2009 Filing 1217 REPLY filed by Defendant City of Long Beach TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO DEPOSITION NOTICES AND REQUEST FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Hartinger, Arthur)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1218 AMENDED ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for settlement proceedings. A Settlement Conference will be held on MAY 6, 2009, at 9:30 a.m. NO LATER THAN APRIL 29, 2009, EACH PARTY SHALL SUBMIT A CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT DIRECTLY TO THE CHAMBERS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ABRAMS. [See Order for details.] (ch)
April 15, 2009 Filing 1216 NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO DEPOSITION NOTICES AND REQUEST FOR HEARING AND/OR ORDER filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Mariboho, Kenneth)
April 1, 2009 Filing 1215 AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS filed by DEFENDANT City of Long Beach. (Hartinger, Arthur)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1214 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for settlement proceedings. A Settlement Conference will be held on 5/6/09, at 9:30 a.m. NO LATER THAN 4/29/09, EACH PARTY SHALL SUBMIT A CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT DIRECTLY TO THE CHAMBERS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ABRAMS. [See Order for details.] (ch)
March 30, 2009 Filing 1213 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMENDANSWER AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer. For reasons stated on the Defendants City of Long Beachs Motion for Leave to Amend Answer is granted. Defendants will file the amended answer on or before April 1, 2009. The Court sets the following dates:Pretrial Conference July 23, 2009 at 8:30 a.m.; Jury Trial (est. two weeks) August 25, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. Furthermore, the Court refers the parties to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for mediation, and sets a Post-Mediation Status Conference for May 18, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may mediate up to andincluding May 15, 2009. #1190 Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (ake, )
March 27, 2009 Filing 1212 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2009 at 11:00 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Hartinger, Arthur)
March 26, 2009 Filing 1211 STATUS REPORT ABBREVIATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ON TRIAL SETTING, BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON SELECTION OF REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFFS AND OTHER ISSUES filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu re: Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1204 . Plaintiff John F. Davies is dismissed without prejudice and terminated from this case. (rj)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1209 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu re: Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1205 . Plaintiff James T. Foster is dismissed without prejudice and terminated from this case. (rj)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1208 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu re: Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #1206 . Plaintiff Herbert C. Smith is dismissed without prejudice and terminated. (rj)
March 19, 2009 Filing 1207 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER;DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; andSCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer.For reasons stated on the Defendants City of Long Beachs Motion for Leave to Amend Answer is continued to March 30, 2009 at 11:00 a.m. Defendant City of Long Beachs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted as to claims two,three and four. Plaintiffs counsel accepts ruling without further argument and/or discussion. The Scheduling Conference is continued to March 30, 2009 at 11:00 a.m. A joint one-page report re areas still in dispute will be filed by March 27, 2009. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (ake)
March 19, 2009 Filing 1206 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Herbert C. Smith filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Herbert Smith)(Caballero, Miguel)
March 19, 2009 Filing 1205 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff James T Foster filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for James Foster)(Caballero, Miguel)
March 19, 2009 Filing 1204 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff John F Davies filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for John Davies)(Caballero, Miguel)
March 16, 2009 Filing 1203 Joint Case Management Statement on Trial Setting, Briefing Schedule on Selection of Representative Plaintiffs and Other Issues filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
March 16, 2009 Filing 1202 DECLARATION of ROBERT A. OROZCO IN SUPPORT OF REPLY MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer #1190 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
March 16, 2009 Filing 1201 DECLARATION of SAMANTHA W. ZUTLER IN SUPPORT OF REPLY MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer #1190 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
March 16, 2009 Filing 1200 REPLY in support of DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1199 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR PHIL CLOUGHESY by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Phil Cloughesy, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1194 (Philip Cloughesy terminated.) (ake)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1198 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR JOSEPH BAHASH by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Joseph Bahash, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (Joseph V Bahash terminated.) (ake)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR LEESA MAHAFFEY by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Leesa Mahaffey, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1196 Leesa L Mahaffey terminated. (ake)
March 11, 2009 Filing 1196 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Leesa L Mahaffey filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Leesa Mahaffey)(Caballero, Miguel)
March 11, 2009 Filing 1195 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Joseph V Bahash filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Joseph Bahash)(Caballero, Miguel)
March 11, 2009 Filing 1194 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Philip Cloughesy filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Phil Cloughesy)(Caballero, Miguel)
March 11, 2009 Filing 1193 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Amend Answer Opposition re: MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer #1190 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
March 4, 2009 Filing 1192 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER re MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer #1190 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
March 4, 2009 Filing 1191 DECLARATION of Samantha W. Zutler in support of MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer #1190 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Zutler, Samantha)
March 4, 2009 Filing 1190 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. Motion set for hearing on 3/19/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Zutler, Samantha)
February 23, 2009 Filing 1189 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu. Court and counsel confer re discovery. The Court orders the phase one discovery depositions to be completed by March 16, 2009. Parties will meet and confer to discuss the selection of representative plaintiff and proposed trial dates. A reply brief will be due by no later than 12:00 p.m. on March 16, 2009. The Scheduling Conference is continued to March 19, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (lom)
February 20, 2009 Filing 1188 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Defendant City of Long Beach (Hartinger, Arthur)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR WILLIAM SWAIM re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1166 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, William Swaim, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR DINA ZAPALSKI re Stipulation to Dismiss #1167 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Dina Zapalski, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR DARREN DAVENPORT re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1168 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Darren Davenport, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR WILLIAM PAUL LEBARON re Stipulation to Dismiss #1159 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, William Paul LeBaron, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR CHRISTOPHER MORGAN re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1160 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Christopher Morgan, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR DAISY ORTIZ re Stipulation to Dismiss #1161 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Daisy Ortiz, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR VINCENT PLATT re Stipulation to Dismiss #1162 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Vincent Platt, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR JOSEPH RABE re Stipulation to Dismiss #1163 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Joseph Rabe, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR DOUGLAS BENDER re Stipulation to Dismiss #1155 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Douglas Bender, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR STEPHEN JAMES re Stipulation #1156 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Stephen James, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR BRADLEY JOHNSON re Stipulation #1157 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Bradley Johnson, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR CRAIG REMINE by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Craig Remine, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1164 (Craig Remine terminated.) (ake)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR DON REYNOLDS by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Don Reynolds, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1165 (Don P Reynolds terminated.) (ake)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1174 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR SEAN MAGEE by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Sean Magee, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1154 Sean Magee terminated. (ake)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR AARON MASCORRO re Stipulation #1158 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Aaron Mascorro, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR JOSE OROZCO re Stipulation #1152 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Jose Orozco, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR ERIC LEDESMA re Stipulation #1153 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Eric Ledesma, is hereby dismissedfrom the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR TAMMI STILINOVICH re Stipulation #1151 by Judge George H Wu : IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Tammi Stilinovich, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR DANIEL BARKWILL re Stipulation #1150 by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Daniel Barkwill, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1168 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Darren Davenport filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Darren Davenport)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1167 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Dina Zapalski filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Dina Zapalski)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1166 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff William Swaim filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Wiliam Swaim)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1165 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Don P Reynolds filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Don Reynolds)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1164 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Craig Remine filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Craig Remine)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1163 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Joseph Rabe filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Jospeh Rabe)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1162 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Vincent A Platt filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Vincent Platt)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1161 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Daisy Ortiz filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal of Daisy Ortiz)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1160 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Christopher F Morgan filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Christopher Morgan)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1159 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff William P Lebaron filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for William Paul Lebaron)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1158 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Aaron C Mascorro filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Aaron Mascorro)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1157 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Bradley Johnson filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Bradley Johnson)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1156 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Stephen James filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Stephen James)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1155 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Doulglas R Bender filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Douglas Bender)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 11, 2009 Filing 1154 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Sean Magee filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Dismiss Sean Magee)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 10, 2009 Filing 1153 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Eric M Ledesma filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Eric Ledesma)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 10, 2009 Filing 1152 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Jose R Orozco filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Jose Orozco)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 10, 2009 Filing 1151 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Tammie J Stilinovich filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Tammie Stilinovich)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 10, 2009 Filing 1150 STIPULATION to Dismiss plaintiff Daniel Barkwill filed by plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Dismissal for Daniel Barkwill)(Caballero, Miguel)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR JULIE PRIOR by Judge George H Wu, GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1146 , Julie D Prior terminated. (ca)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, GRANTING Stipulation for Discovery #1147 . The Court hereby adopts the Stipulation re Extension of Discovery Phase entered into between the parties on February 2, 2009. The parties will appear before the Court on February 23, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. for a further Case Management Conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (ca)
February 2, 2009 Filing 1147 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Extension of Discovery Phase filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartinger, Arthur)
January 30, 2009 Filing 1146 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Julie D Prior filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal For Julie Prior)(Caballero, Miguel)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams RE: PARTIES' PROPOSED STIPULATION RE CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL #1143 #1144 . The Court has received and considered the parties' proposed Stipulation re Confidential Material ("Proposed Order"). The Court is unable to adopt the Protective Order as stipulated to by the parties for the following reasons: [See Order for details.] (ch)
January 16, 2009 Filing 1144 STIPULATION for Order Proposed Order for Protective Order re Confidential Material filed by Defendant City of Long Beach.(Hartinger, Arthur)
January 16, 2009 Filing 1143 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant City of Long Beach.(Hartinger, Arthur)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 ORDER and Dismissal for Wally Hebeish re Stipulation #1127 by Judge George H Wu. Plaintiff Wally Hebeish, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (lom)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 AMENDED ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR FERMIN GONZALEZ by Judge George H. Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Fermin Gonzalez, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. [Note correct spelling of plaintiff's name.] (ake) Modified on 1/6/2009 (ake).
