Fahmy v. Jay-Z et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Osama Ahmed Fahmy
Defendant: Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Kyambo Joshua, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson, Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, EMI Music Publishing Ltd, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Lil Lulu Publishing, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Marcy Projects Productions II Inc, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Radical Media, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc and Warner Music Inc
Case Number: 2:2007cv05715
Filed: August 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H. Segal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER CONTINUNING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. The Court has read and considered the parties' stipulation requesting a short continuance of the settlement conference. Good cause appearing therefor, it is hereby ORDERED that the case schedule is modified as follows: the settlement conference is continued to August 22, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. 323 (gr)
July 17, 2012 Filing 323 STIPULATION to Continue Settlement Conference from June 21, 2012 to August 22, 2012 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. Counsel are notified that the settlement conference previously scheduled for June 21, 2012 is continued and now scheduled for August 22, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel of record for named parties only are to be in attendance. 321 (gr)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: Continued settlement conference is scheduled for June 21 2012 at 9:30. Counsel of record for named parties only are to be in attendance. (dt) Modified on 6/14/2012 (dt).
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: The call-in information for the May 22, 2012 conference call is listed. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** (dt)
May 11, 2012 Filing 319 NOTICE Notice of Disassociation of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
May 4, 2012 Filing 317 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Robert B. Kory on behalf of Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. Filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
April 30, 2012 Filing 318 MINUTES OF Continued Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: Agreement is not reached at this time. Counsel are to confer further. A telephonic conference regarding settlement status is scheduled for May 22, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. The court clerk will provide call-in information for the conference. (dt)
April 30, 2012 Filing 316 DECLARATION of Movant Ahab Joseph ("Julian") Nafal in Notice of Lien 315 filed by Movant Ahab Joseph Nafal. (gk)
April 30, 2012 Filing 315 NOTICE OF LIEN RIGHTS filed by Interested Person Ahab Joseph Nafal. (gk)
April 11, 2012 Filing 314 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Ahab Joseph Nafal. (gk)
April 11, 2012 Filing 313 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, Settlement conference held. A continued conference is scheduled for April 30, 2012, at 9:30 a.m. (lmh)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Movant Ahab Joseph Nafal, in pro se, in place of Attorney Robert Stephen Besser 311 . (gk)
April 5, 2012 Filing 311 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Ahab Joseph Nafal, in pro per in place of attorney Robert Stephen Besser filed by Intervenor Ahab Joseph Nafal. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Besser, Robert)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 310 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle, This matter having been referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle for settlement conference by U.S. District Judge Snyder, IT IS ORDERED that a settlement conference shall be held in the chambers of Judge Woehrle on April 11, 2012 at 3:00 p.m., Room 640, 6th Floor of the Roybal Courthouse, 255 E. Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA. The conference should be attended by persons with meaningful authority to negotiate and agree to a settlement of the case. The parties shall submit settlement conference statements directly to Judge Woehrles chambers not later than three (3) court days before the conference. These statements are to be exchanged with opposing counsel. The statements shall not be filed in the court record. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (lmh)
December 9, 2011 Filing 309 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Statute of Limitations 278 , and Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Concert Revenues 277 . The Court GRANTS defendants' motion for summary judgment as to the statute of limitations period. Plaintiff shall not be permitted to seek damages from any alleged infringement occurring prior to 8/31/2004. The Court also concludes that there is a triable issue of fact whether the concert revenues plaintiff seeks are properly considered direct profits. The Court reserves judgment as to whether plaintiff is able to prove the requisite causal nexus. The Court therefore DENIES plaintiff's motion for an order specifying that concert revenues are recoverable as a matter of law. However, defendants are directed to respond to discovery requests that go to both the manner of advertising concerts as well as the revenues derived therefrom. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
November 14, 2011 Filing 308 MINUTES of Hearing on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment; Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period; Plaintiff's Motion for Order Specifying IssuesOf Law That Exist Without Substantial Controversy with Respect to ConcertRevenues held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Prior to the hearing, the courtroom deputy clerk distributes the Court's tentative ruling. Court hears oral argument from counsel and take the matter undersubmission.Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (kpa)
November 3, 2011 Filing 307 First AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Court's Minute Order of October 31, 2011 304 is amended as follows: On October 20, 2011, defendants filed an ex parte application for leave to file a surreply. Court granted defendants' ex parte on October 25, 2011. Plaintiff now moves for leave to file a surreply in response to defendants' surreply. Court hereby GRANTS plaintiff's request for leave to file a surreply. Plaintiff's surreply is not to exceed 5 pages, and the Court will permit no further briefing on this matter. In light of this amended Minute Order, ex parte application filed by defendants on November 2, 2011 305 is moot. (kpa)
November 2, 2011 Filing 306 REPLY In Support of MOTION for Order 277 Re Concert Revenues Filed Pursuant to the Court's October 31, 2011 Minute Order filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
November 2, 2011 Filing 305 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Clarification of This Court's October 31, 2011 Order filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants' Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Clarification of This Court's October 31, 2011 Order, # 2 Proposed Order re: Defendants' Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Clarification of This Court's October 31, 2011 Order)(Lewis, Alexa)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE SURREPLY by Judge Christina A. Snyder: On 10/20/2011, plaintiff Osama Fahmy filed an ex parte application for leave to file a surreply. The Court granted plaintiff's ex parte on 10/25/2011. Defendants now move for leave to file their own surreply in response to plaintiff's surreply. The Court hereby GRANTS defendants' application for leave to file a surreply. Defendants' surreply is not to exceed five pages, and the Court will permit no further briefing on this matter. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
October 31, 2011 Filing 303 Objection Plaintiff's Objection and Motion to Strike Purported Evidentiary Statements Made In Defedants' Reply In Support of Their Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Re Statute of Limitations re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) 278 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
October 27, 2011 Filing 302 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S EVIENTIARY OBJECTIONS RE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS MOTION re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) 278 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward O. Lear In Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections re Statute of Limitations Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Edward O. Lear, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Edward O. Lear, # 4 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER SPECIFYING ISSUES OF LAW THAT EXIST WITHOUT SUBSTANTIAL CONTROVERSY WITH RESPECT TO CONCERT REVENUES by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court ORDERS that Defendants' Ex Parte Application 299 be granted, and that Defendants' Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Specifying Issues of Law That Exist Without Substantial Controversy With Respect to Concert Revenues be deemed filed. (gk)
October 24, 2011 Filing 300 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Specifying Issues of Law that Exist without Substantial Controversy with Respect to Concert Revenues 299 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward O. Lear in Response to Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion re Concert Revenues, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Edward O. Lear in Response to Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion re Concert Revenues, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Leave to File a Surreply, and Granting Plaintiff Leave to File a Response to the Surreply, With Respect to Plaintiff's Motion re Concert Revenues, # 4 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
October 20, 2011 Filing 299 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Specifying Issues of Law that Exist without Substantial Controversy with Respect to Concert Revenues filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis, with Exhibits 1 and 2, # 2 Proposed Order re: Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Surreply)(Lewis, Alexa)
October 10, 2011 Filing 298 NOTICE filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. Notice of Errata re Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Motion of Defendants for Partial Summary Judgment (Lewis, Alexa)
October 10, 2011 Filing 297 REPLY in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) 278 filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Motion of Defendants for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Defendants Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Famhys Declaration in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Adjudication re Statute Of Limitations)(Lewis, Alexa)
October 10, 2011 Filing 296 REPLY In Support MOTION for Order 277 Specifying Issues of Law that Exist Without Substantial Controversy With Respect to Concert Revenues filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward O. Lear, # 2 Exhibit A-G of the Declaration of Edward O. Lear, # 3 Exhibit H-N of the Declaration of Edward O. Lear, # 4 Exhibit O-S of the Declaration of Edward O. Lear, # 5 Exhibit T-X of the Declaration of Edward O. Lear, # 6 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
October 7, 2011 Filing 295 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. correcting Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 288 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
October 5, 2011 Filing 294 DECLARATION of Osama Ahmed Fahmy In Opposition MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) 278 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response 291 : Parties' reply briefs in support of (1) Plaintiff's August 25, 2011 motion for order specifying issues of law that exist without substantialcontroversy and (2) Defendants' August 25, 2011 motion for partial summary judgment are to be filed on or before October 10, 2011. (kpa)
September 28, 2011 Filing 291 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File REPLY as to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) 278 , MOTION for Order 277 filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Extend by One Week Deadline to File Reply Briefs on Motions)(Lewis, Alexa)
September 26, 2011 Filing 292 SEALED DOCUMENT- DECLARATION of Edward O. Lear in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (mat)
September 26, 2011 Filing 290 STATEMENT of Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy's Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) 278 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
September 26, 2011 Filing 289 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 285 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
September 26, 2011 Filing 288 DECLARATION of Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy's Declaration In Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Summary Adjudication Re Statute of Limitation MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) 278 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
September 26, 2011 Filing 287 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. Plaintiff's Notice of Errata to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
September 26, 2011 Filing 286 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy of Exhibit B and C to Declaration of Edward O. Lear. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
September 26, 2011 Filing 285 Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy's Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment In Opposition re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) 278 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward O. Lear, # 2 Plaintiff's Objections to Evidence, # 3 Opposition to Defendats' Request for Judicial Notice, # 4 Request for Judicial Notice, # 5 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
September 26, 2011 Filing 284 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order 277 filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Motion on Concert Revenues)(Frackman, Russell)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER SPECIFYING ISSUES OF LAW THAT EXIST WITHOUT SUBSTANTIAL CONTROVERSY AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 282 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case schedule is modified as follows: The hearing on Plaintiff's motion for order specifying issues of law that exist without substantial controversy 277 and Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment 278 , is continued to 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder; all oppositions to the motions are to be filed before noon on 9/26/2011; and all replies are to be filed on or before 10/3/2011. (gk)
September 10, 2011 Filing 282 STIPULATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Order Specifying Issues of Law That Exsist Without Substantial Controversy and Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment from October 3, 2011 to October 17, 2011 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
September 6, 2011 Filing 281 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice (Other), Notice (Other) 277 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
August 26, 2011 Filing 280 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion and Motion by Plaintiff for Order Specifying Issues of Law that Exist Without Substantial Controversy with Respect to Concert Revenues filed 8/25/2011 277 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.The correct event is: Motions - Order. Filer used the event Notice (Other) which does not allow the filer to set a matter on calendar. Please re-file the document with the proper motion event. Local Rule 11-8 Memorandum brief exceeding 10 pages shall contain table of contents. Lacking statement re conference of counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 7-3. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
August 25, 2011 Filing 279 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) 278 (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion of Defendants for Partial Summary Judgment)(Lewis, Alexa)
August 25, 2011 Filing 278 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Statute of Limitations Period in 17 U.S.C. § 507(b) filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/3/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Motion of Defendants for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit 1-17 to Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Motion of Defendants for Partial Summary Judgment, # 3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion of Defendants for Partial Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit 1-4 to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion of Defendants for Partial Summary Judgment, # 5 Proposed Order re Motion of Defendants for Partial Summary Judgment)(Lewis, Alexa)
August 25, 2011 Filing 277 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. Notice of Motion and Motion By Plaintiff for Order Specifying Issues of Law that Exist Without Substantial Controversy With Respoect to Concert Revenues (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward) Modified on 9/15/2011 (gk).