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR FERMAN GONZALEZ by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Ferman Gonzalez, is hereby dismissedfrom the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1128 (Fermin Gonzalez terminated.) (ake)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR RICHARD FARFAN by Judge George H Wuz: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Richard Farfan, is hereby dismissedfrom the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1126 Richard A Farfan terminated. (ake)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR ALFONSO GARCIA re Stipulation #1123 by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff Alfonso Garcia is dismissed without prejudice. (lom)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR DANA SMITH re Stipulation #1129 by Judge George H Wu: Plaintiff Dana Smith is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Dana Smith terminated. (lom)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 ORDER re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1125 by Judge George H Wu that Plaintiff, Michael Beckman, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Michael T Beckman terminated. (lom)
December 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR LEONARD GAETA by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Leonard Gaeta, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1122 (Leonard Gaeta terminated.) (ake)
December 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR KEITH FINCH by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Keith Finch, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1121 (Keith A Finch terminated.) (ake)
December 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR DONALD FIELD by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Donald Field, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1120 (Donald R Field terminated.) (ake)
December 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR KAREN DOUGHERTY by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Karen Dougherty, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1118 (Karen Dougherty terminated.) (ake)
December 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR BRADLEY EGGUM by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Bradley Eggum, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1119 (Bradley J Eggum terminated.) (ake)
December 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 ORDER AND DISMISSAL FOR ROBIN HAWKINS by Judge George H Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Robin Hawkins, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. #1124 (Robin Hawkins terminated.) (ake)
December 23, 2008 Filing 1129 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Dana Smith filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal of Dana Smith)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 23, 2008 Filing 1128 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Fermin Gonzalez filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Fermin Gonzalez)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 23, 2008 Filing 1127 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Wally Hebeish filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Wally Hebeish)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 22, 2008 Filing 1126 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Richard A Farfan filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Richard Farfan)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 22, 2008 Filing 1125 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael T Beckman filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Michael Beckman)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 19, 2008 Filing 1124 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Robin Hawkins filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Robin Hawkins)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 19, 2008 Filing 1123 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Alfonso Garcia filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Alfonso Garcia)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 19, 2008 Filing 1122 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Leonard Gaeta filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Leonard Gaeta)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 18, 2008 Filing 1121 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keith A Finch filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order & Dismissal for Keith Finch)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 18, 2008 Filing 1120 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Donald R Field filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Donald Field)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 18, 2008 Filing 1119 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Bradley J Eggum filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Bradley Eggum)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 18, 2008 Filing 1118 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Karen Dougherty filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Karen Dougherty)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 12, 2008 Filing 1117 Proposed Order re Partial MSJ filed by Defendant City of Long Beach re: Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) #943 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to As to State Law Claims ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #921 (Hartinger, Arthur)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1107 IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Dennis Camaria, is hereby dismissedfrom the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Dennis A Camaria terminated. (pj)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1108 IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Jeff Cooper, is hereby dismissed fromthe above-captioned matter without prejudice., Jeffrey L Cooper terminated. (pj)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1109 , IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Lee Debrabander, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Lee D Debrabander terminated. (pj)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1104 , IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Mario Aiello, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Mario Aiello terminated. (pj)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1105 IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Dianna Anderson, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudic, Dianna L Anderson terminated. (pj)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1106 IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, Gina Bowen-Gilbert, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. Gina M Bowen-Gilbert terminated. (pj)
December 9, 2008 Filing 1109 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Lee D Debrabander filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Lee Debrabander)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 9, 2008 Filing 1108 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Jeffrey L Cooper filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Jeff Cooper)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 9, 2008 Filing 1107 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Dennis A Camaria filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Dennis Camaria)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re On August 11, 2008, the United States District Court for the CentralDistrict of California confirmed as class counsel, Gregory G. Petersen and FenjaKlaus of The Petersen Law Firm, and Greg Hafif and Miguel G. Caballero of the LawOffices of Herbert Hafif, APC (Class Counsel), to represent you and all of theplaintiffs in this action. These lawyers have represented your interests in this case as class counsel since the action was certified as a collective action. The Court, upon motion, has relieved the law firm, Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh (formerly Jackson DeMarco Tidus Petersen & Peckenpaugh) as your counsel of record.Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh will no longer represent your interests inthis case. In the event that there is a settlement or there is a judgment in favor of thePlaintiffs in this case, the Court will evaluate and determine the reasonable amount of attorneys fees and costs for serves provided for the benefit of the Plaintiffs. you wish to obtain more information about this notice, please contactClass Counsel:Gregory G. Petersen or Fenja KlausPetersen Law Firm, A Law Corporation, Miguel G. Caballero, Kenneth Mariboho or Eugene Senf re REQUEST for Consideration of Request for Approval of Amended [Proposed] Notice Re Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Motion to Be Relieved As Counsel #1102 , Attorney M Alim Malik terminated. (pj)
December 5, 2008 Filing 1106 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Gina M Bowen-Gilbert filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Gina Bowen-Gilbert)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 5, 2008 Filing 1105 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Dianna L Anderson filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Dianna Anderson)(Caballero, Miguel)
December 5, 2008 Filing 1104 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Mario Aiello filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Order and Dismissal for Mario Aiello)(Caballero, Miguel)
November 25, 2008 Filing 1103 NOTICE Objection to Request For Approval of Amended [Proposed] Notice Re Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel filed by Objecting Party Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Malik, M)
November 25, 2008 Filing 1102 REQUEST for Consideration of Request for Approval of Amended [Proposed] Notice Re Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Motion to Be Relieved As Counsel filed by Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Klaus, Fenja)
November 14, 2008 Filing 1101 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Javier Gonzalez, Deputy Clerk: The document is accepted as filed. Further errors will result in your documents being stricken for failure to follow CM/ECF procedures. #1098 (ake)
November 12, 2008 Filing 1100 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. The following error was found with document no. 1098: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is - Motions and then select Request. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. #1098 (ake)
November 12, 2008 Filing 1099 NOTICE Objection to Request For Approval of Amended [Proposed] Notice Re Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel filed by Attorneys for Objecting Party Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Malik, M)
November 10, 2008 Filing 1098 Request for Approval of Amended [Proposed] Notice Re Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Klaus, Fenja)
October 20, 2008 Filing 1097 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS: by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk for Judge George H Wu. Counsel shall update account information within 24 hours of receipt of this response. RE: Notice of Change of Address, #1094 (pj)
October 17, 2008 Filing 1096 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Account information was not updated in the ECF system. Your account information must be updated immediately by going to Utilities - Maintain Your Address/Maintain Your E-mail Address RE: Notice of Change of Address, #1094 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh)
October 17, 2008 Filing 1095 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregory G Petersen attorney for Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, changing address to Petersen Law Firm, Attorneys at Law, 3100 Airway Avenue, Suite 109, Costa Mesa, CA 92626, Tel. (949) 335-1300, Fax (714) 850-0274. Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Petersen, Gregory)
October 16, 2008 Filing 1094 NOTICE of Change of Address by Fenja Klaus attorney for Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, changing address to Petersen Law Firm, Attorneys at Law, 3100 Airway Avenue, Suite 109, Costa Mesa, CA 92626, Tel. (714) 814-7256, Fax (714) 369-2975, fklaus@petersenlawfirm.com. Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Klaus, Fenja)
October 6, 2008 Filing 1093 MINUTES OF HEARING RE SELECTION OF REPRESENTATIVE held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer. Parties inform the Court that a stipulation on the briefing schedule re selection of representative will be submitted with dates for January 2009. Plaintiffs will submit an amended proposed notice regarding Jackson Demarco Tidus and Peckenpaughs Motion to be Relieved as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (ake)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY ISSUES by Judge George H Wu, (pj)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY ISSUES by Judge George H Wu: (pj)
September 15, 2008 Filing 1090 STIPULATION filed by Defendant City of Long Beach AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY ISSUES (Hartinger, Arthur)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER #1087 by Judge George H Wu: this Court hereby orders 1. The due date for the above listed Stipulation and Opening Brief be continued from Monday, August 18, 2008 to Monday, September 15, 2008; 2. The due date for the Reply Briefs will be continued from August 22, 2008 to Friday, September 26, 2008; and 3. The Hearing date will be continued from Thursday August 28, 2008 to Monday, October 6, 2008 at 8:30 a.m. (ake)
August 15, 2008 Filing 1088 Joint REPORT of of Counsel Regarding JDTP's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs David Faris, Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JDTP's Proposed Notice to Class, #2 Exhibit 2 - Class Counsel's Proposed Notice to Class)(Malik, M)
August 15, 2008 Filing 1087 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Second Stipulation & Order to Continue Dates to File Stipulation Regarding Disvovery & Other PreTrial Issues & Opening Brief Regarding Selection of Representative Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re to Continue Dates)(Caballero, Miguel)
August 11, 2008 Filing 1085 MINUTES OF JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS AND PECKENPAUGHS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS #1046 Hearing held before Judge George H Wu: For the reasons stated on the record, Jackson Demarco Tidus and Peckenpaughs Motion to be Relieved as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs is granted. The parties are to submit a joint notice regarding Jackson Demarco Tidus and Peckenpaughs Motion to be Relieved as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs by August 15, 2008.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (ake)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge George H Wu: Due date for listed Opening brief will be continued to 8/18/2008; Reply briefs 8/22/2008 (pj)
August 7, 2008 Filing 1084 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Stipulation and Order to Continue Dates to File Stipulation Regarding Discovery and Other Pretrial Issues and Opening Brief Regarding Selection or Representative Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards.(Caballero, Miguel)
July 31, 2008 Filing 1083 REPLY reply to non-opposition MOTION of JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS & PECKENPAUGH to Withdraw as Attorney JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS & PECKENPAUGH'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM #1046 Jackson DeMarco Tidus & Peckenpaugh's Reply to Non-Opposition to Motion to Be Relieved As Counsel Of Record for Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs Douglas Bacon, Douglas R Johnson, David Faris, Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. (Malik, M)
July 28, 2008 Filing 1082 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H WuScheduling Conference is held. Court and counsel confer. The Court orders both sides to file simultaneous briefs on how the representative should be selected. The brief shall be filed by no later than August 11, 2008. A reply shall be due by no later than August 21, 2008 with the hearing set for August 28, 2008 at 8:30 a.m. In addition, a stipulation as to remaining issues that the parties either agree or disagree shall be due by no later than August 11, 2008. The Court will make a ruling following the submission of the stipulation.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
July 28, 2008 Filing 1081 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION of JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS & PECKENPAUGH to Withdraw as Attorney JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS & PECKENPAUGH'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM #1046 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Hartinger, Arthur)
July 25, 2008 Filing 1080 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION To Motion To Be Relieved as Counsel and Objection to Proposed Notice to Collective Class Members filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Miguel G. Caballero in Support of Objection to Proposed Notice to Collective Class Members)(Caballero, Miguel)
July 25, 2008 Filing 1079 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Kenneth Jackson in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 25, 2008 Filing 1078 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Brian D. Buchanan in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 21, 2008 Filing 1077 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Gabriel Ruiz in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 18, 2008 Filing 1076 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Rocio Gonzalez in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 17, 2008 Filing 1075 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Jason Evans in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 17, 2008 Filing 1074 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Stephen Dougan in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 16, 2008 Filing 1073 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Robert Curran in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 16, 2008 Filing 1072 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Alejandro Soriano in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 16, 2008 Filing 1071 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Jose Gonzalez in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 16, 2008 Filing 1070 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Jeffrey Garcia in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1069 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Lawrence F. Mulock, Jr. in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1068 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Omar Martinez in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1067 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Santos Perez in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1066 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Richard Ramos in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1065 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Mark Steenhausen in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1064 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, David Ternullo in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1063 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Christopher Zamora in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1062 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Adrian Hunt in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1061 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Paul Esko in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 15, 2008 Filing 1060 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Sandy Allen in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1059 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Amy Blackburn in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1058 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Donald Campbell in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1057 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Gabriel Betanzos in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1056 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, David Schillig in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1055 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Jose Orantes in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1054 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Travon Gosey in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1053 JOINDER Consent to Join Action, Marvin Scott in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1052 Consent to Join Action, James Smigla filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1051 Consent to Join Action, Kimberly Pernell filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1050 Consent to Join Action, Teryl Hubert filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1049 Consent to Join Action, Demetrio Alonzo filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 14, 2008 Filing 1048 Consent to Join Action, David Hainley filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 11, 2008 Filing 1047 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Hartinger, Arthur)