July 25, 2011 Filing 276 MINUTES OF Status Conference Re Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order Setting a Scheduling Conference and Staying Discovery in the Interim held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court granted defendant's Ex Parte Application 272 and set this Status Conference. The Court confers with counsel and counsel shall file cross-motions for summary judgment on or before 8/25/2011 and noticing the motions for hearing on 10/3/2011 at 10:00 AM, as discussed in Court and on the record. No discovery on these issues shall be propounded. Counsel shall contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk if expert and discovery issues arise as to the cross-motions for summary judgment. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Court is in receipt of defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order Setting a Scheduling Conference and Staying Discovery in the Interim 272 . On the Court's own motion, Court sets a Status Conference on 7/25/11 at 12:00 PM (Noon). (kpa)
July 21, 2011 Filing 274 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Setting a Scheduling Conference and Staying Discovery in the Interim 272 filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Lewis, Alexa)
July 20, 2011 Filing 273 Plainitff's Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application In Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Setting a Scheduling Conference and Staying Discovery in the Interim 272 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward O. Lear with Exhibits, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
July 18, 2011 Filing 272 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Setting a Scheduling Conference and Staying Discovery in the Interim filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order Setting a Scheduling Conference and Staying Discovery in the Interim, # 2 Proposed Order re: Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order Setting a Scheduling Conference and Staying Discovery in the Interim)(Lewis, Alexa)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERT AHMED Y. ZOHNY AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court DENIES plaintiff's motion to exclude testimony of Ahmed Y. Zohn 256 . The Court GRANTS plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment 227 with respect to the following issues: (1) that Baligh Hamdy authored and owned the copyright in the 'Khosara, Khosara' musical composition; (2) that plaintiff Osama Fahmy is a Hamdy heir, and a co-owner of the 'Khosara, Khosara' copyright; (3) that plaintiff Osama Fahmy has standing to bring claims that defendants' works infringed the 'Khosara, Khosara' copyright. The Court DENIES plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment 227 with respect to the following issue, which it concludes present triable issues of fact for the jury: that defendants do not have a grant of permission to make derivative works from the 'Khosara, Khosara' musical composition. The Court also DENIES plaintiff's motion with respect to the following issue to the extent it conflicts with this order: that the copyright, insofar as it includes 'moral rights' in Egypt and the exclusive right to make derivative works, descended to and is controlled by Hamdy's heirs. (gk)
February 28, 2011 Filing 270 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: Plaintiff's Motion for an Order that Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, Exist Without Substantial Controversy 226 , 227 ; Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' "Expert" Ahmed Y. Zohny 256 . Hearing held and counsel are present. Tentative order provided. The Court confers with counsel and counsel argue. The Court takes plaintiff's motions under submission. The Court will issue a final order. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (vdr)
February 14, 2011 Filing 269 Opposition to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Mohamed-Hossam Loutfi in support of re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Material Facts and Issues of Law Including Foreign Law that Exist Without Substantial Controversy 226 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
February 14, 2011 Filing 268 REPLY in support of MOTION to Exclude Testimon of Defendants' "Expert" Ahmed Y. Zohny 256 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION 263 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Surreply is granted, and the following may be deemed filed: (1) Defendants [Proposed] Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs Summary Judgment Motion, and (2) the Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants [Proposed] Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs Summary Judgment Motion. (vdr)
February 10, 2011 Filing 266 Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 263 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
February 8, 2011 Filing 263 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Proposed Order re Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Lewis, Alexa)
February 7, 2011 Filing 262 OBJECTION Opposition re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Material Facts and Issues of Law Including Foreign Law that Exist Without Substantial Controversy 226 (Defendants) EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS to Declaration of Dr. Mohamed-Hossam Loutfi in Support of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, That Exist Without Substantial Controversy filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Lewis, Alexa)
February 7, 2011 Filing 261 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Exclude Testimon of Defendants' "Expert" Ahmed Y. Zohny 256 filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Lewis, Alexa)
February 3, 2011 Filing 259 DECLARATION of Edward O. Lear In Support of Plaintiff's Objections to,and Motion to Exclude, Testimony of Defendants' Expert Ahmed Y. Zohny MOTION to Exclude Testimon of Defendants' "Expert" Ahmed Y. Zohny 256 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
February 3, 2011 Filing 258 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. correcting MOTION to Exclude Testimon of Defendants' "Expert" Ahmed Y. Zohny 256 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder ORDERING Exhibit C to Declaration of Edward O Lear (Under Seal) submitted by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy received on 2/1/2011 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (vdr)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder, ORDERING Exhibit C to Declaration of Edward O. Lear, etc. (Under Seal) submitted by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy received on 2/1/2011 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (gk)
February 1, 2011 Filing 265 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit C to Declaration of Edward O. Lear. (mat)
January 31, 2011 Filing 257 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy of Exhibit C to Declaration of Edward O. Lear in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' "Expert" Ahmed Y. Zohny. (Lear, Edward)
January 31, 2011 Filing 256 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Testimon of Defendants' "Expert" Ahmed Y. Zohny filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. Motion set for hearing on 2/28/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Edward O. Lear in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' "Expert" Ahmed Y. Zohny, # 3 Exhibit to Declaration of Edward O. Lear in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' "Expert" Ahmed Y. Zohny, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
January 18, 2011 Filing 255 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit 1 to Declaration for Edward O. Lear in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion Foran Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, that Exist without Substantial Controversy. (mat)
January 18, 2011 Filing 254 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Material Facts and Issues of Law Including Foreign Law that Exist Without Substantial Controversy 226 To Defendant's Statement of Genuine Issues filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Inadvertent Omission, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
January 17, 2011 Filing 253 Objection To Defendants' Evidentiary Objections re: APPLICATION to Seal 244 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
January 17, 2011 Filing 252 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy of Exhibits 3-5 to Notice of Lodging of Non-Paper Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Reply. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
January 17, 2011 Filing 251 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy of Exhibits 1 to Declaration of Edward O. Lear in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law that Exist without Substantial Controversy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
January 17, 2011 Filing 250 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Non-Paper Exhibits re Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) 249 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
January 17, 2011 Filing 249 REPLY MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, Exist Without Substantial Controversy 227 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Lear with Exhibits, # 2 Declaration of Dr. Mohamed-Hossam Loutfi with Exhibits, # 3 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Defendants' Application to File Under Seal: (1) Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Osama Fahmy for an Order that Material Facts and issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, Exist Without Substantial Controversy (the "Lewis Declaration"), and (2) Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Ahmed Y. Zohny, Ph.D., L.L.B., L.L.M. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Osama Fahmy for an Order that Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, Exist Without Substantial Controversy (the "Zohny Declaration") 244 is GRANTED. Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Lewis Declaration, and Exhibit 1 to the Zohny Declaration, shall be filed under seal. (gk)
December 14, 2010 Filing 247 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits 1 and 2 to Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff OSAMA Fahmy for an Order that Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, Exist without Substantial Controversy.(mat)
December 14, 2010 Filing 246 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ahmed Y. Zohny, PH.D., LLB., LLM. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff OSAMA Fhamy for an Order that Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, Exist without Substantial Controversy.(mat)
December 13, 2010 Filing 245 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants, re Application to File Under Seal 244 , Exhibits, Proposed Order, served on 12/13/2010. (gk)
December 13, 2010 Filing 244 APPLICATION to File Under Seal filed by defendants. (kpa)
December 13, 2010 Filing 243 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendants re Statement of Genuine Issues in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, That Exist Without Substantial Controversy re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 242 (Attachments: # 1 Defendants Statement of Genuine Issues in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, That Exist Without Substantial Controversy)(Lewis, Alexa)
December 13, 2010 Filing 242 OPPOSITION in Opposition re: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, Exist Without Substantial Controversy 227 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Material Facts and Issues of Law Including Foreign Law that Exist Without Substantial Controversy 226 filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Fahmy for an Order That Material Facts and Issues, etc., # 2 Declaration Declaration of Ahmed Y. Zohny, Ph.D., L.L.B., L.L.M. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Fahmy for an Order That Material Facts and Issues, etc., # 3 Evidentiary Objections to Lear, Fahmy and Loutfi Declarations, etc.)(Lewis, Alexa)
December 13, 2010 Filing 241 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc of (1) Application to File Under Seal; (2) [Proposed] Order Granting Application to File Under Seal; (3) Proof of Service. (Lewis, Alexa)
December 13, 2010 Filing 240 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc of Exhibits 1 and 2 to Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Opposition to Motion by Fahmy for an Order re Material Facts, etc., and Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ahmed Y. Zohny, Ph.D., L.L.B., L.L.M. in Support of Opposition to Motion by Fahmy for an Order re Material Facts, etc.. (Lewis, Alexa)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER RE SCHEDULE IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER SPECIFYING MATERIAL FACTS AND ISSUES OF LAW, INCLUDING FOREIGN LAW, THAT EXIST WITHOUT SUBSTANTIAL CONTROVERSY by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Defendants' Ex Parte Application 233 , the Court Orders the following schedule in connection with Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, That Exist Without Substantial Controversy 227 : (1) The deposition of Plaintiff's expert, Mohamed-Hossam Loutfi, shall take place on or before 11/12/2010; (2) Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's Motion is due on or before 12/13/2010; (3) The deposition of Defendants' expert shall take place on or before 12/21/2010; (4) Plaintiff's reply in support of Plaintiff's Motion is due on or before 1/17/2011; (5) The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion shall occur on 2/28/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk)