July 10, 2008 Filing 1046 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS & PECKENPAUGH to Withdraw as Attorney JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS & PECKENPAUGH'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs Douglas Bacon, Douglas R Johnson, David Faris, Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. Motion set for hearing on 8/11/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF M. ALIM MALIK IN SUPPORT OF JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS & PECKENPAUGH'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS (WITH EXHIBITS), #2 Exhibit REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS & PECKENPAUGH'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS (WITH EXHIBITS), #3 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS & PECKENPAUGH'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS)(Malik, M)
July 10, 2008 Filing 1045 Consent to Join Action, Juan Avila filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 10, 2008 Filing 1044 Consent to Join Action, Diana Hohman filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 10, 2008 Filing 1043 Consent to Join Action, Maria Lopez filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 10, 2008 Filing 1042 Consent to Join Action, Richard Miller, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 10, 2008 Filing 1041 Consent to Join Action, Dean Pimentel filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 10, 2008 Filing 1040 Consent to Join Action, Luis Ramirez filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 10, 2008 Filing 1039 Consent to Join Action, Luis Rodriguez filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 10, 2008 Filing 1038 Consent to Join Action, Lawrence Walker filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 10, 2008 Filing 1037 Consent to Join Action, William Wendt filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 2, 2008 Filing 1036 Consent to Join Action, Wendy First filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 2, 2008 Filing 1035 Consent to Join Action, James Schlobonm filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 2, 2008 Filing 1034 Consent to Join Action, Heather Rebbeck filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
July 2, 2008 Filing 1033 Consent to Join Action, Mark Brunson filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 STIPULATION AND ORDER The CMC previously set for July 21 shall be continued to July 28, at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiffs may have until July 18 to serve the additional information identifying their claims. 3. The parties will meet and confer on resolution of the claims no later than July 24, 2008, to be fully prepared to address the scheduling issues in Court on July 28. by Judge George H Wu:, Set (pj)
June 27, 2008 Filing 1031 Consent to Join Action, Ted W. Pappas filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 25, 2008 Filing 1027 Consent to Join Action, Kenny Villegas filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 25, 2008 Filing 1026 Consent to Join Action, Nancy Mora filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 25, 2008 Filing 1025 Consent to Join Action, Timothy King filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 25, 2008 Filing 1024 Consent to Join Action, Shaleana R. Benson filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 25, 2008 Filing 1023 Consent to Join Action, Addiel E. Julian filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 25, 2008 Filing 1022 Consent to Join Action, Kevin Davis filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1015 : IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, MICHAEL WHITE, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bm)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1014 : IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, DAVID POSS, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bm)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #1013 : IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff, DARREN T. HALL, is hereby dismissed from the above-captioned matter without prejudice. (bm)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING DATE FOR CMC AND RELATED DEADLINE (WRONG VERSION FILED EARLIER TODAY) filed by Defendant City of Long Beach (Hartinger, Arthur)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING DATE FOR CMC AND RELATED DEADLINE filed by Defendant City of Long Beach (Hartinger, Arthur)
June 19, 2008 Filing 1019 Consent to Join Action, Jesus Alcala filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 19, 2008 Filing 1018 Consent to Join Action, Thomas Cochran filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 19, 2008 Filing 1017 Consent to Joinn Action, Javier Valencia filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 19, 2008 Filing 1016 Consent to Join Action, Alejandro Vergara filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 19, 2008 Filing 1015 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael J White filed by Plaintiff Michael J White. (Attachments: #1 Order re Stipulation of Dismissal for Michael White)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 19, 2008 Filing 1014 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff David Poss filed by Pliantiff David Poss. (Attachments: #1 Order re Stipulation of Dismissal for David Poss)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 19, 2008 Filing 1013 STIPULATION to Dismiss Plaintiff Darren T Hall filed by Plaintiff Darren T Hall. (Attachments: #1 Order re Stipulation of Dismissal for Darren T. Hall)(Caballero, Miguel)
June 18, 2008 Filing 1011 Consent to Join Action, Eric Fenner filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 18, 2008 Filing 1010 Consent to Join Action, Fritz, Brian filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 18, 2008 Filing 1009 Consent to Join Action, Eric Hooker filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 18, 2008 Filing 1008 Consent to Join Action, Gregory Jensen filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 18, 2008 Filing 1007 Consent to Join Action, Poe Siavi'i filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Caballero, Miguel)
June 16, 2008 Filing 1012 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H Wu: Plaintiff is to submit materials, as stated on the record, to defendant by June 27, 2008.The parties are not to proceed with depositions until further order from the Court. However, the parties are instructed to confer regarding discovery issues by July 11, 2008. The Scheduling Conference is continued to July 21, 2008 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are required to appear in person. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (ake)
June 13, 2008 Filing 1006 STATEMENT Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant City of Long Beach DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT (Hartinger, Arthur)
June 13, 2008 Filing 1005 SCHEDULING REPORT of Plaintiffs' Scheduling Conference Report filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
June 5, 2008 Filing 1004 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Conference is held. Court and counsel confer. The parties are to confer and submit a stipulation and proposed hearing schedule. If the parties are not able to agree on a schedule, they are to file individual schedules. The Scheduling Conference is continued to June 16, 2008 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel may appeartelephonically, if notice is given to the clerk within two business days of the hearing. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (bm)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING CONSOLIDATION, SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE PROCEDURE, AND OPT IN DEADLINE by Judge George H Wu, re Stipulation for Order #1002 : Good cause appearing, the Court hereby adopts the Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation, Supplemental Notice Procedure, and Opt in Deadline filed by the parties with this Court on June 3, 2008, as an Order of the Court. (bm)
June 3, 2008 Filing 1002 STIPULATION for Order filed by Defendant City of Long Beach City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hartinger, Arthur)
May 20, 2008 Filing 1001 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Suzanne Mason re Reply (non-motion) #1000 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach (Hartinger, Arthur)
May 20, 2008 Filing 1000 REPLY filed by Defendant City of Long Beach to Plaintiffs' Response to K-9 Evidence Presented by the City of Long Beach Regarding Minimum Wage Adjustment (Hartinger, Arthur)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 999 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER ORDER by Judge George H Wu: Counsel are hereby notified that the Scheduling Conference is reset for 6/5/2008 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
May 14, 2008 Filing 998 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Supplemental Scheduling Conference Brief Regarding The Nature of Claims as to SACV07-954-GW (PLAx) Pursuant to The Court's April 14, 2008 Scheduling Conference Order filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Caballero, Miguel)
May 12, 2008 Filing 994 REPLY filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards Response to K-9 Evidence Presented by The City of Long Beach Regarding Minimum Wage Adjustment and Declaration of Miguel Caballero (Caballero, Miguel)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 997 ORDER by Judge George H Wu Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Gregory Petersen, of the Petersen Law Firm for Plaintiff A. G. Megas in place of attorney Jackson DeMarco Tidus Petersen & Peckenpaugh #988 . (jp)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 996 ORDER by Judge George H Wu Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Gregory Petersen, The Petersen Law Firm for Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards in place of attorney Jackson, DeMarco, Tidus, Petersen & Peckenpaugh #989 . (jp)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 995 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Fenja Klaus, Law Offices of Fenja Klaus in place of attorney Jackson, DeMarco, Tidus, Peterson & Peckenpaugh #986 . (ps)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 993 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Fenja Klaus, Law Offices of Fenja Klaus in place of attorney Jackson, DeMarco, Tidus, Peterson & Peckenpaugh #986 (es)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 992 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Gregory Petersen, of the Petersen Law Firm in place of attorney Jackson DeMarco Tidus Petersen & Peckenpaugh #988 #(es)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 991 ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Fenja Klaus, Law Offices of Fenja Klaus in place of Miguel G Caballero Attorney Jackson, DeMarco, Tidus, Peterson & Peckenpaugh #986 (es)
May 6, 2008 Filing 990 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Gregory Petersen, of the Petersen Law Firm in place of attorney Jackson, DeMarco, Tidus, Peterson & Peckenpaugh filed by Plaintiff A G Megas. (Petersen, Gregory)
May 6, 2008 Filing 989 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Gregory Petersen, The Petersen Law Firm in place of attorney Jackson, DeMarco, Tidus, Petersen & Peckenpaugh filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Petersen, Gregory)
May 6, 2008 Filing 988 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Gregory Petersen, of the Petersen Law Firm in place of attorney Jackson DeMarco Tidus Petersen & Peckenpaugh filed by Plaintiff A G Megas. (Klaus, Fenja)
May 6, 2008 Filing 987 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Gregory Petersen, Law Petersen Law Firm in place of attorney Jackson DeMarco Tidus Petersen & Peckenpaugh filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Klaus, Fenja)
May 6, 2008 Filing 986 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Fenja Klaus, Law Offices of Fenja Klaus in place of attorney Jackson, DeMarco, Tidus, Peterson & Peckenpaugh filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Klaus, Fenja)
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 985 ORDER by the Courtroom Deputy Clerk: The document is accepted as filed. Please take note of the deficiency. Further errors will result in the document being stricken. RE: Notice (Other) Notice of Change of E-Mail Address #982 (shb)
May 1, 2008 Filing 984 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendant City of Long Beach, Re Service of Documentation of the City of Long Beach's Payments to KP Officers per Court Order dated 4/14/08 served on May 1, 2008. (Hartinger, Arthur)
April 30, 2008 Filing 983 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. CORRECT EVENT IS CHANGE OF ADDRESS UNDER NOTICES. RE: Notice (Other) #982 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (shb)
April 28, 2008 Filing 982 NOTICE Change of Firm Name filed by Plaintiffs Mario Aiello. (Fairchild, Michael)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 981 ORDER by Judge George H Wu Granting REQUEST for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Fenja Klaus on behalf of plaintiff Douglas Bacon in place and stead of attorney Michael J Fairchild. (jp)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 980 ORDER request for approval of substitution of attorney by Judge George H Wu Granting Fenja Klaus in place and stead of Jackson Demarco Tidus Petersen and Peckenpaugh (pj)
April 16, 2008 Filing 979 Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Douglas Bacon (Klaus, Fenja)
April 16, 2008 Filing 978 Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Douglas Bacon (Petersen, Gregory)
April 15, 2008 Filing 977 Substitution of Attorney (Petersen, Gregory)
April 14, 2008 Filing 976 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu Counsel for the defendants are to provide to the plaintiffs a list of amounts that were paid by notlater than May 1, 2008; Plaintiffs shall provide a response to the defendants list by not later than May 12, 2008. The Scheduling Conference is continued to May 15, 2008 at 8:30 a.m.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
April 11, 2008 Filing 975 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 30 days, filed by Defendant City of Long Beach.. (Hartinger, Arthur)
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 974 ORDER by Judge George H Wu GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY Greg Hafif, Law Offices of Herbert Hafif for plaintiff David Faris in Place of Attorneys Jacson DeMarco Tidus, Petersen & Peckenpaugh #967 . (jp)
April 7, 2008 Filing 971 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike the Appearances of Jackson DeMarco Tidus Petersen Peckenpaugh After March 4, 2008 in this matter #969 Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Vicente Aceves. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Strike)(Fairchild, Michael)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 972 ORDER by Judge George H Wu Granting Request for Approval of substitution of Attorney Greg Hafif, Law Offices of Herbert Hafif for plaintiff Douglas Bacon in Place of Attorneys Jacson DeMarco Tidus, Petersen & Peckenpaugh #966 . (jp)
April 4, 2008 Filing 969 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike the Appearances of Jackson DeMarco Tidus Petersen Peckenpaugh After March 4, 2008 in this matter filed by Plaintiff MIchael Kenneth Paul Edwards, et al. Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diana Lawrence#2 Proposed Order #3 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Petersen, Gregory)
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER by Judge George H Wu: Substitution of Attorney Greg Hafif, Law Offices of Herbert Hafif for plaintiff Douglas Johnson in Place of Attorneys Jacson DeMarco Tidus, Petersen & Peckenpaugh. (jp)
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 970 ORDER by Judge George H Wu Granting Substituting attorney Greg K Hafif for Douglas Bacon in place and stead of Jackson, Demarco, Tidus, Petersen & Peckenpaugh (bp)
April 2, 2008 Filing 968 Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Douglas R Johnson With The Law Offices of Herbert Hafif (Caballero, Miguel)
April 2, 2008 Filing 967 Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff David Faris With the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif (Caballero, Miguel)
March 28, 2008 Filing 966 Request for Approval of substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Douglas Bacon Greg Hafif, Law Offices of Herbert Hafif in Place of Attorneys Jacson DeMarco Tidus, Petersen & Peckenpaugh (Attachments: #1)(Caballero, Miguel)
March 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 965 ORDER by Judge George H Wu Plaintiff hereby substitutes Fenja Klaus in place and stead of jackson Demarco Tidus, Petersen Peckenpaugh (pj)
March 24, 2008 Filing 964 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing AND Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu :, Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer. For the reasons stated on the record, the Defendant City ofLong Beach's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is taken under submission. The Court shall issue a ruling. The Scheduling Conference is continued to April 14, 2008 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically, if notice is given to the clerk within two business days of the hearing.If the parties submit a stipulation and proposed order with proposed dates, the hearing will be taken offcalendar and no appearance by counsel will be necessary.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 963 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, On Substitution of Attorney #961 , Attorney Greg K Hafif for A G Megas substituted in place and stead of Attorney M Alim Malik. (es)
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 962 ORDER by Judge George H Wu, On Substitution of Attorney #957 , Attorney Greg K Hafif for Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards substituted in place and stead of Attorney Rex Hwang. (es) Modified on 3/24/2008 (es, ).
March 20, 2008 Filing 961 Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff A G Megas (Klaus, Fenja)
March 17, 2008 Filing 960 TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings held on 3/6/08 Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (bem, )
March 17, 2008 Filing 959 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Fenja Klaus counsel for Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Changing Law Offices of Fenja Klaus to 267 W. Bonita Avenue, Claremont, CA 91711. Changing fklaus@klauslawfirm.com to (714) 960-9500. Adding Fenja Klaus as attorney as counsel of record for Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Klaus, Fenja)
March 14, 2008 Filing 958 Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff A G Megas With the Law Offices of Herbert Hafif (Caballero, Miguel)
March 14, 2008 Filing 957 Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards With The Law Offices of Herbert Hafif (Caballero, Miguel)
March 12, 2008 Filing 956 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Gregory G Petersen counsel for Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. Changing PETERSEN LAW FIRM to 21163 Newport Coast Drive, #581, Newport Coast, CA 92657. Changing gpetersen@petersenlawfirm.com to (949) 640-8983. Adding Gregory G. Petersen as attorney as counsel of record for Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Petersen, Gregory)
March 12, 2008 Filing 955 Consent to Join Action Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards Consent to Join Action (Caballero, Miguel)
March 12, 2008 Filing 954 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Voom Sawai. correcting Joinder in Complaint 571 Udom Sawai (Fairchild, Michael)
March 12, 2008 Filing 953 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Eric Dennison. correcting Joinder in Complaint 620 Eric Denmion (Fairchild, Michael)
March 12, 2008 Filing 952 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Demeen. correcting Joinder in Complaint 621 Jeffrey Deneen (Fairchild, Michael)
March 7, 2008 Filing 951 Compendium and Exhibits filed by Defendant City of Long Beach of California IWC Wage Orders and Related Materials re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to As to State Law Claims ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #921 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G#2 Exhibit H-N#3 Exhibit O-V)(Hartinger, Arthur)
March 6, 2008 Filing 950 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Motion Hearing held before Judge George H Wu : Motion and Scheduling Conference reset for hearing on 3/24/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (shb)