October 25, 2010 Filing 238 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Incto Order on Ex Parte Application for Order, Status Conference,,,, 237 Joint Response (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re: Schedule in Connection with Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Specifying Matieral Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, That Exist without Substantial Controversy)(Lewis, Alexa)
October 14, 2010 Filing 237 MINUTES: Proceedings: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATIONFILED 10/07/10 before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Hearing held. The Court confers with counsel regarding the Ex Parte Application The Court grants in part and denies in part, defendants' Ex Parte Application 233 (see attached Minute Order for further information). Counsel are ordered to meet and confer, and submit a proposed order thereafter, in compliance with this Court's order. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (jp)
October 12, 2010 Filing 236 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court is in receipt of defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order Re: Expert Depositions and that the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment Be Rescheduled filed 10/8/2010 233 , plaintiff's Opposition and defendants' Reply thereto filed 10/11/2010. The Court sets a Status Conference on 10/14/2010 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. No telephonic appearances will be permitted. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
October 11, 2010 Filing 235 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for re Expert Depositions and that the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be Rescheduled 233 filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Lewis, Alexa)
October 11, 2010 Filing 234 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for re Expert Depositions and that the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be Rescheduled 233 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
October 7, 2010 Filing 233 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for re Expert Depositions and that the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be Rescheduled filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order re Expert Depositions and that the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be Rescheduled, # 2 Proposed Order re Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order re Expert Depositions and that the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be Rescheduled)(Lewis, Alexa)
September 27, 2010 Filing 232 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Defendant's Ex Parte Application Seeking a Briefing Schedule In Connection with Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, That Exist Without Substantial Controversy (filed 9/21/10) 229 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court hereby sets the following briefing schedule with regard to the Motion For An Order Specifying Material Facts And Issues Of Law: Defendants opposition shall be filed on or before 10/25/2010. Plaintiff's reply will be filed on or before 11/11/2010. A hearing on the motion will take place on 12/13/2010 at 10:00 AM. With regard to defendants' request that discovery be stayed pending the 12/13/2010 hearing of the Motion, the Court finds and concludes as follows: Pending the 12/13/2010 hearing of the Motion, each side shall be allowed to take the deposition of any expert offered by the opposing side on the question of applicable foreign law. However, all other discovery will be stayed until after the hearing of the Motion. (jp)
September 23, 2010 Filing 231 REPLY Reply EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for A Briefing Schedule in Connection with Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, that Exist Without Substantial Controversy 229 filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application Seeking a Briefing Schedule in Connection with Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, that Exist Without Substantial Controversy)(Lewis, Alexa)
September 23, 2010 Filing 230 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Briefing Schedule Re Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, That Exist Without Substantial Controversy; Declaration of Edward O. Lear; Declaration of Rizza Gonzales in opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for A Briefing Schedule in Connection with Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, that Exist Without Substantial Controversy 229 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
September 21, 2010 Filing 229 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for A Briefing Schedule in Connection with Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, that Exist Without Substantial Controversy filed by Defendants Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Rob Bourdon, Chesterchaz Publishing, Brad Delson, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Jay-Z, Kenji Kobayashi Music, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Timothy Mosely, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Mike Shinoda, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application Seeking a Briefing Schedule in Connection with Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, that Exist Without Substantial Controversy, # 2 Proposed Order in Support of Ex Parte Application)(Lewis, Alexa)
September 21, 2010 Filing 228 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Order Specifying Material Facts and Issues of Law Including Foreign Law that Exist Without Substantial Controversy filed 9/17/2010 226 . The following error(s) was found: Filer utilized the Motion - Summary Judgment (Partial) event in docketing this filing, and set the matter for hearing on 10/18/2010 at 10:00 AM. The Notice of Motion and Motion was actually filed as document number 227. Clerk has removed this Memorandum from the calendar so that the judge's 10/18/2010 calendar will not have a duplicative entry. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
September 20, 2010 Filing 227 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Material Facts and Issues of Law, Including Foreign Law, Exist Without Substantial Controversy filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
September 17, 2010 Filing 226 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Material Facts and Issues of Law Including Foreign Law that Exist Without Substantial Controversy filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, # 2 Declaration of Edward O. Lear, # 3 Declaration of Osama Fahmy, # 4 Declaration Dr. Loufti, # 5 Supplement Declaration ofDr. Loufti, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
February 8, 2010 Filing 225 MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference on Issues of Title and Phase 1 of Trial and Setting of the Remaining Case Management Dates held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court and counsel discuss scheduling issues as stated on the record. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
January 7, 2010 Filing 224 Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modification of Scheduling Order to Allow for Resumed Mediation After Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication, etc. 221 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward O. Lear, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER TO ALLOW FOR RESUMED MEDIATION AFTER MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF LACHES AND STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon the parties' Stipulation re Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Modification of Scheduling Order to Allow for Resumed Mediation after Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication on Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Statute of Limitations 222 , it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Modification of Scheduling Order to Allow for Resumed Mediation after Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication on Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Statute of Limitations 221 is to be filed with the court on 1/7/2010. (gk)
January 6, 2010 Filing 222 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte from 01-06-2010 to 01-07-2010 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
January 4, 2010 Filing 221 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modification of Scheduling Order to Allow for Resumed Mediation After Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication, etc. filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Modification of Scheduling Order, etc., # 2 Proposed Order re: Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Modification of Scheduling Order, etc.)(Lewis, Alexa)
November 19, 2009 Filing 220 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: No agreement is reached at this time. Counsel are to contact the court clerk to schedule a further settlement coference following ruling on intended summary judgment and/or summary adjudicaiton motions concerning statute of limitations and laches defenses. (dt)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER RE MEDIATION AND RELATED CONTINUANCE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Judge Christina A. Snyder 218 . It is hereby ORDERED that the case schedule is modified as follows: 1. The parties shall conduct a mediation with Judge Woehrle by no later than 11/19/2009. 2. Discovery cut-off shall be continued to 12/2/2009. 3. Pretrial conference shall be continued to 2/8/2010 at 11:00 am. (kpa)
October 21, 2009 Filing 218 STIPULATION for Order RE MEDIATION AND RELATED CONTINUANCE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULE filed by certain defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order RE MEDIATION AND RELATED CONTINUANCE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULE)(Lewis, Alexa)
October 14, 2009 Filing 217 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle: IT IS ORDERED that a settlement conference shall be held in the chambers of Judge Woehrle on November 19, 2009 at 3:00 p.m., Room 640, 6th Floor of the Roybal Courthouse, 255 E. Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA. The parties shall submit settlement conference statements directly to Judge Woehrle's chambers not later than 3 court days before the conference. (See document for further details.) (pcl)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER RE MEDIATION AND RELATED CONTINUANCE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 215 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case schedule is modified as follows: The parties shall conduct a mediation with Judge Woehrle by no later than 11/5/2009. Discovery cut-off shall be continued to 11/18/2009. Final Pretrial Conference shall be continued to 12/21/2009 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk)
September 22, 2009 Filing 215 STIPULATION for Order Mediation and Related Continuance of Pretrial Schedule filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Mediation and Related Continuance of Pretrial Schedule)(Lewis, Alexa)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR ORDER EXTENDING DATES FOR DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY SIXTY DAYS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 213 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case schedule is modified as follows: Discovery cut-off 9/29/2009. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/19/2009 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk)
July 22, 2009 Filing 213 STIPULATION for Order Extending Dates for Discovery Cutoff and Pretrial Conference by Sixty Days filed by Certain Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re: Stipulation for Order Extending Dates for Discovery Cutoff and Pretrial Conference by Sixty Days)(Lewis, Alexa)
June 22, 2009 Filing 212 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court DENIES Ahab Joseph Nafal's Motion to Intervene 196 . Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) by Judge Christina A. Snyder granting 102 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Without Prejudice. (pp)
June 18, 2009 Filing 210 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 102 and RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM CONCERNING MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (Briggs, William)
June 16, 2009 Filing 209 SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Edward O. Lear in Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum Concerning the Court's Pending Decision on EMI Music Publishing's Motion to Dismiss. (mat)
June 15, 2009 Filing 208 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy of Declaration of Edward O. Lear In Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum Concerning the Court's Pending Decision on EMI Music Publishing's Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
June 15, 2009 Filing 207 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 102 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
May 26, 2009 Filing 206 REPLY MOTION to Intervene 196 Opposition filed by Movant Ahab Joseph Nafal. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Besser, Robert)
May 22, 2009 Filing 205 NOTICE Notice of Errata filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
May 18, 2009 Filing 204 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Intervene 196 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A-E, # 3 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
May 18, 2009 Filing 203 DECLARATION of Edward O. Lear In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Intervene MOTION to Intervene 196 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F-H)(Lear, Edward)
May 18, 2009 Filing 202 OPPOSITION In Opposition to re: MOTION to Intervene 196 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Lear, Edward)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON AHAB JOSEPH NAFAL'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Ex Parte Request for One-Week Continuance 200 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case schedule is modified as follows: The hearing on Ahab Joseph Nafal's Motion to Intervene 196 is continued to 6/22/2009 at 10:00 AM; the due date for any opposition is continued to 5/18/2009, and the due date for any reply in support of the motion is continued to 5/26/2009. (gk)
May 4, 2009 Filing 200 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Motio to Intervene from May 18, 2009 to May 26, 2009 Re: MOTION to Intervene 196 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
May 4, 2009 Filing 199 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Intervene 196 filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Lewis, Alexa)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY EMI MUSIC PUBLISHING LTD. by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh, (im)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh (rp)
April 16, 2009 Filing 196 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Ahab Joseph Nafal. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Complaint, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit)(Besser, Robert)
April 16, 2009 Filing 195 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Continue, 192 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY EMI MUSIC PUBLISHING LTD.)(Briggs, William)
April 15, 2009 Filing 194 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Proposed Order not submitted herewith RE: Stipulation to Continue Deadline for Production of Documents by EMI Music Publishing Ltd. filed 4/10/2009 192 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (gk)
April 15, 2009 Filing 193 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Protective Order (Exhibit 1 to Stipulation))(Lewis, Alexa)
April 10, 2009 Filing 192 STIPULATION to Continue DEADLINE FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS from April 21, 2009 to April 27, 2009 Re: Order on Motion for Relief, Order on Motion for Review of Discovery Matter, Motion Hearing,,,,,, 191 filed by DEFENDANT EMI Music Publishing Ltd.(Briggs, William)
April 6, 2009 Filing 191 MINUTES Motion Hearing re Defendant EMI's Motion for Relief from Magistrate Judge's Order and Request for Immediate Stay (filed 2/12/2009; and Plaintiff's Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge's Order (filed 2/17/2009) held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES EMI's Motion for Relief from Magistrate Judge's order and request for immediate stay, except to the extent enumerated in Part III.A herein 166 . Plaintiffs are ordered to produce the documents enumerated in Part III.A on or before 4/21/2009. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Review Magistrate Judge's order 167 without prejudice. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (jp)
April 6, 2009 Filing 190 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court, on its own motion, hereby CONTINUES pre-trial as follows: Discovery cut-off 7/31/2009; Pretrial Conference on 8/10/2009 at 11:00 AM. The Court also CONTINUES Defendant EMI Music Publishing's MOTION to Dismiss for 102 from 4/20/2009 to 6/22/2009 at 10:00 AM. (jp)
March 24, 2009 Filing 188 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO INTERVENE re MOTION to Intervene 179 filed by Movant Ahab Joseph Nafal. (Besser, Robert)
March 24, 2009 Filing 187 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw filed by Intervenor Ahab Joseph Nafal. Motion set for hearing on 4/13/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Besser, Robert)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER upon stipulation 186 The hearings on Defendant EMI Music Publishing, Ltds Motion for Review, filed February 12, 2009 166 , and Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmys Motion for Review, filed February 17, 2009 167 , currently set for hearing on March 23, 2009, is continued to April 6, 2009 at 10:00 a.m.; Any supplemental opposition to Defendants motion to dismiss shall be filed and served on or before April 6, 2009; Any supplemental reply in support of Defendants motion to dismiss shall be due on or before April 13, 2009 at 10:00 a.m.; The hearing on Defendant EMI Music Publishing, Ltds Motion toDismiss, filed October 20, 2008 102 , currently set for hearing on March 30,2009, is continued to April 20, 2009 by Judge Christina A Snyder.by Judge Christina A. Snyder, (lc)
March 20, 2009 Filing 186 STIPULATION to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for and Defendant's Motion for Review from March 23, 2009 to April 6, 2009 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service, # 2 Proposed Order To Continue Hearing on Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy's Motion for Review and Defendant EMI Music Publishing LTD's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Review)(Lear, Edward)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder Granting REQUEST of Defendant EMI Blackwood Music Inc to Substitute attorney Russell J. Frackman of Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP in place of attorneys Felix Woo, Christine Lepera and Anais Violet Wallach of Sonnenschein, Nath & Rosenthal LLP 180 . (mg)
March 16, 2009 Filing 184 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court is in receipt of the Stipulation 178 to Continue hearing on Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd.'s MOTION for Relief from Magistrate's Order and Objections Thereon and Request for Immediate Stay of Magistrate's Order with Respect to Production of Documents 166 and Plaintiff's MOTION for Review of Magistrate's February 5, 2009 Order 167 , Motions continued to 3/23/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (mg)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder, ORDERING Notice of Motion to Intervene, Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Besser and Nafal; Proposed Order Granting; Proposed Complaint in Intervention submitted by Movant Ahab Joseph ("Julian") Nafal received on 3/9/2009 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (gk)
March 16, 2009 Filing 180 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Russell J. Frackman in place of attorney Felix Woo filed by Defendant EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Lewis, Alexa)
March 13, 2009 Filing 178 STIPULATION to Continue TWO MOTIONS FOR RELIEF from MARCH 16, 2009 to MARCH 23, 2009 Re: MOTION for Review of Magistrate's February 5, 2009 Order re Remark - Document Deletion, 167 , Objections - non-motion 165 , MOTION for Relief from MAGISTRATE'S ORDER re In Chambers Conference,,,,, 164 OBJECTIONS THEREON AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE STAY OF MAGISTRATE'S ORDER WITH RESPECT TO PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF HENRY L. SELF III; PROPOSED MOTION for Relief from MAGISTRATE'S ORDER re In Chambers Conference,,,,, 164 OBJECTIONS THEREON AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE STAY OF MAGISTRATE'S ORDER WITH RESPECT TO PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF HENRY L. SELF III; PROPOSED 166 filed by DEFENDANT EMI Music Publishing Ltd.(Briggs, William)
March 11, 2009 Filing 177 REPLY MOTION for Relief from MAGISTRATE'S ORDER re In Chambers Conference,,,,, 164 OBJECTIONS THEREON AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE STAY OF MAGISTRATE'S ORDER WITH RESPECT TO PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF HENRY L. SELF III; PROPOSED MOTION for Relief from MAGISTRATE'S ORDER re In Chambers Conference,,,,, 164 OBJECTIONS THEREON AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE STAY OF MAGISTRATE'S ORDER WITH RESPECT TO PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF HENRY L. SELF III; PROPOSED 166 filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (Self, Henry)
March 9, 2009 Filing 183 DECLARATION of Ahab Joseph Nafal in Support of Motion to Intervene 179 filed by Proposed Intervenor Ahab Joseph ("Julian") Nafal. (gk)
March 9, 2009 Filing 182 DECLARATION of Robert S. Besser in Support of Motion to Intervene 179 filed by Movant Ahab Joseph ("Julian") Nafal. (gk)
March 9, 2009 Filing 179 NOTICE AND MOTION to Intervene; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Proposed Intervenor Ahab Joseph Nafal. Motion set for hearing on 4/13/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Lodged Proposed Order, Complaint in Intervention. (gk)
March 9, 2009 Filing 176 REPLY In Support of a motion MOTION for Review of Magistrate's February 5, 2009 Order re Remark - Document Deletion, 167 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
February 26, 2009 Filing 175 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: On the Court's own motion, the Court continues the hearing on Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd.'s Motion for Relief From Magistrate's Order and Objections Thereon and Request for Immediate Stay of Magistrate's Order with Respect to Production of Documents 166 to 3/16/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder, to be heard simultaneously with Plaintiff's Motion for Review of Magistrate's 2/5/2009, Order and Objection Thereon 167 . Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
February 23, 2009 Filing 174 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EMI MUSIC PUBLISHING LTD.'S MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE'S FEBRUARY 5, 2009, ORDER AND OBJECTION THEREON IN OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Relief from MAGISTRATE'S ORDER re In Chambers Conference,,,,, 164 OBJECTIONS THEREON AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE STAY OF MAGISTRATE'S ORDER WITH RESPECT TO PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF HENRY L. SELF III; PROPOSED MOTION for Relief from MAGISTRATE'S ORDER re In Chambers Conference,,,,, 164 OBJECTIONS THEREON AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE STAY OF MAGISTRATE'S ORDER WITH RESPECT TO PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF HENRY L. SELF III; PROPOSED 166 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Service)(Lear, Edward)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT EMI MUSIC PUBLISHING, LTD'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon the parties' Stipulation 170 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case schedule is modified as follows: the hearing on Defendant EMI Music Publishing, Ltd's Motion to Dismiss 102 is continued to 3/30/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk)
February 19, 2009 Filing 172 REPLY MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 102 FURTHER REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. BRIGGS II filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (Self, Henry)
February 19, 2009 Filing 171 proof of service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Stipulation to Continue, 170 served on 02-19-09. (Lear, Edward)
February 19, 2009 Filing 170 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendant Emi Music Publishing, LTD's Motion to Dismiss from February 23, 2009 to March 25, 2009 Re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 102 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lear, Edward)
February 19, 2009 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Review of Magistrate's February 5, 2009 Order re Remark - Document Deletion, 167 filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (Briggs, William)
February 17, 2009 Filing 168 Proof of Service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re MOTION for Review of Magistrate's February 5, 2009 Order re Remark - Document Deletion, 167 served on 02-17-09. (Lear, Edward)
February 17, 2009 Filing 167 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Magistrate's February 5, 2009 Order re Remark - Document Deletion, filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. Motion set for hearing on 3/16/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Lear, Edward)
February 12, 2009 Filing 166 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from MAGISTRATE'S ORDER re In Chambers Conference,,,,, 164 OBJECTIONS THEREON AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE STAY OF MAGISTRATE'S ORDER WITH RESPECT TO PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF HENRY L. SELF III; PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Self, Henry)
February 11, 2009 Filing 165 OBJECTIONS to In Chambers Conference,,,,, 164 REQUEST FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE RULING; DECLARATION OF HENRY L. SELF III filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (Self, Henry)
February 5, 2009 DOCUMENT number 164, In Chambers Minutes by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: Denying Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. motion for a protective order seeking to avoid production of documents requested by Plaintiff on December 11, 2008. Reason: Incomplete service (no silver ball). Clerk shall redocket the minute order. (nhac)