March 5, 2008 Filing 949 OBJECTIONS TO LATE FILED DECLARATIONS filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Hartinger, Arthur)
March 5, 2008 Filing 948 STATEMENT Scheduling Conference Statement filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Fairchild, Michael)
March 5, 2008 Filing 947 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to As to State Law Claims ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #921 SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Fairchild, Michael)
March 5, 2008 Filing 946 STATEMENT Settlement Procedure Selection filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards and Defendant (Fairchild, Michael)
March 5, 2008 Filing 945 STATEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Defendant City of Long Beach (Hartinger, Arthur)
February 28, 2008 Filing 944 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to As to State Law Claims ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #921 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JORGE A. CISNEROS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Hartinger, Arthur)
February 28, 2008 Filing 943 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to As to State Law Claims ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #921 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SUZANNE R. MASON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Hartinger, Arthur)
February 28, 2008 Filing 942 SUPPLEMENT DECLARATION OF ARTHUR A HARTINGER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Hartinger, Arthur)
February 28, 2008 Filing 941 REPLY In Support OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Hartinger, Arthur)
February 28, 2008 Filing 940 JOINDER John Ward in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Fairchild, Michael)
February 28, 2008 Filing 939 JOINDER Jesus Valdez in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Fairchild, Michael)
February 28, 2008 Filing 938 JOINDER James Schlobohm in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Fairchild, Michael)
February 27, 2008 Filing 937 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael J Fairchild counsel for Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards.John D. Hayashi is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Fairchild, Michael)
February 26, 2008 Filing 936 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Arthur A Hartinger counsel for Defendant City of Long Beach. Adding Samantha W. Zutler as attorney as counsel of record for Defendant City of Long Beach for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant City of Long Beach (Hartinger, Arthur)
February 26, 2008 Filing 935 JOINDER Michael Schaich in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Fairchild, Michael)
February 26, 2008 Filing 934 JOINDER Dustin Paladino in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Fairchild, Michael)
February 26, 2008 Filing 933 JOINDER Scott Nishitani in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Fairchild, Michael)
February 26, 2008 Filing 932 JOINDER Todd Neveling in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Fairchild, Michael)
February 26, 2008 Filing 931 JOINDER John Hust in Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Fairchild, Michael)
February 22, 2008 Filing 930 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Harter. correcting Joinder in Complaint 197 Dennis Hartor (Fairchild, Michael)
February 22, 2008 Filing 929 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff James L Dodwell. correcting Joinder in Complaint 889 James L. Dowdell (Fairchild, Michael)
February 22, 2008 Filing 928 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Dennis A Camaria. correcting Joinder in Complaint 581 Dennis A. Canaria (Fairchild, Michael)
February 21, 2008 Filing 927 OPPOSITION to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to As to State Law Claims ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #921 In Opposition filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts#2 Objection to Cisneros Declaration#3 Objection to Hartinger Declaration#4 Objection to Mason Declaration#5 Declaration of Michael J. Fairchild in Support of Plaintiffs' Request to Conduct Disocvery#6 Certificate of Service)(Fairchild, Michael)
February 14, 2008 Filing 926 DECLARATION of Suzanne Mason In Support OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to As to State Law Claims ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #921 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 #5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I)(Hartinger, Arthur)
February 14, 2008 Filing 925 DECLARATION of JORGE A. CISNEROS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to As to State Law Claims ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #921 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Hartinger, Arthur)
February 14, 2008 Filing 924 DECLARATION of ARTHUR A. HARTINGER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to As to State Law Claims ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #921 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Hartinger, Arthur)
February 14, 2008 Filing 923 COMPENDIUM OF WAGE ORDERS AND SECONDARY AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to As to State Law Claims ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #921 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Hartinger, Arthur)
February 14, 2008 Filing 922 STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to As to State Law Claims ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #921 filed by Defendant City of Long Beach. (Hartinger, Arthur)
February 14, 2008 Filing 921 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to As to State Law Claims ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Defendant City of Long Beach.Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2008 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. (Hartinger, Arthur)
February 6, 2008 Filing 920 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Javier Gonzalez Deputy Clerk to Judge George H Wu. The documents is accepted as filed; Please take note of the deficiency. Further errors will result in documents being stricken for failure to comply. RE: #919 (pj)
February 4, 2008 Filing 919 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected.The correct event to use is: Joinder in Complaint under OTHER COMPLAINT FILINGS, action was or will be taken by Filer In response to this notice the court may order 1) an amended or correct document to be filed 2) the document stricken or 3) take other action as the court deems appropriate.: RE Miscellaneous Document #915 , Miscellaneous Document #916 , Miscellaneous Document #918 (pj)
January 31, 2008 Filing 918 Consent to Join Action as a Party filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards Richard Montoya (Fairchild, Michael)
January 31, 2008 Filing 917 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Paul Arcals. correcting Joinder in Complaint 602 Paul Arcala (Fairchild, Michael)
January 31, 2008 Filing 916 Consent to Join Action as a Party filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards Marc Cobb (Fairchild, Michael)
January 31, 2008 Filing 915 Consent to Join Action as a Party filed by Plaintiff David Faris Raymond Arcala (Fairchild, Michael)
January 30, 2008 Filing 914 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Mark Northart. correcting Joinder in Complaint 783 Consent to Join by Mark Northart (Fairchild, Michael)
January 30, 2008 Filing 913 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Lawrence L Arnwime. correcting Joinder in Complaint 141 Consent to Join by Lawrence Arnwine (Fairchild, Michael)
January 10, 2008 Filing 910 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael J Fairchild on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Fairchild, Michael)
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 912 ORDER RE JOINT STATUS STATEMENT RE SETTLEMENT PROCEDURE SELECTION: Pursuant to the Joint Status Statement Re Settlement Procedure Selection, theparties to this action shall have until March 6, 2008 to file their Settlement Procedure Selection: Request And Notice pursuant to Local Rule 16-15. by Judge George H Wu, (pj)
January 8, 2008 Filing 909 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Statement Re Settlement Procedure Selection filed by Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Malik, M)
January 8, 2008 Filing 908 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney M Alim Malik on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards (Malik, M)
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 911 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge George H Wu, ORDERING Joint status statement submitted by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Barba, Bernardo Barajas, Banuelos, Jr, Barber E Barber, Christopher Bates, Randall Beach, Joe Battle, Sr, Cory J Brown, Anthony M Brown, Ronald P Burgess, Bill J Burney, Geoffrey A Berg, Michael T Beckman, Doulglas R Bender, Edward L Bonachea, Ronald A Boandl, Richard Birdsall, Jeffrey Berkenkamp, Satwan D Johnson, William A Johnston, Larry Jones, Ignacio Zavala, Ricardo Zatarain, Dina Zapalski, Douglas Bacon, Felipa A Baccari, Richard Bell, Ronald Bell, Toby Benskin, Kevin Bradburn, Laurie Briney, Marcus R Briones, Brian T Ekern, Derek Ernest, David A Ebell, Danielle Quinones, Ronald D Quarn, Robert Torres, Donald Radcliff, Robert Tamparong, Frank Torres, Ron Trott, Rogelio Q Trias, Norman C Turley, Brian G Tuliau, Kenneth W Turner, Michael J White, David Williams, James A Williams, John W Williams, Alan P Wilson, Ernest G Wolosewicz, Jason T Wood, Donald Wood, Gregory Woodruff, Robert L Woods, Michael Wooldridge, Paul T Wright, Laurence Walker, Jr, Leonard L Washington, Royce Wexler, Michael K Whitcomb, George Sargent, Dominick Scaccia, Jason T Ur, Lorenzo J Uribe, Eduardo E Urquiza, Adrian Tul, Mark W Swanson, Edward Saldana, Alexander Saldana, Eddie H Sanchez, Andre R Sanchez, Paul Sanford, James Stahmann, Bradford Stein, Matthew Solarski, Robert W Schroeder, Kevin Skeen, Aristeo Sandoval, David Okerman, Gregory L Schirmer, Michael L Soldin, Leslie A Soto, Leroy Staes, Wendy K Starbird, Dave Stennick, Parine Soth, Suradech Sriwanthana, Cory Strang, David G Strong, Kenneth Sutton, Mark Mesun, Eli L Moreno, John M Mercado, Jason P Melvin, Michael Erdelji, Jesus Espinoza, Sean Irving, Michael Jackson, John C Jacobs, Jr, Todd Jenkins, Patrick Jennings, Steven Jilek, Fernando Jimenez, Douglas R Johnson, Joel C Johnson, Jr, Bret Milovich, Eric