February 4, 2009 Filing 164 MINUTES OF In Chambers Conference held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: On January 6, 2009, Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. filed a motion for a protective order seeking to avoid production of documents requested by Plaintiff on December 11, 2008. (See Docket No. 144.) Defendants motion is DENIED. While Defendants counsel states that he met with Plaintiffs counsel on December 17, 2008, he failed to file a joint stipulation as required under the Local Rules. See L.R. 37-2.4 (stating that the Court will not consider any discovery motion in the absence of a joint stipulation or a declaration from counsel for the moving party establishing opposing counsels lack of cooperation in preparing and filing a joint stipulation). As such, Defendant is ordered to turn over the requested documents to Plaintiff by February 16, 2009.On January 13, 2009, Plaintiff filed a motion to compel a second deposition of Stephen Hills, an employee of Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (See Docket No. 153.) Plaintiffs motion is DENIED. Plaintiff has made no effort whatsoever to comply with the meet and confer requirements under the Local Rules. See L.R. 37-1 (requiring that prior to the filing of any motion relating to discovery..., counsel for the parties shall confer in a good faith effort to eliminate the necessity for hearing the motion or to eliminate as many of the disputes as possible.). (im)
January 29, 2009 Filing 163 Proof of Service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Reply (Motion related) 162 served on 01-29-09. (Lear, Edward)
January 29, 2009 Filing 162 REPLY In Support MOTION to Compel Deposition of Stephen Hills 153 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Lear, Edward)
January 23, 2009 Filing 161 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: Defendants inform the Court that they are in receipt of the requested documents from Plaintiff and are still reviewing them.Court Smart: 1/23/09. (im)
January 22, 2009 Filing 160 REPLY in support of MOTION for Protective Order for Production of Documents MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. BRIGGS, II MOTION for Protective Order for Production of Documents MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. BRIGGS, II 144 filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (Briggs, William)
January 22, 2009 Filing 159 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Deposition of Stephen Hills 153 and Responses and Further Responses re Depo of Stephen Hills filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (Briggs, William)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR ORDER EXTENDING DATES FOR DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY SIXTY DAYS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation for Order Extending Days for Discovery Cutoff and Pretrial Conference By Sixty Days 157 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case schedule is modified as follows: Discovery cut-off 3/31/2009 Final Pretrial Conference reset for 5/11/2009 12:00 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk)
January 16, 2009 Filing 157 STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to March 31, 2009 filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Stipulation for Order Extending Dates for Discovery Cutoff and Pretrial Conference by Sixty Days, # 2 Proposed Order re: Stipulation for Order Extending Dates for Discovery Cutoff and Pretrial Conference by Sixty Days)(Lewis, Alexa)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ROC-A-FELLA RECORDS LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; AND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (im)
January 13, 2009 Filing 155 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 151 served on 01-13-09. (Lear, Edward)
January 13, 2009 Filing 154 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re MOTION to Compel Deposition of Stephen Hills 153 served on 01-13-09. (Lear, Edward)
January 13, 2009 Filing 153 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Stephen Hills filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. Motion set for hearing on 2/5/2009 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Lear, Edward)
January 13, 2009 Filing 152 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 151 served on 01-13-09. (Lear, Edward)
January 13, 2009 Filing 151 Opposition in Opposition re: MOTION for Protective Order for Production of Documents MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. BRIGGS, II MOTION for Protective Order for Production of Documents MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. BRIGGS, II 144 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Lear, Edward)
January 13, 2009 Filing 150 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: TIME OF MOTION HEARING INCORRECT RE: MOTION to Compel Deposition of Stephen Hills 146 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (esa)
January 12, 2009 Filing 149 OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Compel Deposition of Stephen Hills 146 PRELIMINARY OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND FURTHER RESPONSES REGARDING DEPOSITION OF STEPHEN HILLS filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (Briggs, William)
January 9, 2009 Filing 148 Proof of Service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re MOTION to Compel Deposition of Stephen Hills 146 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 147 served on 01-09-09. (Lear, Edward)
January 9, 2009 Filing 147 DECLARATION of Edward O. Lear In Support MOTION to Compel Deposition of Stephen Hills 146 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Declaration of Edward Lear In Support of Motion to Compel Responses Regarding Deposition of Stephen Hills)(Lear, Edward)
January 9, 2009 Filing 146 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Deposition of Stephen Hills filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. Motion set for hearing on 2/5/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Lear, Edward)
January 8, 2009 Filing 145 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy MOTION to Produce All Documents Responsive to Roc-A-Fellas First Set of Requests for Production of Documents 128 filed by Defendant Roc-A-Fella Records LLC. (Lewis, Alexa)
January 6, 2009 Filing 144 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Production of Documents MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. BRIGGS, II filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 1/29/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Self, Henry)
January 5, 2009 Filing 143 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production and Requests for Admission MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy 142 filed by Defendants MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC. (Lewis, Alexa)
January 5, 2009 Filing 142 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Responses to Request for Production and Requests for Admission ( Motion set for hearing on 1/29/2009 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh.), MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy filed by Defendants MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production, Interrogatories and Requests for Admission, # 2 Proposed Order re: Defendants' Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production, Interrogatories and Requests for Admission)(Lewis, Alexa)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Continuing Hearing on Defendant Roc-A-Fella Records LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories from 1/8/2009 to 1/15/2009 at 11:00 a.m. by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh, (im)
January 2, 2009 Filing 139 Proof of Service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 138 served on 01-02-09. (Lear, Edward)
January 2, 2009 Filing 138 Opposition In Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy MOTION to Produce All Documents Responsive to Roc-A-Fellas First Set of Requests for Production of Documents 128 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Lear, Edward)
December 31, 2008 Filing 141 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. This motion was noticed for hearing before the Honorable Christina A. Snyder. Judge Snyder has a blanket referral of all discovery matters to be handled by the Magistrate Judge to whom the case is assigned. Therefore, this motion should have been noticed for hearing before Magistrate Patrick J. Walsh. The motion is stricken and shall properly be refiled RE: Notice of Motion for Protective Order filed 12/17/2008 127 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (gk)
December 31, 2008 Filing 137 Proof of Service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 135 served on 12-31-08. (Lear, Edward)
December 31, 2008 Filing 135 DECLARATION of Edward O. Lear in support EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd's Motion to DIsmiss from 01-05-2009 Re: Supplement(Motion related) 129 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd's Motion to DIsmiss from 01-05-2009 Re: Supplement(Motion related) 129 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing Ex Parte, re Supplement(Motion related) 129 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing Ex Parte, re Supplement(Motion related) 129 , 130 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Lear, Edward)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION 129 to Continue Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd's Motion to DIsmiss. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses of Stephen Hills, which Motion is to be filed no later than 01/09/2009. The Motion to Dismiss 102 is continued from 01/05/2009 to 02/23/2009 at 10:00 a.m. (cj)
December 30, 2008 Filing 134 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendant Roc-A-Fella Records LLCs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories from January 8, 2009 to January 15, 2009 Re: MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy MOTION to Produce All Documents Responsive to Roc-A-Fellas First Set of Requests for Production of Documents 128 filed by Defendant Roc-A-Fella Records LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Continuing Hearing on Defendant Roc-A-Fella Records LLCs Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories)(Lewis, Alexa)
December 30, 2008 Filing 133 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd's Motion to DIsmiss from 01-05-2009 Re: Supplement(Motion related) 129 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd's Motion to DIsmiss from 01-05-2009 Re: Supplement(Motion related) 129 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing Ex Parte, re Supplement(Motion related) 129 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing Ex Parte, re Supplement(Motion related) 129 , 130 filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (Briggs, William)
December 29, 2008 Filing 132 Proof of Service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd's Motion to DIsmiss from 01-05-2009 Re: Supplement(Motion related) 129 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd's Motion to DIsmiss from 01-05-2009 Re: Supplement(Motion related) 129 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing Ex Parte, re Supplement(Motion related) 129 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing Ex Parte, re Supplement(Motion related) 129 , 130 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 131 served on 12-29-08. (Lear, Edward)
December 29, 2008 Filing 131 OPPOSITION In Opposition re: MOTION for Protective Order for deposition notice 127 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Lear, Edward)
December 29, 2008 Filing 130 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd's Motion to DIsmiss from 01-05-2009 Re: Supplement(Motion related) 129 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Hearing Ex Parte, re Supplement(Motion related) 129 , filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy.(Lear, Edward)
December 23, 2008 Filing 129 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 102 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. BRIGGS II filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (Briggs, William)
December 18, 2008 Filing 128 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, MOTION to Produce All Documents Responsive to Roc-A-Fellas First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. Motion set for hearing on 1/8/2009 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendant Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC's Motion to Compel Produciton of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories and in Compliance with Local Rule 37-2.4, # 2 Proposed Order re: Defendant Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories)(Lewis, Alexa)
December 17, 2008 Filing 127 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for deposition notice filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 1/12/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Briggs, William)
November 21, 2008 Filing 126 Proof of Service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (20 days), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (20 days) 125 served on 11-20-08. (Lear, Edward)
November 21, 2008 Filing 125 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, upon EMI Music Publishing Ltd served on 9/18/2008, answer due 10/8/2008. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal Service service, by FRCP 4(f)(1) statute, upon Pierre Songo Brown Agent. Due Dilligence declaration attached. Original Summons not returned. (Lear, Edward)
October 29, 2008 Filing 124 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Christina A. Snyder re: MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 102 . Court continues the hearing on this matter for sixty (60) days, to 1/5/2009 at 10:00 am, and orders EMI to produce for deposition the individual at EMI most knowledgeable about licensing rights that EMI has regarding "Khosara, Khosara." (See document for details) (kpa)
October 29, 2008 Filing 123 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney David H Stern counsel for Defendants EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Timbaland Productions Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely. David H. Stern will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants JAY-Z (a/k/a Shawn Carter), Timothy Mosley, Timbaland Productions Inc., and EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (Stern, David)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Russell J. Frackman in place of Sonnenschein Nath & Rosenthal LLP 114 for Defendant Jay-Z. Terminated attorneys Felix T Woo; Christine Lepera; and Anais Violet Wallach. (mg)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder GRANTING REQUEST to Substitute attorney Russell J. Frackman in place of Sonnenschein Nath & Rosenthal LLP 115 for Defendant Timothy Mosely. Terminated attorneys Felix T Woo; Christine Lepera; and Anais Violet Wallach. (mg)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder GRANTING REQUEST to Substitute attorney Russell J. Frackman in place of Sonnenschein Nath & Rosenthal LLP 116 for Timbaland Productions Inc. Attorneys Anais Violet Wallach; Felix T Woo; Christine Lepera; and David H Stern terminated. (mg)
October 27, 2008 Filing 118 REPLY support MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 102 filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (Briggs, William)
October 24, 2008 Filing 119 SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibit A to Declaration OD Edward O. Lear in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (mat)
October 24, 2008 Filing 117 Declaration on Service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 103 served on 10-20-08. (Lear, Edward)
October 24, 2008 Filing 116 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Russell J. Frackman in place of attorney Felix Woo filed by defendant Timbaland Productions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Substitution of Attorney)(Woo, Felix)
October 24, 2008 Filing 115 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Russell J. Frackman in place of attorney Felix Woo filed by defendant Timothy Mosely. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Substitution of Attorney)(Woo, Felix)
October 24, 2008 Filing 114 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Russell J. Frackman in place of attorney Felix Woo filed by defendant Jay-Z. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Substitution of Attorney)(Woo, Felix)
October 24, 2008 Filing 113 Declaration of Service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 112 served on Amended Notice of Manual Filing. (Lear, Edward)
October 24, 2008 Filing 112 Amended NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy of Exhibit A. (Lear, Edward)
October 22, 2008 Filing 111 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Title Page is Missing RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 106 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (rmo)
October 22, 2008 Filing 110 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Miscellaneous Document event utilized in docketing this filing. See document number 105 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (rmo)
October 22, 2008 Filing 109 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Title Page is Missing RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 104 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (rmo)
October 21, 2008 Filing 108 Declaration of Service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Response in Opposition to Motion 107 served on 10-21-08. (Lear, Edward)
October 21, 2008 Filing 107 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 102 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Lear, Edward)
October 20, 2008 Filing 106 Proof of service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Miscellaneous Document 105 served on 10-20-08. (Lear, Edward)
October 20, 2008 Filing 105 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy re: Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 103 (Lear, Edward)
October 20, 2008 Filing 104 Proof of Service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 103 served on 10-20-08. (Lear, Edward)
October 20, 2008 Filing 103 DECLARATION of Edward O. Lear In support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 102 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibt C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Lear, Edward)
October 9, 2008 Filing 102 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DEFENDANT EMI Music Publishing Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 11/3/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF ANTHONY BEBAWI)(Briggs, William)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder re: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS AND DISMISS (filed 8/18/08) 94 . The Court finds this motion appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing date of September 8, 2008, is hereby vacated, and the matter is hereby taken under submission. The Court DENIES defendants motion to dismiss. The Court GRANTS plaintiffs request for 90 days in which to properly file service of process on defendant. (pso)
August 29, 2008 Filing 100 REPLY filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. (Briggs, William)
August 27, 2008 Filing 99 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Declaration (non-motion) 98 , Response in Opposition to Motion 96 served on 08-27-08. (Lear, Edward)
August 27, 2008 Filing 98 DECLARATION of Edward O. Lear re Response in Opposition to Motion 96 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Lear, Edward)
August 27, 2008 Filing 97 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 94 Response to Motion to Quash Service and Request for Extension Time to Serve Defendant EMI Music Publishing, LTD filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Lear, Edward)
August 27, 2008 Filing 96 OPPOSITION Response to Motion to Quash Service and Request for Extension of time to serve Defendant Emi Music Publishing, LTD filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Lear, Edward)
August 18, 2008 Filing 95 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd, (Self, Henry)
August 18, 2008 Filing 94 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant EMI Music Publishing Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 9/8/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Antony Bebawi, # 2 Declaration of Amy Shultz, # 3 Declaration of William Briggs)(Briggs, William)
August 6, 2008 Filing 93 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Declaration (non-motion) 92 served on 08-06-08. (Lear, Edward)
August 6, 2008 Filing 92 DECLARATION re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Order to Show Cause,,, 85 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Lear, Edward)
August 6, 2008 Filing 91 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) DISMISSAL BY COURT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES AND FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: A response to the Order to Show Cause 85 was to be filed and served no later than 8/2/2008. The Court is in receipt of the proof of service of summons and complaint on defendant EMI MUSIC Publishing, LTD filed 7/30/2008. As of today's date, no other responses have been received by this Court; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the action is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to defendants KYAMBO JOSHUA; LIL LULU PUBLISHING; MARCY PROJECTS PRODUCTIONS II, INC.; and RADICAL MEDIA, only, for plaintiff's failure to comply with the Local Rules, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and orders of this Court. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
August 6, 2008 Filing 90 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (20 days), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (20 days) 89 served on 08-06-08. (Lear, Edward)
August 6, 2008 Filing 89 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, upon EMI Music Publishing Ltd served on 9/28/2007, answer due 10/18/2007. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal Service service, by Federal statute, upon Cathy Kreiger. Due Dilligence declaration No. Original Summons not returned. (Lear, Edward)
August 4, 2008 Filing 88 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (20 day). Miscellaneous Document event utilized in docketing this filing RE: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint filed 7/30/2008 86 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (gk)
July 30, 2008 Filing 87 Declaration of Service OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Miscellaneous Document 86 served on 07-30-08. (Lear, Edward)
July 30, 2008 Filing 86 Proof of Service Summons and Complaint Emi Music Publishing filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy (Lear, Edward)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause in writing not later than 8/2/2008 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to defendants Kyambo Joshua, EMI Music Publishing, Ltd., Lil Lulu Publishing, Marcy Projects Productions II, Inc., and Radical Media, only. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7.15, oral argument shall not be heard in the above matter unless so ordered by the Court. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of briefs. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the following: (1) A proof of service of summons and complaint on defendants Kyambo Joshua, EMI Music Publishing, Ltd., Lil Lulu Publishing, Marcy Projects Productions II, Inc.; and Radical Media on or before the above date, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
May 19, 2008 Filing 84 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court confers with counsel and schedules the following dates: Request for leave to file amended pleadings or to add parties 9/5/2008. Factual Discovery cut-off 1/30/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2009 12:00 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. The pretrial conference shall be on the issues of title and Phase I of the trial and to reschedule the remaining dates. Counsel shall file a Pretrial Conference Order on the issues of title and Phase I of the trial one week prior to the 3/9/2009 hearing. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
May 5, 2008 Filing 83 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service on Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Report)(Lewis, Alexa)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2008 at 11:00 AM (see document for further details). (bm)
April 3, 2008 Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant EMI Blackwood Music Inc.(Stern, David)
April 3, 2008 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Timbaland Productions Inc.(Stern, David)
April 3, 2008 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Timothy Mosely.(Stern, David)
April 3, 2008 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Jay-Z.(Stern, David)
April 3, 2008 Filing 77 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 76 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 75 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 70 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 71 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 74 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 73 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) 72 served on April 3, 2008. (Lewis, Alexa)
April 3, 2008 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Rob Bourdon Music, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson.(Lewis, Alexa)
April 3, 2008 Filing 75 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant MTV Networks Enterprise Inc.(Lewis, Alexa)
April 3, 2008 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendants Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation.(Lewis, Alexa)
April 3, 2008 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Roc-A-Fella Records LLC.(Lewis, Alexa)
April 3, 2008 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant UMG Recordings Inc.(Lewis, Alexa)
April 3, 2008 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Warner Music Inc.(Lewis, Alexa)
April 3, 2008 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc.(Lewis, Alexa)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder DENYING MOTION to Dismiss Case 13 without prejudice. However, the Court GRANTS defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's fourth claim for relief pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). (cj)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07 and General Order 07-02. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Charles F. Eick to Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 07-5715 CAS (PJWx). (rn)
March 7, 2008 Filing 67 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing - MOTION TO DISMISS held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court adopts its tentative order. The Court will issue a final order forthwith.Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (mmu) Modified on 3/7/2008 (mmu, ).