Mifflin, Christopher F Morgan, Luis E Corona, Rubi Castro, James R Clark, Gamaliel Collazo, Daniel Molinar, Jeff Meyer, Luke McGee, David Collazo, Andrew D Vanholt, Sharon Van Duin, Dave Garcia, Jayson Cochran, Rudio O Garcia, Amy Garrett, Jason Garrido, Gabriel Garrido, Armand M Castellanos, Alex C Gassler, Mark A Gell, Rory J Hainley, Monique Hainley-Glover, Leticia Caranza, Harry D Hampton, Douglas S Hara, John Harrigan, Fernando Cook, Thomas H Keleher, Robert Kuroda, Gregory A Krabbe, Robert Davenport, Konkoly, Robert Kennedy, William B Kift, Kevin T King, Jason M Kirk, Norman A Delgado, Robert B Knight, Asif Khan, Jack Dial, Lee D Debrabander, Justin Krueger, Jeffrey V Harris, Nicholas Harris, John F Davies, Timothy P Hart, Russell Lee, Michael W Mazzoni, Christopher E Martinez, Nicholas L De La O, Jeffrey A Meyer, Jason Mifflin, Jack Manu, Rick DeForest, Sean Magee, Aaron C Mascorro, Delmy V Morales, Gerrit Dejohngh, Daniel K Moreno, Travis R Muilenburg, Justin Murr, Joseph L Gludt, Brian Dapello, Kerry M Geisige, Michael E Green, Keith Gregrow, Benjamin De Los Santos, Clinton A Grimes, Robert Guerrero, Hector A Gutierrez, Gabriel Doby, Joe Gutierrez, Luis Galvan, Anthony Garcia, Eric M Golz, Timothy A Downs, Armando Garica, Hector Gomez, Elaine Gomez, Dominguez, Kenneth Gonyea, Fermin Gonzalez, Jose M Gonzalez, Jr, Carlos Del Real, Donald J Goodman, Gary T Gotori, Jorge A Grajeda, Ulises Julio, Brandon N Deis, Bradley Futak, Richard A Farfan, David Faris, Bradley D Dinsdale, Jon A Fenoglio, Eric Fernandez, Americo Fernandez, Derrick M Dinsmore, Adam Ferris, Jose G Flores, Roque O Foster, William D Foster, Johnny Dodson, III, Steven Fox, Jesus Fragoso, Jr, David H Fritz, Karen Dougherty, Eric Fritz, Miguel A Valenzuela, Jennifer Valenzuela, Michael J Dugan, Cesar Velarde, Victor Vidriales, Albert Vargas, Oscar Valenzuela, Jason P Dallas, Timothy L Van Coutren, Steven T Vanden Bosch, Francisco Vasquez, Norman Dumaplin, Reginald Vega, Xavier Veloz, Nelson Villoria, Michael Demarco, Kevin Voorhes, Chris Valdez, Paul Luyben, David Demasi, Gary S DePhillippo, Ernesto Betancourt, Christian f Moody, Tyrone Anderson, Julie Anderson, Kalid Abuhadwan, Charlotte M Alu, Ramon Alcala, Darren Adams, Nikki R Alexander, Peter Anderson, Anthony Anast, Ernest W Armond, Bobby J Anguiano, Guillermo Arias, Jennifer Arzola, Alexander Avila, Eric Alvarez, Forrest R Anderson, Alex Angotti, Philip Candelaria, Gabriel Carillo, Aldo Decarvalho, David Ebell, Joe Gaynor, Randy J Kleber, Richard W Firman, Stephanie N Hall, Cesar Velarde, Ismael Rubio, Thomas G Rodriquez, Herbert C. Smith, David Smart, Mark Sisneros, Kurt D Sine, Christopher Silva, Patricia Whybrew, David Hubbert, Mega Zabel, Jeffrey Shurtleff, Leticia Gamboa, Curtis Shur, Jason Sheffield, Sean E Parilla, Hector L Nieves, Scott D Neal, Carlos Nava, Paul Munson, Donald Mauk, Mark Mattia, Jorge Marquez, Vincenzo G Marchese, Craig Patterson, Melvin D McGuire, Lisa McCourt, Brian J McCormick, Keith R McCart, Margarit McCart, Quincy Miles, Norman Mikkelson, Donald E Messer, Melvin M Megee, Juan J Medina, Joshua Brearley, Craig Miller, Barry Miller, Michelle Miller, Scott J Miller, Carlos Grimaldo, John B Greet, Brian Greene, Arturo Gonzalez, Robert Gonzales, David Hubbert, Dana L Braak, Chris Brammer, Michael D Pennino, Conrad Penn, Shea L Robertson, Gregory A Roberts, Bruce Roberson, Stephan C Ritchie, Adam Rim, Abram R Yap, Robert W Zottneck, John Watkins, Ryan Watson, Curtis Y Yee, Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, Gerardo Prieto, Kenny Quaack, Francisco J Ramirez, Luis E Ramirez, Brent Record, Robert A Lopez, Alberto Leon, Adrian Tol, Gary Tymich, Kevin Delorto, Michael Lord, Gary A Hodgson, Jason Lehman, John Lembi, Adriana Jaurigui, Mark Hansen, Darren T Hall, Samuel McKenzie, Marcus Hodge, Danny Hernandez, Wally Hebeish, Robin Hawkins, Warren Harris, Stephen James, Jeffrey C Jacobs, Sean Hunt, Michael Hubbard, John R Hotchkiss, Louis M Perez, Dennis S Price, Michael T Potter, David Poss, Vincent A Platt, Max Jones, Joseph J Johnson, Todd Johnson, Joe P Pirooz, Randy Petersen, John Magallanes, Patrick J Lyon, Jason Lovo, Jennifer Kearns, Shawn Loughlin, Joseph Klein, Kevin King, Jason Kennedy, Cory Lapworth, Gregory L Manis, Julio E Juarez, Scott Sorenson, Richard Kaiser, Jeffrey Jonkey, David Jones, Salvador Torres, Allan R Legayada, Bruce Lee, Kevin Stinson, James Kroeger, Stephen T Stough, Victor L Thrash, Milton G Thomas, Mario Talavera, Jayson Torres, Richard Weldin, Armondo R Yearwood, Jonathan Steinhauser, William Swaim, David Strohman, Ricardo Solorio, Dana Smith, Ross Smillie, Neil R Vadnais, David M Urbina, Christopher Silva, Kurt D Sine, Dan Visser, David Weise, Salvador Solorzano, Jeannie M Villanueva, Thomas Vriens, Ismael Rubio, Thomas G. Rodriguez, Mark Sisneros, Megan Zabel, Matthew Whybrew, Eduardo D Reyes, Jr, Herbert C. Smith, David Smart, Robert Trout, Arthur Vega, Jose Yarruns, Noe Yanez, Jason K. Wong, Javier Sepulveda, Joseph P Seminara, Brad A Scavone, Voom Sawai, Randy Sany, Ralph Calvete, Jonathan A Calvert, Patrick J Burns, Steven D Buchheim, George T Reno, Efrain Cervantes, Jerry A Carter, Jr, Hector H Cardiel, Sean R Campbell, Dennis A Camaria, Darin Blizzard, Onorio Galvan, David Gage, Rachel Frausto, Johnny Miyasaki, Larry Bautista, Sondra Benskin, Jacqueline Bezart, James J Bisetti, Byron D Blair, Brian Armstrong, Ebrahim Ashabi, Ali Assef, Richard Austin, Jr, Daniel Barkwill, Vicente Aceves, Jeff Alexen, Andrea Allen, Aaron Alu, Paul Arcals, Matthew J Mills, Michael Colbert, Mark S Coble, Maria Clay, Alfredo Chairez, Theodore A Covey, Jeff Conrad, Gordon Collier, Jonathan Cole, Rick Colbert, Eduardo De La Torre, Sean D Deaton, Douglas P Davidson, David R Daniels, James E Craig, Jacob Dillon, James Dickey, Eric Dennison, Jeffrey Demeen, Jessica Delosh, Diego Escutia, Gregory S Eldridge, Binh T Duong, Jr, Matthew Dougherty, Oscar Dominguez, Victor Feria, Nestor Ferguson, Eric Alvarez, Joseph W Ferguson, John B Fagar, Forrest R Andersen, Timothy L Everts, Alex Angotti, Philip Candelaria, Gabriel Carrillo, Joel L Camrin, Fernando Cuevas, Albert Candeo, Lloyd Cox, Ciaran Crawford, Kenny E Cruz, James Mondragon, Andrew M Fox, Marco Cruz, James T Foster, Eugene e Cummings, Jason Foerster, Joshua S Castro, M Wesley Fisher, Paul Gallo, Alfonso Garcia, Thomas Cummings, Keith D Mullally, Edmund Moscoso, Richard R Chavez, Keith Mortensen, Richard Cawley, Oscar Morales, Philip Cloughesy, Ana Maria Gill, Richard Chambers, Jerry M Gibbs, Tristan Corbett, Matthew V George, Michael Gardinier, Troy Matsuura, Sirilo L Garcia, Jesus Macias, Michael P Parcells, Hank Ly, Victor Ortiz, Brandon T Mitchell, Cynthia Orel, Roger D Montell, Elise Nikoletich, Kimberly Maddox, Juan Gomez, Gina McConnon, Fernando Mayen, William K Matsubara, Robert D Mendoza, Michael Masai, Fernando Martinez, Jose M Serenil, Thomas Perez, Kevin D Peterson, Leesa L Mahaffey, Julie D Prior, Mark McGuire, Joseph S Pueliu, Matt S Archer, Joseph Rabe, Richard Armond, Lawrence L Arnwime, Ricardo Ramirez, Corey Austin, Tai D Ro, George D Ayala, Jr, Thomas G. Rodriguez, Raymond F Panek, Bo Pak, Rudy Romero, Christopher D Roth, Alfonso Navarro, Robert R Ryan, III, Tomb T Neal, Jose M Serenil, Mark L Nguyen, Adam Sturgeon, Vuong Nguyen, George Nogueira, John D Bruce, Nystedt, Christopher J Costa, Tim Olson, Daniel Steven Covarubias, Jonathan Y Poon, Steven Richard Donahue, Jerry B Poole, Jr, Shannon M Phillips, Rodney D Donahue, Russell Peterson, Brian T Ekrem, Steven Petersen, Michael Hynes, Ernesto Perez, Jacqueline Parkhill, Peter Lackovic, Kerry R Parker, Juan Carlos Reyes, Mark Vinci, Christopher Thue, Francisco Pena, Blayne K Tom, Andrew Pringle, Tina Louise Icorn, Songcheak Ier, Steven J Prell, Brandon T Preciado, Dan Pratt, Christopher G Ignacio, John A Pope, Brent T Ikari, Ben Vargas, Jr, Scott W Jenson, Lowe, Delon Johns, Leonard Junyong Kim, Janathan Lucero, James H Kloss, Douglas Luther, David Kofoed, Fernando E Longcob, Mark Kosoy, Manuel Q Lopez, Anthony Lopez, Deborah M Clark, Steven P Kroesen, Jarrod M Lewis, Shanda Kunkle, Dylan Lobascio, Ryan B Lebaron, Yul B Long, Thomas Erdelji, Harry Erickson, Sovanna Ly, Duane Evans, Jason Lacey, James Earl Fellows, Randy Lacsina, Americo Fernandez, Timothy L Lancaster, Timothy M Ferrill, Michael Anthony Dapello, Darren
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 907 STIPULATION AND ORDER that defendant shall file a motion for partial summary judgment to be heard on or before 3/6/2008 at 8:30 AM. by Judge George H Wu : (pj)
December 13, 2007 Filing 906 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Consent to Joint Action by Robert Tamparong filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. (vh)
December 13, 2007 Filing 905 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Consent to Joint Action by Gerrit DeJohngh filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. (vh)
December 13, 2007 Filing 904 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Consent to Joint Action by Brian T. Ekren filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. (vh)
December 13, 2007 Filing 903 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Consent to Joint Action by Vaignte Marshall filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. (vh)
December 13, 2007 Filing 902 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Consent to Joint Action by David Frazior filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. (vh)
December 13, 2007 Filing 901 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Consent to Joint Action by Carel c. Nydell filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. (vh)
December 13, 2007 Filing 900 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Consent to Joint Action by Maria Razo filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. (vh)
December 13, 2007 Filing 899 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Consent to Joint Action by Richard R. Chavez filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. (vh)
December 13, 2007 Filing 898 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Consent to Joint Action by Eric Alvarez filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. (vh)
December 13, 2007 Filing 897 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Consent to Joint Action by John B. Fagar filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. (vh)
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 896 STIPULATION AND ORDER the Edwards and Faris actions consolidated pursuant to the parties stipulation CV05-8990 consolidated with SA07-954 by Judge George H Wu : (pj) Modified on 8/17/2010 (cbr).