February 27, 2008 Filing 59 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Preliminary or Alternative Relief at March 3, 2008 Hearing filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Plaintiff 's Exparte Application for Preliminary or Alternative Relief at March 3, 2008 Hearing 53 (Lewis, Alexa)
February 26, 2008 Filing 66 SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of ALEXA L. LEWIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss Case 13 filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Lil Lulu Publishing, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Marcy Projects Productions II Inc, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Radical Media, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Kyambo Joshua, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (lra) Modified on 3/28/2008 (lra, ).
February 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder, GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 64 (lra)
February 26, 2008 Filing 64 SEALED DOCUMENT-APPLICATION to Seal filed by DEFENDANTS Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (lra) Modified on 3/31/2008 (lra, ).
February 25, 2008 Filing 58 OBJECTIONS Support re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 13 re: Supplemental Lear Declaration filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Lewis, Alexa)
February 25, 2008 Filing 57 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Dismiss Case 13 filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing (Lewis Declaration)# 2 Proof of Service)(Lewis, Alexa)
February 25, 2008 Filing 56 Proof of Service OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Plaintiff 's Exparte Application for Preliminary or Alternative Relief at March 3, 2008 Hearing 53 served on 02-25-08. (Lear, Edward)
February 25, 2008 Filing 55 Plaintiff's Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Plaintiff 's Exparte Application for Preliminary or Alternative Relief at March 3, 2008 Hearing 53 (Lear, Edward)
February 25, 2008 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Edward O. Lear In Support of Plaintiff's supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Plaintiff 's Exparte Application for Preliminary or Alternative Relief at March 3, 2008 Hearing 53 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Lear, Edward)
February 25, 2008 Filing 53 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Plaintiff 's Exparte Application for Preliminary or Alternative Relief at March 3, 2008 Hearing filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy.(Lear, Edward)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder re: Declaration of Edward O Lear; Request for Judicial Notice: Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief and Declaration of Service. The documents are to be filed and processed. The filing date is ORDERED to be the date the documents were stamped "received but not file" with the Clerk. (mmu)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION for an Order Granting Leave to file Supplemental Brief Twenty Pages In Length In Response ToDefendants Motion To Dismiss 46 , 47 . Plaintiff may file a supplementalbrief no later than February 18, 2008 of no more than twenty (20) pages.Defendants may file a brief in response of no more than twenty (20) pages no later than February 25, 2008. (jp)
February 19, 2008 Filing 63 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed. (ad)
February 19, 2008 Filing 62 SEALED DOCUMENT - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss 13 filed. (ad)
February 19, 2008 Filing 61 SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Edward O Lear in support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss 13 filed. (ad)
February 19, 2008 Filing 60 SEALED DOCUMENT - Plaintiff's SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss 13 filed. (ad)
February 19, 2008 Filing 50 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief: Declaration in Support: Request for Judicial Notice. (Lear, Edward)
February 19, 2008 Filing 49 Amended EX PARTE APPLICATION to Amend re Response in Opposition to Motion,, 48 DECLARATION OF A. VIOLET WALLACH filed by DEFENDANTS Timothy Mosely. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Stern, David)
February 15, 2008 Filing 48 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Granting Leave to file Supplemental Brief 46 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Supplemental Brief 47 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Leave to file Supplemental Brief 44 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Brief 45 filed by Defendants EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Timbaland Productions Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Stern, David)
February 13, 2008 Filing 47 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy.(Lear, Edward)
February 13, 2008 Filing 46 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Granting Leave to file Supplemental Brief filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy.(Lear, Edward)
February 13, 2008 Filing 45 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Brief filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy.(Lear, Edward)
February 13, 2008 Filing 44 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Leave to file Supplemental Brief filed by plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy.(Lear, Edward)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder GRANTING continuance of hearing to March 3, 2008. (see document for details) 42 (mmo)
February 6, 2008 Filing 42 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date from February 11, 2008 to March 3, 2008 filed by DEFENDANTS Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, EMI Music Publishing Ltd, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Lil Lulu Publishing, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Marcy Projects Productions II Inc, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Radical Media, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, Osama Ahmed Fahmy, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Kyambo Joshua, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Stern, David)
January 29, 2008 Filing 41 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Requests - For Judicial Notice. For future reference, when docketing a request for judicial notice that pertains to a motion, please make the appropriate link to the motion, and do not set the request for a hearing date: RE Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte filed 1/16/2008 37 . (gk)
January 18, 2008 Filing 40 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder Re: Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order Clarifying this Court's December 10, 2007 Order, and for Entry of a Protective Order 33 . The Court concludes that the discovery requests are overly broad. Accordingly, the Court hereby GRANTS defendants' application for an order clarifying this Court's December 10, 2007 order. Defendants need not respond to all of plaintiff's requests. Instead, the Court directs defendants to produce all documents that were sealed in the case entitled Ahab Joseph ("Julian") Nafal v. Shawn Carter, et al., Case No. CV 05-2480 SVW (PJWx) (C.D. Cal. 2005) ("Nafal action"). The Court also directs defendants to produce all other documents which tend to show that EMI Music Arabia has a non-frivolous claim to copyright interests in the musical composition "Khosara, Khosara." The Court further GRANTS defendants' request for a protective order to the extent that it relates to documents produced under seal in the Nafal action. Thus, any document that was produced subject to a protective order in the Nafal action will be filed under seal in the instant action. The Court DENIES defendants request for a protective order to the extent that it relates to any other document. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
January 16, 2008 Filing 39 Declaration of Service OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Miscellaneous Document 38 , Miscellaneous Document 37 served on 01-16-08. (Lear, Edward)
January 16, 2008 Filing 38 Plaintiff's Appendix of Indispensable Party Discovery Request re: Response in Opposition to Motion 35 (Lear, Edward)
January 16, 2008 Filing 37 Request for Judicial re: Response in Opposition to Motion 35 (Lear, Edward)
January 15, 2008 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF Osama Ahmed Fahmy, re Response in Opposition to Motion 35 served on 01-15-08. (Lear, Edward)
January 15, 2008 Filing 35 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Clarifying this Court's December 10, 2007 Order, and for Entry of a Protective Order 33 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Lear, Edward)
January 11, 2008 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Clarifying this Court's December 10, 2007 Order, and for Entry of a Protective Order 33 served on January 11, 2008. (Lewis, Alexa)
January 11, 2008 Filing 33 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Clarifying this Court's December 10, 2007 Order, and for Entry of a Protective Order filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexa L. Lewis in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application# 2 Exhibit 1 to Lewis Declaration# 3 Exhibit 2 to Lewis Declaration# 4 Exhibit 3 to Lewis Declaration# 5 Exhibit 4 to Lewis Declaration# 6 Exhibit 5 to Lewis Declaration# 7 Exhibit 6 to Lewis Declaration# 8 Exhibit 7A Part 1 to Lewis Declaration# 9 Exhibit 7A Part 2 to Lewis Declaration# 10 Exhibit 7A Part 3 to Lewis Declaration# 11 Exhibit 7A Part 4 to Lewis Declaration# 12 Exhibit 7B Part 1 to Lewis Declaration# 13 Exhibit 7B Part 2 to Lewis Declaration# 14 Exhibit 7B Part 3 to Lewis Declaration# 15 Exhibit 7B Part 4 to Lewis Declaration# 16 Exhibit 7B Part 5 to Lewis Declaration# 17 Exhibit 7B Part 6 to Lewis Declaration# 18 Exhibit Part 7C Part 1 to Lewis Declaration# 19 Exhibit 7C Part 2 to Lewis Declaration# 20 Exhibit 7C Part 3 to Lewis Declaration# 21 Exhibit 7C Part 4 to Lewis Declaration# 22 Exhibit 7C Part 5 to Lewis Declaration# 23 Exhibit 7C Part 6 to Lewis Declaration# 24 Exhibit 8 to Lewis Declaration# 25 Exhibit 9 to Lewis Declaration# 26 Exhibit 10 to Lewis Declaration# 27 Exhibit 11 to Lewis Declaration# 28 Exhibit 12 to Lewis Declaration# 29 Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Order re: Ex Parte Application and [Proposed] Protective Order# 30 Proposed Order re: Defendants' Ex Parte Application# 31 Proposed Order re: Protective Order)(Lewis, Alexa)
December 10, 2007 Filing 32 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Tentative order is provided. The Court confers with counsel and counsel argue. The Court grants the parties 45 days within which to propound limited discovery. Any discovery disputes which arise out from the limited discovery, shall be handled by the Honorable Christina A. Snyder and should not be brought before Magistrate Judge Charles Eick. The Court continues the Motion to Dismiss 13 to 2/11/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
December 7, 2007 Filing 31 OPPOSITION to Evidentiary Objections and Motion to Strike re Motion to Dismiss 13 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (gk)
December 7, 2007 Filing 28 OBJECTIONS in Support of re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 13 re: Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File Opposition to Evidentiary Objections and Supplemental Declaration of K. Andrew Kent filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Lewis, Alexa)
December 6, 2007 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of K. Andrew Kent filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (gk)
December 6, 2007 Filing 29 REQUEST for Leave to to File Opposition to Evidentary Objections and Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (gk)
December 6, 2007 Filing 27 OBJECTIONS in Support of re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 13 re: Plaintiff's Supplement to Request to Judicial Notice filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Lewis, Alexa)
December 6, 2007 Filing 26 OBJECTIONS in Support of re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 13 re: Albright Declaration filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Lewis, Alexa)
December 3, 2007 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Gregory N. Albright in Support of Motion to Dismiss 13 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (gk)
December 3, 2007 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENT to REQUEST for Judicial Notice in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss 21 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (shb)
December 3, 2007 Filing 23 OBJECTIONS Declarations of Edward Lear, Andrew Kent, and Mohammed-Hossam Loutfi re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 13 filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Lewis, Alexa)
December 3, 2007 Filing 22 REPLY Support MOTION to Dismiss Case 13 filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Lewis, Alexa)
November 29, 2007 Filing 21 REQUEST to Consider Filing of Documents filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (gk)
November 27, 2007 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 13 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (gk)
November 27, 2007 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Edward O. Lear in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 13 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits# 2 Exhibits)(gk)
November 27, 2007 Filing 18 DECLARATION of K. Andrew Kent Re Motion to Dismiss 13 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (gk)
November 27, 2007 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Professor/Dr. Mohamed-Hossam Loutfi in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 13 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (gk)
November 27, 2007 Filing 16 OPPOSITION to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 13 filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (gk)
November 26, 2007 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found: A request for judicial notice is submitted as an attachment to the motion. The Request should either have been indicated on the face of the Motion, or filed as a separate document: RE Notice of Motion and Motion of Certain Defendants to Dismiss filed 11/19/2007 13 . (gk)
November 20, 2007 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL by Judge Christina A. Snyder: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder. Counsel are advised that the Court expects strict compliance with the provisions of the Local Rules and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See document for details. (gk)
November 19, 2007 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson.Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss# 2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice# 6 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice# 7 Proof of Service)(Lewis, Alexa)
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET UNIFORM DATE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Christina A. Snyder; Defendants Mike Shinoda answer or response due 11/19/2007; Dave Farrell answer or response due 11/19/2007; Joseph Hahn answer or response due 11/19/2007; Chester Bennington answer or response due 11/19/2007; Big Bad Mr Hahn Music answer or response due 11/19/2007; Chesterchaz Publishing answer or response due 11/19/2007; EMI Blackwood Music Inc. answer or response due 11/19/2007; Kenji Kobayashi Music answer or response due 11/19/2007; Machine Shop Recordings LLC answer or response due 11/19/2007; MTV Networks Enterprise Inc. answer or response due 11/19/2007; Nondisclosure Agreement Music answer or response due 11/19/2007; Paramount Home Entertainment Inc. answer or response due 11/19/2007; Paramount Pictures Corporation answer or response due 11/19/2007; Rob Bourdon Music answer or response due 11/19/2007; Roc-A-Fella Records LLC answer or response due 11/19/2007; Timbaland Productions Inc. answer or response due 11/19/2007; UMG Recordings Inc. answer or response due 11/19/2007; Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc. answer due 11/19/2007; Warner Music Inc. answer or response due 11/19/2007; Shawn Carter answer or response due 11/19/2007; Timothy Mosely answer or response due 11/19/2007; Rob Bourdon answer or response due 11/19/2007; Brad Delson answer or response due 11/19/2007. (gk)
October 25, 2007 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Christine Lepera for Defendants Shawn Carter p/k/a Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely p/k/a Timbaland, Timbaland Productions, Inc., and EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (gk)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to Section 3.2 of General Order 07.02 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 07-5715 CAS (Ex).(rn)
October 17, 2007 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION as to Interested Parties filed by Defendants Shawn Carter p/k/a Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely p/k/a Timbaland, Timbaland Productions, Inc., and EMI Blackwood Music Inc. (gk)
October 17, 2007 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION as to Interested Parties filed by Defendants Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, and Universal Music & Video Distribution, Corp. (gk)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07 and General Order 07-02. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Suzanne H. Segal to Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 07-5715 PA (Ex).(rn)
October 3, 2007 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson, Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr. Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Rob Bourdon Music, Warner Music Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Universal Music & Video Distribution Corp., MTV Networks Enterprise, Inc., Paramount Home Entertainment, Inc. and Paramount Pictures Corporation. (gk)
October 3, 2007 FAX number for Attorney Russell J Frackman, Alexa L Lewis is 310-312-3100. (gk)
October 3, 2007 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint as to Mike Shinoda answer now due 10/17/2007; Dave Farrell answer now due 10/17/2007; Joseph Hahn answer now due 10/17/2007; Chester Bennington answer now due 10/17/2007; Big Bad Mr Hahn Music answer now due 10/17/2007; Chesterchaz Publishing answer now due 10/17/2007; Kenji Kobayashi Music answer now due 10/17/2007; Machine Shop Recordings LLC answer now due 10/17/2007; MTV Networks Enterprise Inc answer now due 10/17/2007; Nondisclosure Agreement Music answer now due 10/17/2007; Paramount Home Entertainment Inc answer now due 10/17/2007; Paramount Pictures Corporation answer now due 10/17/2007; Rob Bourdon Music answer now due 10/17/2007; Roc-A-Fella Records LLC answer now due 10/17/2007; UMG Recordings Inc answer now due 10/17/2007; Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc answer now due 10/17/2007; Warner Music Inc answer now due 10/17/2007; Rob Bourdon answer now due 10/17/2007; Brad Delson answer now due 10/17/2007. (gk)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 07.02 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 05-2480 SVW (PJWx)(rn)
September 4, 2007 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. Related Case(s): CV 07-5715 PA (SSx) (rn)
August 31, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed. (jp)
August 31, 2007 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (jp)
August 31, 2007 20 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, EMI Music Publishing Ltd, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Lil Lulu Publishing, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Marcy Projects Productions II Inc, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Radical Media, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Kyambo Joshua, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (jp)
August 31, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Mike Shinoda, Dave Farrell, Joseph Hahn, Chester Bennington, Big Bad Mr Hahn Music, Chesterchaz Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, EMI Music Publishing Ltd, Kenji Kobayashi Music, Lil Lulu Publishing, Machine Shop Recordings LLC, Marcy Projects Productions II Inc, MTV Networks Enterprise Inc, Nondisclosure Agreement Music, Paramount Home Entertainment Inc, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Radical Media, Rob Bourdon Music, Roc-A-Fella Records LLC, Timbaland Productions Inc, UMG Recordings Inc, Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc, Warner Music Inc, Jay-Z, Timothy Mosely, Kyambo Joshua, Rob Bourdon, Brad Delson. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Osama Ahmed Fahmy. (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fahmy v. Jay-Z et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osama Ahmed Fahmy
Represented By: Edward O Lear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Mosely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyambo Joshua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Bourdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Delson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Shinoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Bennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Bad Mr Hahn Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesterchaz Publishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI Blackwood Music Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI Music Publishing Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenji Kobayashi Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lil Lulu Publishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machine Shop Recordings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcy Projects Productions II Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTV Networks Enterprise Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nondisclosure Agreement Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Home Entertainment Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radical Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Bourdon Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roc-A-Fella Records LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timbaland Productions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMG Recordings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music and Video Distribution Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?