November 29, 2007 Filing 890 MINUTES OF HEARING RE: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer. Counsel for defendant indicates that a motion for partial summary judgment will be filed. The Court orders any and all motions for summary judgment to be filed with the hearing date of March 6, 2008 at 8:30 a.m. The Scheduling Conference is continued to March 6, 2008 at 8:30 a.m. The Court orders the parties to inquire as to mediation within 30 days. A status report shall be filed regarding mediation thereafter. Parties hereby waive notice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
November 19, 2007 Filing 874 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H Wu :Status Conference is held. Parties inform the Court that the stipulation and proposed order consolidatingthe Edwards and Faris actions have been submitted for review.The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for November 29, 2007 at 8:30 a.m. Parties are to meet and confer regarding dates. A stipulation and proposed order of said dates shall be submitted to the Court bynot later than 12:00 noon on November 27, 2007. Parties may appear telephonically, if notice is givento the clerk within two business days of the hearing date. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (pj)
November 2, 2007 Filing 871 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error: No (NEF) Notice of Electronic Filing created. (Attachments: #1 Minute Order #870) (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 895 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - GINA M BOWEN-GILBERT re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Gina M Bowen-Gilbert (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 894 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - NICHOLAS HO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Ho (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 893 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - JEREMY BOSHNACK re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Boshnack (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 892 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - RAY L ALEXANDER re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Ray L Alexander (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 891 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - STEPHEN BLACK re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Stephen Black (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 889 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - JAMES L DODWELL re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff James L Dodwell (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 888 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - CHAD C ELLIS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Chad C Ellis (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 887 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - DAVID W FRAZIOR re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff David W Frazior (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 886 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - ERIK B BURKS, re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Erik B Burks (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 885 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - ROBERT W TITUS, II re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Robert W Titus, II (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 884 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - WILLIAM BURNS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff William Burns (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 883 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - MARY COVARUBIAS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Mary Covarubias (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 882 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - ISIAH C HUGHES re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Isiah C Hughes (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 881 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - MATTHEW KENNISON re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Matthew Kennison (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 880 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - DON KEHOE re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Don Kehoe (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 879 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - WENDY STOUT re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Wendy Stout (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 878 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - TIMOTHY M LONG re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Timothy M Long (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 877 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - ANDRE BOOKER re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Andre Booker (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 876 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - ARTURO TRUJILLO re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Arturo Trujillo (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 875 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - TIM O'HARA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Tim O'Hara (shb)
November 1, 2007 Filing 873 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kenneth Paul Edwards, A G Megas. (Attorney John D. Hayashi, hereby withdraws his appearance on the record). (vh)
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 872 ORDER by Judge George H Wu Granting Substituting attorney Arthur A Hartinger for City of Long Beach in place and stead of attorney Belinda R Mayes. (pj)
November 1, 2007 Filing 870 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE.Status Conference held before Judge George H Wu: Court and counsel confer further regarding related case, David Daris v City of Long Beach, et al., SACV 07-954-JVS(ANx). Court is inclided to accept related case. Parties shall submit a stipulation and proposed order consolidating both actions no later than 4:00 p.m. on November 15, 2007. If the parties have not completed the stipulation and proposed order by said date, a joint status report may be filed in its place. A Status Conference is set for 11/19/2007 08:30 AM before Judge George H Wu. IT IS SO ORDERED.Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (shb)
October 26, 2007 Filing 869 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - DEVIN STRIBICH re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Devin Stribich (shb)
October 26, 2007 Filing 868 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - MICHAEL A DEPRETE re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by PLAINTIFF Michael A Deprete (shb)
October 26, 2007 Filing 867 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - MARLIA JO FIGUEROA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Marlia Jo Figueroa (shb)
October 25, 2007 Filing 866 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - CHRIS NGUYEN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Chris Nguyen (shb)
October 24, 2007 Filing 865 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - ALLAN JONES re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Allan Jones (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 864 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - RALPH E ROBBINS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Ralph E Robbins (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 863 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - DANIEL MENDOZA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Daniel Mendoza (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 862 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - DENNIS ROBBINS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Dennis Robbins (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 861 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - MATTHEW DOUGHERTY re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Matthew Dougherty (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 860 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - LUIS VELEZ re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Luis Velez (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 859 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - JORGE ALBERTO SALAZAR re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Jorge Alberto Salazar (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 858 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PEDRO VALENZUELA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Pedro Valenzuela (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 857 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PAUL BAUM re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Paul Baum (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 856 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - CHRISTOPHER BOLT re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Christopher Bolt (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 855 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - JACINTO P PONCE re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Jacinto P Ponce (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 854 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - ALFONSO ESQUEDA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Alfonso Esqueda (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 853 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - BRADLEY JOHNSON re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Bradley Johnson (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 852 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - MICHAEL BOLLING re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Michael Bolling (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 851 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - KENNETH M GREEN re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Kenneth M Green (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 850 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - JOSEPH V BAHASH re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Joseph V Bahash (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 849 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - MARIA CLAY re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Maria Clay (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 848 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - JAMES T SINES re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff James Sines (shb)
October 17, 2007 Filing 847 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - ARTURO MONTES re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Arturo Montes (shb)
October 9, 2007 Filing 846 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - ALEXANDER HARRIS re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Alexander Harris (shb)
October 9, 2007 Filing 845 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - PAUL R BAUM re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff Paul R Baum (shb)
October 9, 2007 Filing 844 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - ERIC M LEDESMA re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Eric M Ledesma (shb)
October 9, 2007 Filing 843 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - VICTOR HAFKENSCHEID re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Victor Hafkenscheid (shb)
October 9, 2007 Filing 842 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - DAVID GEER re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by plaintiff David Geer (shb)
October 9, 2007 Filing 841 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - WILLIAM D FOSTER re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff William D Foster (shb)
October 9, 2007 Filing 840 CONSENT TO JOIN ACTION AS A PARTY - JOHNNY A DODSON, III Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ,filed by Plaintiff Johnny Dodson, III (shb)
October 9, 2007 Filing 839 <